Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:14-bk-12103
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Oct 16, 2014
Terminated:Jul 08, 2020
Plan Confirmed:Mar 12, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.
1000 Boardwalk at Virginia Avenue
Atlantic City, NJ 08401
Represented By
Kenneth Pasquale
Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP
contact info
Ashley E. Jacobs
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Michael S. Neiburg
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Ian J Bambrick
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Erez Gilad
Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP
contact info
Jennifer Arbuse
Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP
contact info
Kristopher M. Hansen
Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP
contact info
Curtis C. Mechling
Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP
contact info
Gabriel Sasson
Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP
contact info
Matthew Barry Lunn
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Robert F. Poppiti, Jr.
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Jerrold S. Kulback
Archer & Greiner
contact info
John M Donnelly
Donnelly Clark
contact info
Patrick A. Jackson
Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 19, 2017 5:00 PM EDT
Attorney
Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP
Attorney
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
Auditor
Ernst & Young LLP
Claims Agent
Prime Clerk LLC, Notice and Claims Agent
830 Third Avenue 9th Floor
New York, NY 10022
Claims Agent
Prime Clerk, Notice and Claims Agent
www.primeclerk.com 830 Third Avenue 9th Floor
New York, NY 10022
Represented By
Benjamin Joseph Steele
Prime Clerk LLC
contact info
Claims Agent
Prime Clerk
www.primeclerk.com 830 Third Avenue 9th Floor
New York, NY 10022
Represented By
Benjamin Joseph Steele
Prime Clerk LLC
contact info
Creditor
A&A Glove & Safety Co.
20 Richey Avenue
Collingswood, NJ 08107
Creditor
AC PTC LLC
Creditor
AZ Gourmet Foods Inc
176 W Wingohocking St
Phildelphia, PA 19140
Creditor
Fatima Ahmed
Represented By
Frank Angelastro
contact info
Creditor
Ernest Alexander
1215 Columbia Ave
Pleasantville, NJ 08232
Creditor
AmeriHealth Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
Scott J. Leonhardt
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
James O Moore
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
John C Goodchild
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Frederick B. Rosner
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Andrew J. Gallo
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Julia Bettina Klein
Klein LLC
contact info
Melissa Boey
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Creditor
Atlantic City Electric Co.
Represented By
William Douglas White
Mccarthy & White PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Glenn J Ballenger
826 Anchor Rode Drive
Naples, FL 34103
Creditor
Bally Gaming Inc d/b/a Bally Technologies
6650 El Camino Road Attn: A.C. Ansani, Asst General Counsel
Las Vegas, NV 89118
Represented By
A.C. Ansani
Bally Gaming Inc D/b/a Bally Technologie
contact info
Creditor
Betfair Interactive US LLC
Represented By
Michael B. Schaedle
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Dennis M.P. Ehling
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Stephen D Schrier
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Victoria A. Guilfoyle
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Eric G Fikry
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Creditor
Taniel Brown-Elam
Represented By
Scott McPherson
Escandon, Fernicola, Anderson & Covelli
contact info
Creditor
John Bryant
Represented By
Evan T. Miller
Bayard, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
Casino Reinvestment Development Authority
Represented By
Bayard J. Snyder
Snyder & Associates, PA
contact info
Patrick J McAuley
Connell Foley LLP
contact info
Philip W. Allogramento
Connell Foley LLP
contact info
Creditor
City of Atlantic City
Represented By
Richard D. Trenk
Trenk, Dipasquale, Webster, Della, Ferra
contact info
William E. Chipman, Jr.
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
Adam D. Wolper
Herrick Feinstein, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Alberto C. Collazo
Represented By
William D. Sullivan
Sullivan Hazeltine Allinson LLC
contact info
Creditor
Conner Strong & Buckelew Companies, Inc.
Represented By
Natasha M. Songonuga
Gibbons P.C.
contact info
David N Crapo
Gibbons P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Phyllis Ehret
Represented By
David Cuneo
contact info
William D. Sullivan
Sullivan Hazeltine Allinson LLC
contact info
Creditor
Exempt Trust U/W of Ellsworth Steinberg Trust
Represented By
L. John Bird
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Creditor
Stephanie Fashauer
Represented By
Christopher Brown
Drazin & Warshaw PC
contact info
Creditor
FinCEN
1100 L St. NW Rm 10002
Washintgon, DC 20530
Represented By
Mary A. Schmergel
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Creditor
Gerald Florio
Represented By
Richard L. Press
Law Offices Of Richard L. Press & Associ
contact info
Creditor
Fuel Merchants Association of New Jersey
Represented By
Lucian Borders Murley
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Creditor
Nicklaus Genuardi
Represented By
David M. Klauder
Bielli & Klauder, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Hanram Rattu, as Administratrix Ad Prosequendum of the Estate of Sunil Rattu
Represented By
Richard A. Barkasy
Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP
contact info
Creditor
Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc., d//b/a Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey
Represented By
Evan T. Miller
Bayard, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
IGT
Represented By
John P. Leon
Subranni Zauber LLC
contact info
Scott M. Zauber
Subranni Zauber LLC
contact info
Randal Cowles
Subranni Zauber LLC
contact info
Creditor
International Business Machines Corporation
Creditor
International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund
Dawn M. Costa, Esq. 510 Walnut St., 16th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19106
Represented By
Dawn M Costa
Jennings Sigmond, P.C.
contact info
Kent G Cprek
Jennings Sigmond, PC
contact info
Rick S. Miller
Ferry, Joseph & Pearce, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
Iron Mountain Information Management, LLC
One Federal Street
Boston, MA 02110
Represented By
Joseph Corrigan
Iron Mountain Information Management, Ll
contact info
Creditor
JAB Sales Corp
Represented By
Ernest R Nuzzo
contact info
Creditor
Jessica Caballero, Individually and as Administratrix of the Estate of Martin Caballero
Represented By
Richard A. Barkasy
Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP
contact info
Creditor
Angela Johnson
950 Sykes Lane
Williamstown, NJ 08094
Represented By
Rocco Cipparone, Jr
Law Offices Of Rocco C. Cipparone, Jr.
contact info
Creditor
Dimple Khullar
Law Office of Robert J. Campbell 551 Rt 50
Mays Landing, NJ 08330
Creditor
Maryanne Klemmer
Represented By
Richard L. Press
Law Offices Of Richard L. Press & Associ
contact info
Creditor
Alesia Lester
Represented By
Richard DiTomaso
contact info
Creditor
Levine, Staller, Sklar, Chan & Browin, P.A.
Represented By
Teresa K.D. Currier
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Creditor
Philip Lipani
Represented By
James G Aaron
contact info
Creditor
Phyllis Longo
Represented By
Arthur S Novello
Dashevsky, Horwitz, Kuhn And Novello PC
contact info
Creditor
Luigi Noverati and Julia Noverati
Represented By
Marian I Kelly
Popjoy & Kelly LLC
contact info
Creditor
Luz Sota
Represented By
Joseph J. McMahon, Jr.
Ciardi, Ciardi & Astin
contact info
Creditor
Kathleen Murphy
Represented By
Michael R. Contarino
contact info
Creditor
National Labor Relations Board
Region 4 615 Chestnut Street sUITE 710
Philadelphia, PA 19106
Represented By
Daniel E. Halevy
National Labor Relations Board
contact info
Randy M. Girer
National Labor Relations Board
contact info
Creditor
National Retirement Fund
Represented By
Joseph D. Wright
C/o Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
James Bentley
Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP
contact info
Adam G. Landis
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Lawrence V. Gelber
Schulte Roth & Zobel LLP
contact info
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter Nemer PC Shawn M. Christianson 55 2nd St., 17th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105
Represented By
Amish R. Doshi
Magnozzi & Kye, LLP
contact info
James E. Huggett
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Shawn M. Christianson
Buchalter P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Richard Payne
Represented By
Douglas N Stern
contact info
Creditor
Bruce Pearlman
Represented By
Richard L. Press
Law Offices Of Richard L. Press & Associ
contact info
Creditor
Plaza Hotel Management Company
Wolff & Samson PC c/o Robert E. Nies, Esq. One Boland Drive
West Orange, NJ 07052
Represented By
Robert E. Nies
Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC
contact info
Creditor
Preferred Coffee, LLC
Tybout, Redfearn & Pell 750 Shipyard Drive Suite 400
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Seth J. Reidenberg
Tybout, Redfearn & Pell
contact info
Robert D. Cecil, Jr.
Tybout, Redfearn & Pell
contact info
Creditor
R&R Associates
Represented By
Don A. Beskrone
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Benjamin W. Keenan
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Creditor
Robert's Atlantic City LLC and Star Light Events LLC
Represented By
Scott J. Leonhardt
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Fred B. Ringel
Robinson Brog Leinward Et Al.
contact info
Creditor
Roberts of Atlantic City LLC
Represented By
Fred B. Ringel
Robinson Brog Leinward Et Al.
contact info
Creditor
Juan Ruiz
Sciretta & Venterina LLP 26 Park Court
Staten Island, NY 10301
Represented By
Timothy Joseph Weiler
Tim Weiler Law
contact info
Creditor
Theresa Ruiz
Sciretta & Venterina LLP 26 Park Court
Staten Island, NY 10301
Represented By
Timothy Joseph Weiler
Tim Weiler Law
contact info
Creditor
Tapal Sarker
48 South Windsor Avenue
Atlantic City, NJ 08401
Represented By
Chad Joseph Toms
Whiteford Taylor Preston LLC
contact info
John P Mueller
Ansa Assuncao LLP
contact info
Creditor
Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC
Creditor
Star Light Events LLC
Represented By
Fred B. Ringel
Robinson Brog Leinward Et Al.
contact info
Creditor
Eleanor Stokes
Represented By
John R. Weaver, Jr.
contact info
Creditor
Sysco Philadelphia, LLC
Represented By
Darryl S. Laddin
Arnall Golden Gregory LLP
contact info
Kathleen M. Miller
Smith, Katzenstein & Jenkins LLP
contact info
Sergio I. Scuteri
Capehart Scatchard, P.A.
contact info
Trey A. Monsour
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Lauren Garraux
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Creditor
The Atlantic City Alliance, Inc.
Represented By
John P Leon
Subranni Zauber LLC
contact info
Scott M. Zauber
Subranni Zauber LLC
contact info
Randal Cowles
Subranni Zauber LLC
contact info
Creditor
The Atlantic City Sewerage Company
Represented By
L. John Bird
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Creditor
Thermal Energy Limited Partnership I
Represented By
Jonathan Guy
Orrick, Harrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Mark T Hurford
Campbell & Levine, LLC
contact info
Kathleen Orr
Orrick, Harrington & Sutcliff LLP
contact info
Creditor
Robert Torres
Represented By
Christopher Dean Loizides
Loizides, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
Tozour Energy Systems, Inc. d/b/a Tozour Trane
Represented By
Jeffrey R. Waxman
Morris James LLP
contact info
Creditor
Donald J. Trump
Represented By
Patrick J. Reilley
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Ivanka Trump
Represented By
Patrick J. Reilley
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Unite Here Health
Represented By
Ayesha Chacko Bennett
Campbell & Levine, LLC
contact info
Jodi L. Hause
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Mark T Hurford
Campbell & Levine, LLC
contact info
Kirk B. Burkley
Bernstein-Burkley, P.C.
contact info
Daniel R. Schimizzi
Bernstein-Burkley, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
WMS Gaming Inc.,
800 South Northpoint Boulevard
Waukegan, IL 60085
Represented By
Deborah Fulton
Wms Gaming Inc
contact info
Creditor Committee
OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS
Represented By
Nathan A. Schultz
Law Office Of Nathan A. Schultz P.C.
contact info
Karen A. Giannelli
Gibbons P.C.
contact info
Guy V. Amoresano
Gibbons P.C.
contact info
James M Lee
contact info
Mark B. Conlan
Gibbons P.C.
contact info
Natasha M. Songonuga
Gibbons P.C.
contact info
Evans E. Wohlforth
Gibbons P.C.
contact info
David N Crapo
Gibbons P.C.
contact info
J. Brugh Lower
Gibbons P.C.
contact info
Financial Advisor
Houlihan Lokey Capital, Inc.
Interested Party
All Star Premium Products Inc. d/b/a All Star Incentive Marketing
Sturbridge Office Park 660 Main Street PO Box 980
Fiskdale, MA 01518
Interested Party
BET Associates, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey Kurtzman
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Domenic E. Pacitti
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Interested Party
DJT Aerospace LLC
Cole Schotz Meisel Forman & Leonard 500 Delaware Avenue Suite 1410
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Patrick J. Reilley
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
First Lien Agent
Represented By
Robert J. Dehney
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Craig P. Druehl
Dechert LLP
contact info
Allan S. Brilliant
Dechert LLP
contact info
Christopher M Hayes
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Shmuel Vasser
Dechert LLP
contact info
Andrew R. Remming
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Shana White
Dechert LLP
contact info
Interested Party
First Lien Lenders
Represented By
Robert J. Dehney
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Craig P. Druehl
Dechert LLP
contact info
Allan S. Brilliant
Dechert LLP
contact info
Christopher M Hayes
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Shmuel Vasser
Dechert LLP
contact info
Andrew R. Remming
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Shana White
Dechert LLP
contact info
Interested Party
First Lien Parties
Represented By
Michael Maloney
Dechert LLP
contact info
Andrew R. Remming
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Interested Party
GoldenTree Entrust Intermediate Fund SPC
Interested Party
GoldenTree Offshore Intermediate Fund II, L.P.
Interested Party
GoldenTree Offshore Intermediate Fund, L.P.
Interested Party
GoldenTree Partners (100) L.P.
Interested Party
GoldenTree Partners II, L.P.
Interested Party
GoldenTree Partners, L.P.
Interested Party
Hard Rock Cafe International (STP), Inc.
Represented By
Jimmy D. Parrish
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Francis A. Monaco, Jr.
Gellert Scali Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
Ericka Fredricks Johnson
Womble Carlyle Sandridge & Rice, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Icahn Entities
Represented By
Andrew R. Remming
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Infor (US), Inc.
Represented By
Victoria A. Guilfoyle
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Irwin E. Harrison, Administrator of the Estate of Brian Harrison, Deceased
Represented By
Thomas G. Macauley
Macauley LLC
contact info
Christian M Perrucci
Florio, Perrucci, Steinhardt & Fader, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Marilyn Mazzella
51 Holly Avenue
Staten Island, NY 10308
Interested Party
Wayne Mazzella c/o Marilyn Mazzella
Interested Party
Sinay Lim Ou
Represented By
Curtis A Hehn
Offit Kurman
contact info
Interested Party
PX NJ Concessions, LLC d/b/a Panda Express
1007 North Orange Street Suite 1110
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
William E. Chipman, Jr.
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Polygon Global Opportunities Master Fund
Represented By
Scott J. Leonhardt
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Tapal Sarker
48 South Windsor Avenue
Atlantic City, NJ 08401
Represented By
Chad Joseph Toms
Whiteford Taylor Preston LLC
contact info
John P Mueller
Ansa Assuncao LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Nathan A. Schultz
LAW OFFICE OF NATHAN A. SCHULTZ, P.C. 10621 Craig Road
Traverse City, MI 49686
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Kendra K Bader
Ask LLP
contact info
Brigette G. McGrath
Ask LLP
contact info
Natasha M. Songonuga
Gibbons P.C.
contact info
Alex Govze
Ask Financial LLP
contact info
Gary D. Underdahl
Ask Financial, LLP
contact info
Kara E Casteel
Ask Financial LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Thomas and Vanessa Dunn
Represented By
Matthew Smith
Bruno Gerbino & Soriano LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Trump AC Casino Marks LLC
Cole Schotz Meisel Forman & Leonard, PA Attn: Patrick J. Reilley 500 Delaware Avenue Suite 1410
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Victoria Cioppettini
Cole Schotz Meisel Forman & Leonard, PA
contact info
Robert M. Novick
Kasowitz Benson Torres & Friedman LLP
contact info
Patrick J. Reilley
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
David Bass
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard
contact info
David M. Friedman
Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP
contact info
Michael D. Sirota
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
Unitehere Local 54
1014 Atlantic Ave.
Atlantic city, NJ 08401
Represented By
Kathy L. Krieger
James & Hoffman, P.C.
contact info
Evin F. Isaacson
James & Hoffman, P.C.
contact info
Stephen T Morrow
contact info
William T Josem
Cleary, Josem & Trigiani LLP
contact info
Joseph J. Rhoades
Rhoades & Morrow LLC
contact info
Darin M. Dalmat
James & Hoffman, P.C.
contact info
Richard G McCracken
Davis Cowell & Bowe
contact info
Interested Party
Frank Vanness
Represented By
Danielle S. Chandonnet
Shebell & Shebell LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Abraham Wadler
Interested Party
Thelma W. Wadler
Liquidator
Sovath Ou
Represented By
Curtis A Hehn
Offit Kurman
contact info
Other Prof.
Bar AC, LLC
Represented By
Ronald S. Gellert
Gellert Scali Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
Spec. Counsel
Merlin Law Group, P.A.
Spec. Counsel
Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP
Spec. Counsel
Sills Cummis & Gross P.C.
Stockholder
Contrarian Capital Management LLC
Represented By
Scott J. Leonhardt
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Stockholder
Kings Road Holdings XIV Ltd.
Represented By
Scott J. Leonhardt
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Jane M. Leamy
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Jane M. Leamy
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info


1. Trump Taj Mahal Casino Out of Bankruptcy, Into Carl Icahn's Hands (wsj.com)
Submitted Mon 02/29/2016
2. Trump Entertainment Resorts, inc, et al, Chapter 11 Debtors (intellectualpropertymagazine.com)
Submitted Tue 07/07/2015
3. Owner of Tropicana gets OK to acquire Taj Mahal (nj.com)
Submitted Wed 06/10/2015
4. Trump-ing the Automatic Stay: Delaware Bankruptcy Court Allows Suit to Terminate Trademark Licensing Agreement (business-finance-restructuring.weil.com)
Submitted Tue 03/24/2015
5. Casino appeals ruling favoring Trumps in name lawsuit (charlotteobserver.com)
Submitted Mon 03/09/2015
6. Judge sides with Donald and Ivanka Trump in name litigation (nj1015.com)
Submitted Mon 02/23/2015
7. Trump Taj Mahal Settles Over Violations Finding (wsj.com)
Submitted Thu 02/12/2015
8. Trump Taj Mahal Workers Protest at Icahn's Office (wsj.com)
Submitted Fri 01/30/2015
9. Bankruptcy Judge Approves Financing for Trump Entertainment (abcnews.go.com)
Submitted Thu 01/29/2015
10. Icahn Acquisition of Trump Casinos Delayed Two Weeks: Bankruptcy (bloomberg.com)
Submitted Wed 01/21/2015
11. Revel Backup Buyer Wants Price Cut by $8.4 Million: Bankruptcy (businessweek.com)
Submitted Mon 12/29/2014
12. Atlantic City's Taj Mahal casino seeks new bankruptcy financing (gamingtoday.com)
Submitted Sat 11/29/2014
13. Atlantic City Casinos Spark Bankruptcy Court Battles (casino.org)
Submitted Sun 11/30/2014
14. Bankruptcy wrangling for ex-Trump, Revel casinos (app.com)
Submitted Wed 11/26/2014
15. Trump Casino Bankruptcy Judge Asks If Time to Liquidate (bloomberg.com)
Submitted Fri 11/21/2014
16. Bankruptcy: Trump Taj Mahal Sees Dec. 12 Closing; Creditor Panel Pushes Own Plan (forbes.com)
Submitted Tue 11/18/2014
17. Creditors Call Trump Entertainment Bankruptcy Plan a 'Charade' (online.wsj.com)
Submitted Mon 11/03/2014
18. When the Stakes are High, Union Can't Gamble with Gambling Debtors - Bankruptcy Court Approves Casino's Rejection of CBA (business-finance-restructuring.weil.com)
Submitted Tue 10/28/2014
19. Atlantic City, Revel battle over property taxes - Newsday (newsday.com)
Submitted Mon 10/27/2014
20. Bankruptcy hearing in Trump name fight postponed (northjersey.com)
Submitted Thu 10/23/2014
21. Bankruptcy Court Decision Awaited on Atlantic City's Taj Mahal Casino - CBS Philly (philadelphia.cbslocal.com)
Submitted Fri 10/17/2014
22. Billionaire: lawmaker 'selling out' Atlantic City (usatoday.com)
Submitted Tue 11/11/2014
23. Trump Taj Mahal Accuses Union of Harassing Customers (online.wsj.com)
Submitted Fri 10/10/2014
24. Union Protests Trump Entertainment's Bid to Cut Worker Benefits (online.wsj.com)
Submitted Thu 10/09/2014
25. APNewsBreak: Trump name coming off closed casino (online.wsj.com)
Submitted Mon 10/06/2014
26. Trump Entertainment Loses Bid to End Union Pension Funding (online.wsj.com)
Submitted Sat 10/04/2014
27. Trump Entertainment Files Chapter 11 Turnaround Plan (online.wsj.com)
Submitted Thu 10/02/2014
28. Icahn Might Pump $100 Million Into Taj if Union Agrees to Cuts (bankruptcynews.dowjones.com)
Submitted Tue 09/30/2014
29. Ultimate Gaming Exits New Jersey Market Due To Trump Issues (pokernewsdaily.com)
Submitted Mon 09/22/2014
30. United States: Trump Entertainment Resorts Files For Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Protection In Delaware (mondaq.com)
Submitted Tue 09/16/2014
31. Trump Tweets Possible Play for Atlantic City Casinos (blogs.wsj.com)
Submitted Tue 09/16/2014
32. Trump Entertainment Casino Bankruptcy Stands to Change Rivals' Luck (online.wsj.com)
Submitted Wed 09/10/2014
33. The Daily Docket: Trump-Branded Atlantic City Resorts File for Bankruptcy (blogs.wsj.com)
Submitted Tue 09/09/2014
Docket last updated: 34 minutes ago
Thursday, May 20, 2021
2423 2423 notice Withdrawal - Notice Thu 05/20 10:58 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel from ECF Noticing (Multiple Cases) Filed by TER Holdings I, Inc. (Bambrick, Ian)
Related: [-]