Member Case
Lead case is: 1:14-bk-12103

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:14-bk-12110
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2014
Terminated:Jun 23, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
TERH LP Inc.
1000 Boardwalk at Virginia Avenue
Atlantic City, NJ 08401
Represented By
Robert F. Poppiti, Jr.
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899


Docket last updated: 3 minutes ago
Tuesday, June 23, 2020
6 6 order Final Decree Tue 06/23 11:46 AM
Final Decree Closing Cases and Terminating Services of Claims Agent. Signed on 6/22/2020 (NAB)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 06/23 11:54 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (NAB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2020
5 5 court Case Reassigned Wed 02/05 8:21 AM
Order of Reassignment of Judge. Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein added to case. Involvement of Judge Kevin Gross Terminated (SH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 09, 2014
4 4 misc Schedules/Statements Thu 10/09 11:07 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A, Sch B, Sch D, Sch E, Sch F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Schs, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs, Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by TERH LP Inc.. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Financial Affairs
Wednesday, September 10, 2014
3 3 order Order-Joint Admin Wed 09/10 1:54 PM
Order Authorizing the Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case directing the consolidation and joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of Trump Entertainment Resorts Inc. 14-12103 , Trump Entertainment Resorts Holdings L.P. 14-12104 , Trump Plaza Associates LLC 14-12105 , Trump Marina Associates LLC 14-12106 , Trump Taj Mahal Associates LLC 14-12107 , Trump Entertainment Resorts Development Company LLC 14-12108 , TER Development Co., LLC 14-12109 , and TERH LP Inc 14-12110 . The docket in the chapter 11 case of Trump Entertainment Resorts Inc, Case No. 14-12103 (KG) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Order Signed on 9/10/2014 (SH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 09, 2014
2 2 crditcrd none
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 14-12110 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 7258777, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by TERH LP Inc.. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned
Judge Kevin J. Carey added to case (BA)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Tue 09/09 8:23 AM
Judge Kevin Gross added to case (BA)
Related: [-]