Tracey Mourey et al v. Ford Motor Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Pedro V Castillo |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-04961 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Jul 20, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Delaware, 1:22-cv-00764 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 16, 2023 1:02 AM PST |
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Becky Crowden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tracy Hildegard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Mourey, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tracey Mourey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Levi Murphy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Heather Naylor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandt Nelson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kirk Nelson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexandria Nichols
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Nimmo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronda Njoroge
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chad Norman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shelly O'Neal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ugochi Ohale
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dwin Ollison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Orourke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Orthman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tim Owens
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dallas Parker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lucas Parton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wendy Patrick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keith Patty
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marcell Pelton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aaron Pemberton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Peterson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Justin Petrillo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julie Porter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Walter Poss
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rishauna Pouncil
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Pray
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Judy Pugh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wade Pugh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sherry Rall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Ramsey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Randell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna Rasmussen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amber Reed
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Natalie Rehkop
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kaylee Rench
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela Riley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diane Riley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vicki Riley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jana Rinearson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Robertson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Roesner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amie Rogers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hunter Rooks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie Rosecrans
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randall Ross
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Rothweil
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brenda Rozell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shabreann Rozell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carla Rue
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Rundblad
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cole Sales
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laura Sanders
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tristan Sanders
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kyle Sanford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amanda Saunders
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie Schamma
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Caitlin Scherer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tonya Schmitz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bethany Schneider
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Caresse Schulte
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jina Scott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristina Scott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rebecca Shaheen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darlene Shea
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rebecca Sherwood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Shook
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandon Shope
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Corey Siering
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lawrence Simmons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Spencer Sims
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carolyn Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melanie Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Merena Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vickie Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brenda Sommers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Susan Sowerby
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leonard Spall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brianna Spear
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelsey Spears
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Neikko Spurgeon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicholas Staufenbiel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rhonda Steeby
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Stegeman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amy Stewart
15543 Rayen St Unit No 60
North Hills, CA 91343 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Caitlin Stidham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Stieber
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stacey Stockham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Stolte
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brittany Stone
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jodi Stone
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrea Stroup
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Sullivan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Margaret Sullivan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Sweeten
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tanya Swires
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lorene Swope
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Syfert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brittany Tarvin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Valerie Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vanessa Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Denine Taylordooley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Tefft
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna Temple
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Thompson
CDC F-68661 Kern Valley State Prison A 6 - 218 P O Box 8101
Delano, CA 93216 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Timme
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dustin Tippen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Casimera Tracy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Tracy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Evan Trager
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Turney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allen Vaughan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teresa Vaughan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joe Vitale
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matt Vogel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAVID WISE
8545 W. Warm Springs Rd. Ste A4-381
Las Vegas, NV 89113 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Wagers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Wagner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela Waits
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kourtney Walker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matt Walker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bobby Weaver
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Webster
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janice Weimer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elaine Wekenborg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna White
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joe Wildhaber
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bobby R. Wilkins, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hope Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melissa Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sandra Williamson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Wimberley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bruce Winter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Breanna Wolven
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yancey Woods
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tamara Woolford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Wors
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clarence Worsham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dylan Wright
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kati Wright
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janis Yacovelli
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alesia Young
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deana Young
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Young
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lorena Zachery
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, September 01, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer) |
|
Friday, July 22, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (et) |
|
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (et) |
|
8 | 8
![]() ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Delaware |
|
Thursday, July 21, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
![]() CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-68) in MDL No. 2814 -- In re Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation dated 7/12/22. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/22/2022.] |
|
Case electronically transferred to Central District of California. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/22/2022.] | ||
Wednesday, July 20, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - 68 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 7/12/2022 regarding transfer of Case No. 1:22-cv-00764-VAC from USDC District of Delaware (Wilmington). Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:18-ml-2814-AB (PVCx). (et) |
|
Friday, June 24, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Wednesday, June 15, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
4 | 4 ORAL ORDER: This case has been assigned to the District of Delaware's Vacant Judgeship ("VAC"). Detailed information relating to VAC cases may be found in the Court's Announcement of March 3, 2022 and Standing Order No. 2022-VAC-1 (March 9, 2022), which are found on the Court's website. Consistent with the foregoing Announcement and Standing Order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file the "Notice of Consent or Absence of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge," being docketed along with the instant order, no later than sixty (60) days after service of the Complaint on the first defendant that is served. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Notice, Consent, and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, previously docketed in this case, are VACATED. Issued by the Clerk of Court on 6/15/2022. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/22/2022.] | |
Case Assigned to Vacant Judgeship (2022). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/22/2022.] | ||
Thursday, June 09, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |