Harvey Alequin et al v. Ford Motor Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Pedro V Castillo |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-04963 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 20, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Delaware, 1:22-cv-00765 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 16, 2023 12:57 AM PST |
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harvey Alequin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Allesandro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debbra Allington
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andres Amigon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Amspacher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Arvay
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Atwell Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Bailey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Corey Baker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lewis Barasch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erin Barber
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Barber
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexandra Bartolotta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Bastian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danyelle Baum
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dedrick Beard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Greg Beasley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teresa Bell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kayla Benjamin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Taylor Benningfield
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clayton Besaw
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lynne Bieger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Benjamin Bigham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dana Blasetti
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Bortugno
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamie Botsford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Bouteiller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Bowman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Bowman II
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Boyle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Margaret Brea
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dean Bredesen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicole Brennan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Regina Brennan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Broderick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Browne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Bunce
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Burdick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melissa Burton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carol Button
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
April Byerwalters
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Cabrera
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Cala
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Callan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dori Camacho
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Caramazza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Desiree Carey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathleen Carman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Carpenter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Casta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rebecca Castellano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melissa Castile
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicole Cessman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kuan Chiu
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ryan Chizewick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Christianson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lynnea Cilli
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Briana Cole
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Colon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Cone
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nancy Connorton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Consalvo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Cordick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lanson Cosh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peggy Cradduck
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Crosby
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Crossman Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeff Crouch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Curtis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristina Daddario
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie Daley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wilfred David
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Delgado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carissa Depew
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy Destefano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tom Diabo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Dias
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charity Dickson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Dipasquale
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Botan Dolun
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Donovan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jaroslaw Dorman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Dow
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Becka Dowd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Dubuque
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lynne Durfee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amanda Duval
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brent Duval
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terrance Earsing
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Ekkebus
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Ellett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bonnie Evans
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trisha Fanelli
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Haligh Farley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Farrah
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tyler Faulkner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maryann Fay
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amanda Feller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shirley Felter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leah Feltt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ruth Fields
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michele Finch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrii Flach
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashley Frawley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Fredette
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Fromm
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joe Furfaro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sirius Gage
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amanda Garry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Gauck
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samantha Gentilcore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gwen Geyer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janasia Giles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frank Giordano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Giugno
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Gonzalez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashely Goodell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Gould
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Grace
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melissa Gray
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sherry Grayson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Katie Griffin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tammy Griffith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathleen Guida
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Hagon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Halacy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Devon Hamilton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sandra Hamilton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah Hanley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Natalie Harack
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Harrod
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mia Harvey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lori Hasert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yvonne Hayes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brianna Healy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jon Heaverin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Breanne Hecht
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Heferle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ellen Hendricks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chris Herr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter Herrmann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Higgins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samantha Hill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carrie Himko
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Hobus
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Hoctor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeanette Hoppy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luke Horan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathleen Hornbrook
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raedean Hughes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Autumn Infandino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amanda Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ron Janese
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Itayetzi Jimenez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carl Johnson
AP-5234 Folsom State Prison P O Box 950
Folsom, CA 95763 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ruth Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kaetlyn Jordan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Austin Kaetzel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kyle Kane
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Kane
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trista Kealy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victoria Keenly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Keller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Miranda Ketcham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Kibler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Kiene
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Perry Kimlin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frank Kluges
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Knopp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Korczykowski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carol Kowalik-Happy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah Kranz-Mitchell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Kubarek
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Kucharski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charlie Kuhn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelly Kuhn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eleonore Kuminski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristofor Lanko
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Lawson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Leak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Sharp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lawrence Whiting
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, August 30, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer) |
|
Friday, July 22, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (ghap) |
|
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
![]() ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Delaware |
|
Thursday, July 21, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/22/2022.] |
|
Wednesday, July 20, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - 68 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 7/12/2022 regarding transfer of Case No. 1:22-cv-765-CFC from District of Delaware (Wilmington). Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:18-ml-2814-AB (PVCx). (ghap) |
|
Friday, June 24, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Wednesday, June 15, 2022 | ||
Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/22/2022.] | ||
Thursday, June 09, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |