Saundra Hall et al v. Ford Motor Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Pedro V Castillo |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-04975 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Jul 20, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Delaware, 1:22-cv-00768 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 16, 2023 1:08 AM PST |
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cody Myers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Saundra Hall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danielle Hamilton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Virginia Hamm
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wendy Hansen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jillian Hardman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cathy Harris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Harris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jacquelyn Harvey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Harvey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christian Hatmaker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Haubiel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Hauser
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Meggorie Haven
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Heavener
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Hedge
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carol Heffner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fawn Hehkle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chris Helmink
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerimiah Hendershott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alonzo Henson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Herman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosemary Hermanson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dean Herren
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julie Hesser
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexandra Higaki
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexus Hill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Todd Hill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Drew Hinners
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lori Hite
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Hizer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jacob Hoffman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Holderman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashley Holesko
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brad Holloway
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Betty Holmes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cheryl Holsinger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerra Hoops
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nathan Horn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julie Horton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Horval
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Houchins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Houck
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Houston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shelby Howard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Claire Howell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tiffany Hubbs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Huber
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dorothy Huff
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kent Huffman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Huffman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Huggins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maryann Hummer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Hysell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Ike
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandon Inks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Irwin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Claudia Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sarah Jakacki
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tina Jarkewicz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Justin Jenkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shaquita Jenkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tammy Jennings
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Jereb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandy Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dawn Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremiah Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Justin Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melissa Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Johson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffery Jones
CDC T-28951 San Luis Obispo California Mens Colony P O Box 8101
San Luis Obispo, CA 93409 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathy Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shelby Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jim Jordan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Jordan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debbie Jungnickel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allison Kadar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Corinne Kaufman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Summer Kay
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charlene Keeran
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Audrey Keister
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kent Keller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tracy Keller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lexis Kelley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Kemp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Kerns
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Kerr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dawn Killien
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kaitlyn King
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Kinker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kaitlynn Kirk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Klingenberg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christia Klink
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adam Klippel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amy Klopf
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Knabbs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Knipp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kala Kolhoff
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tom Kolke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Margaret Koon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Koon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen Koster
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Kowalak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicole Kozma
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerome Krajcovic
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Megan Kreis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Kubec
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamie Kuhlman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cortney Kuzak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerome Laine
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carolyn Lamp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tavil Land
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Lanham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lana Lanning
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alyssa Larkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie Larrison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kaitlin Launder
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Benjamin Lawrence
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bailey Layne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrea Lee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Lee
54765-004 FCI Estill PO Box 699
Estill, SC 29918 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie Lee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sharita Lesure
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Regine Lett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Lettau
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Crystal Levert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tammy Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laura Liaskos
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Liddle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dawn Lieb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Lightfritz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amber Lillie
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Linder
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Lisbon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ellen Lohr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brianna Long
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tiffany Lopez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melvin Loth
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Lucas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Lucy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie Lyon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carol Mackell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Maffey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Maier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Susan Maldonado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Mankin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Martin, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ruth Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfred Massie
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mike Mathias
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffery May
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Mazuk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barry McCoy
Reg 5218580 L.A. County Jail 441 Bauchet Street B-19
Los Angeles, CA 90012 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bradley McCoy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Geraldine McFarland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kalicia Mccain
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Mccann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christine Mcclaine
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paige Mccue
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexandra Mcdulin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carissa Mcfarland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teresa Mcgee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rachel Mckenna
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marcy Mcknight
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Traci Mcmurray
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Monisa Mcqueen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeff Meadows
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Merrill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela Metcalf
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Metz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matt Meyers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelly Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chris Mock
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Modzelewski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sherry Molnar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ricky Monhollen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shirley Montanez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenzie Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashley Morgan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Morris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cory Mueller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lacie Mueller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kellee Murley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jodi Musser
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jack Myers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard T. Napier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chad Nash
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janice Neal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Nelson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lynne Neylan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ann Marie Tegeder
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charlene Tegeder
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/10/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, August 30, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Appearance
Tue 08/30 4:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer) |
|
Friday, July 22, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 07/22 12:26 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (dbe) |
|
9 | 9
transfer
MDL - Letter to Counsel (CV 119) - optional html form
Fri 07/22 9:22 AM
Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (car) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 07/22 9:21 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (car) |
|
6 | 6
transfer
Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer)
Fri 07/22 9:13 AM
ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Delaware |
|
Thursday, July 21, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
order
Transferring MDL Case per JPML Order
Thu 07/21 11:33 AM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-68) regarding MDL No. 2814. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 7/12/2022. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/22/2022.] |
|
Case transferred to the United States District Court for the Central District of California. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/22/2022.] | ||
Wednesday, July 20, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
mdlcmp
Copy of Transfer Order/Conditional Transfer Order received
Fri 07/22 9:18 AM
Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - CTO-68 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 7/12/22 regarding transfer of Case No. 1:22-cv-00768-RGA from U.S. District Court District of Delaware (Wilmington). Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:18-ml-02814-AB-PVCx. (car) |
|
Friday, June 24, 2022 | ||
4 | 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Ford Motor Company: For Ford Motor Company waiver sent on 6/24/2022, answer due 8/23/2022. (Singewald, Christian) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/22/2022.] | |
Wednesday, June 15, 2022 | ||
Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/22/2022.] | ||
Thursday, June 09, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company on 6/9/2022. (mpb) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/22/2022.] | |
2 | 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/22/2022.] | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Ford Motor Company ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3892809.) - filed by Robert Nelson, Laura Liaskos, Mary Holderman, Robert Lucas, Lisa Klingenberg, Bailey Layne, Kathy Jones, Nicole Kozma, Lynne Neylan, Shirley Montanez, Fawn Hehkle, Jack Myers, Cory Mueller, Crystal Levert, Eric Hedge, Shelby Howard, Brandon Inks, Timothy Kerns, Alexus Hill, Tiffany Lopez, David Martin, Jr, Elizabeth Knipp, Claudia Jackson, Lacie Mueller, Bradley Mccoy, Jerimiah Hendershott, Carolyn Lamp, Kaitlynn Kirk, Jacob Hoffman, Betty Holmes, Christian Hatmaker, Corinne Kaufman, Eric Martin, Amy Klopf, Jamie Kuhlman, Ann Marie Tegeder, Richard T. Napier, Dawn Johnson, Lori Hite, Chris Mock, Cody Myers, Drew Hinners, Sarah Jakacki, James Heavener, Tracy Keller, Justin Jenkins, Janice Neal, Andrew Kowalak, Shelby Jones, Edward Merrill, Pamela Maffey, Dawn Killien, Debbie Jungnickel, Tammy Jennings, Justin Johnson, Matt Meyers, Dawn Lieb, Carol Heffner, Paige Mccue, Tavil Land, Lexis Kelley, Stephanie Lyon, Ellen Lohr, Meggorie Haven, Kelly Miller, Lana Lanning, Larry Johson, Kent Huffman, Dean Herren, Paul Lettau, Megan Kreis, Amber Lillie, Carol Mackell, Christine Mcclaine, Stephanie Lee, Charlene Keeran, James Modzelewski, Linda Metz, Rosemary Hermanson, Richard Morris, Kala Kolhoff, Tammy Lewis, Geraldine Mcfarland, Pamela Huber, Kimberly Harris, Robert Koon, Jerra Hoops, Jodi Musser, Benjamin Lawrence, Scott Houston, Brianna Long, Wendy Hansen, Ashley Holesko, Alonzo Henson, Andrew Jereb, Cathy Harris, Alexandra Higaki, Kent Keller, Susan Maldonado, Monisa Mcqueen, Andrea Lee, Carissa Mcfarland, Margaret Koon, Raymond Jones, Jim Jordan, Traci Mcmurray, Shaquita Jenkins, Jerome Laine, Stephanie Larrison, Adam Klippel, Jerome Krajcovic, Michael Harvey, Alyssa Larkins, Angela Metcalf, Rachel Mckenna, Christia Klink, Dorothy Huff, Cortney Kuzak, Kenzie Moore, Kaitlyn King, Allison Kadar, Jennifer Lisbon, Kevin Mankin, Regine Lett, Mike Mathias, William Huffman, Julie Horton, Brandy Johnson, Tom Kolke, Brian Haubiel, Mary Houchins, Maryann Hummer, Jessica Mccann, Alfred Massie, Michael Irwin, Claire Howell, Jeremiah Johnson, Chris Helmink, Jessica Ike, Melvin Loth, Jeffery May, Kellee Murley, Jeffery Jones, Melissa Johnson, Alexandra Mcdulin, Saundra Hall, Jennifer Kinker, Kaitlin Launder, Jeff Meadows, Andrew Hizer, Chad Nash, Karen Koster, Jose Martinez, Julie Hesser, Eric Liddle, Ronald Maier, Todd Hill, Michael Lee, Kalicia Mccain, James Horval, Matthew Jordan, Scott Kemp, Jennifer Mazuk, Tina Jarkewicz, Timothy Lucy, Matthew Lightfritz, Richard Hysell, Teresa Mcgee, Sharita Lesure, Jessica Houck, Eric Herman, Sherry Molnar, Tiffany Hubbs, Barry Mccoy, Jennifer Hauser, Kevin Kubec, Jillian Hardman, Brian Kerr, Cheryl Holsinger, Danielle Hamilton, Marcy Mcknight, Jennifer Knabbs, Anthony Huggins, Jacquelyn Harvey, Gregory Lanham, Ricky Monhollen, Nathan Horn, Ashley Morgan, Virginia Hamm, Ruth Martin, Brad Holloway, William Linder, Summer Kay, Charlene Tegeder, Audrey Keister.(mpb) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/22/2022.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |