Michael Patterson et al v. Ford Motor Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Pedro V Castillo |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-04986 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Jul 20, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Delaware, 1:22-cv-00772 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 16, 2023 1:22 AM PST |
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Lund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Michael
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Patterson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samuel Patterson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Patton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Pawlowski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kim Paxton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Peck
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hunter Peffer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frances Pellegrino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Perry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Peters, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marissa Pettit
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amber Phelps
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Piercy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julie Pileggi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Pirl
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tammy Plahs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terynn Plale
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ed Polakoff
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julie Polgar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deanne Porterfield
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Prescott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Prye
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen Quigg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Ramsden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shane Rape
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Raynor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jenna Raynor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jacey Readinger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
April Reese
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Reichard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tyler Reinard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ruth Reparsky
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Rhoads
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie Rhodes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Rhon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erin Richardson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lori Richardson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kris Rico
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Roberts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Rochna
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Rohrer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Billiejo Roles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Ross, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Rossell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charlie Rundle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Runyan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melanie Russell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ed Ruth
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Silvio Santos
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jacob Sapna
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Sapp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gloria Sauri-Santiago
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas Schenck
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna Schiavi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rebekah Schiller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leslie Schwartz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamielynn Schweitzer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Justin Sciulli
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robin Scott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chris B. Seeley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janette Selfridge
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Seybert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fatime Shabani
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Shaffer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harold Shank
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Sheehan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sharon Shepard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danell Shidemantle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bernadette Shipley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas Show
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Heather Siesko
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alex F. Siget
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Micaela Simmons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Sine
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janine Sizemore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rachel Sklaney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danielle Skowronski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laura Slaughenhoupt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Smale
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ellen Smiley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amanda Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brittanie Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Latishia Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicole Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Theresa Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Snatchko
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Sousa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Corri Speakman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brenda Spidle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Spruce
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Stants
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Stern
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Stiffler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gerald Stitt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charity Stivason
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Stoops
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kaycee Stoudt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kurvin Stough
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Stoy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Strother
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lori Sulouff
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lee W. Sutch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle P. Sutch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Swanger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Swineford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tammi Swogger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maggie Szczucki
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laurie Szoldatits
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joanne Taziole
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Teats
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Tembra
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas Tessler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Thomas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Thomas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rhonda Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Timinski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sarah Torbert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amaris Torres
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Tressider
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Troxell, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Tucker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Meir Tuil
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vance Ulasky
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sarah Unger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dawn Utz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Neal Vanderpool
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laura Vanzino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Albert Viall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Talia Vito
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rick Vonbergen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna Wagner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Wain
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erica Wallace
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Todd Wallace
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maureen Walsh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Delores Walters
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Weaver
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melissa Weirich
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brett Weist
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Welch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dana Welcomer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Evelyn Welsko
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Welton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Werner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Wertz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandi Whitaker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David White
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Desiree Whitlow
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Wiegand
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vaness Wiles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Wiley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
April Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marie Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tammy Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wade Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Wojtaszek
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brad Wolfe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Wonders
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Devin Woodward
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Wooten
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Work
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deanna Yerger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Crystal Yoder
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Young
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rhonda Young
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lea Zancha
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Antionette Zavalydriga
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melissa Zeigafuse
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashley Zidak Greathouse
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Holly Zimmerman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Zimmerman
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Thursday, September 01, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Appearance
Thu 09/01 2:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer) |
|
Friday, July 22, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
transfer
MDL - Letter to Counsel (CV 119) - optional html form
Fri 07/22 10:26 AM
Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (car) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 07/22 10:23 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (car) |
|
8 | 8
transfer
Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer)
Fri 07/22 10:16 AM
ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Delaware |
|
Thursday, July 21, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
order
Transferring MDL Case per JPML Order
Thu 07/21 10:08 AM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-68) in MDL No. 2814 -- In re Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation dated 7/12/22. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/22/2022.] |
|
Case electronically transferred to Central District of California. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/22/2022.] | ||
Wednesday, July 20, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
mdlcmp
Copy of Transfer Order/Conditional Transfer Order received
Fri 07/22 10:20 AM
Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - CTO-68 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 7/12/22 regarding transfer of Case No. 1:22-cv-00772-VAC from U.S. District Court District of Delaware (Wilmington). Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:18-ml-02814-AB-PVCx. (car) |
|
Friday, June 24, 2022 | ||
6 | 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Ford Motor Company: For Ford Motor Company waiver sent on 6/24/2022, answer due 8/23/2022. (Singewald, Christian) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/22/2022.] | |
Wednesday, June 15, 2022 | ||
5 | 5 VAC Notice, Consent, Non-Consent, Magistrate Referral (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/22/2022.] | |
4 | 4 ORAL ORDER: This case has been assigned to the District of Delaware's Vacant Judgeship ("VAC"). Detailed information relating to VAC cases may be found in the Court's Announcement of March 3, 2022 and Standing Order No. 2022-VAC-1 (March 9, 2022), which are found on the Court's website. Consistent with the foregoing Announcement and Standing Order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file the "Notice of Consent or Absence of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge," being docketed along with the instant order, no later than sixty (60) days after service of the Complaint on the first defendant that is served. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Notice, Consent, and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, previously docketed in this case, are VACATED. Issued by the Clerk of Court on 6/15/2022. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/22/2022.] | |
Case Assigned to Vacant Judgeship (2022). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/22/2022.] | ||
Thursday, June 09, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company on 6/13/2022. (nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/22/2022.] | |
2 | 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/22/2022.] | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Ford Motor Company ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3892838.) - filed by Eric Shaffer, Erin Richardson, Crystal Yoder, Fatime Shabani, Deanna Yerger, Jacey Readinger, Julie Pileggi, Rhonda Thompson, Christopher Stants, Albert Viall, Ed Ruth, April Reese, Wade Williams, John Troxell, Jr, James Thompson, Amanda Smith, Rebekah Schiller, Rachel Sklaney, Charlie Rundle, Michelle Snatchko, Tammy Plahs, Antionette Zavalydriga, Ed Polakoff, Gary Peck, Ashley Zidak Greathouse, Evelyn Welsko, Melanie Russell, Robert Lund, Delores Walters, Donald Smale, Kevin Wooten, Gary Rhoads, Joseph Pirl, Kurvin Stough, Lori Sulouff, Talia Vito, Jessica Werner, Matthew Stoy, Christopher Swineford, Danielle Skowronski, Frances Pellegrino, Bernadette Shipley, Michael Rohrer, Jennifer Young, William Wonders, Thomas Sapp, Lori Richardson, Tammy Williams, Meir Tuil, Stephanie Rhodes, William Welton, Robert Tressider, Andrew Smith, Douglas Show, Harold Shank, Joshua Perry, Richard Work, William Sine, Gary Michael, David White, Maureen Walsh, Devin Woodward, Vance Ulasky, Danell Shidemantle, Melissa Zeigafuse, Elizabeth Rhon, Brad Wolfe, Charity Stivason, Micaela Simmons, Shane Rape, Dana Welcomer, Lisa Stiffler, Jennifer Tembra, Timothy Sheehan, Brenda Spidle, Scott Williams, Gary Rochna, Janette Selfridge, Amber Phelps, Ellen Smiley, Sarah Unger, Dawn Utz, Melissa Weirich, Daniel Ramsden, Anthony Swanger, Rhonda Young, Julie Polgar, William Prye, Robin Scott, Kaycee Stoudt, Kevin Patton, Terynn Plale, Marissa Pettit, Ruth Reparsky, Dennis Pawlowski, Christopher Thomas, Elizabeth Stoops, Chris B. Seeley, Jacob Sapna, Corri Speakman, Holly Zimmerman, Neal Vanderpool, Desiree Whitlow, Tyler Reinard, Joseph Wiegand, Justin Sciulli, Michael Weaver, Gloria Sauri-Santiago, Richard Strother, Jamielynn Schweitzer, Gerald Stitt, Douglas Tessler, Michelle P. Sutch, Brandi Whitaker, Rick Vonbergen, Lisa Runyan, Lea Zancha, Brittanie Smith, Donna Schiavi, Jennifer Rossell, James Roberts, Sharon Shepard, Brian Seybert, Janine Sizemore, Jeffrey Teats, Deanne Porterfield, Silvio Santos, Jennifer Prescott, Theresa Smith, Karen Quigg, John Thomas, Donald Peters, Jr, Charles Wertz, Sarah Torbert, Marie Williams, Dennis Wilson, Mark Zimmerman, Michael Patterson, Heather Siesko, Thomas Piercy, Pamela Welch, Billiejo Roles, Kris Rico, Richard Wiley, April Williams, David Reichard, Maggie Szczucki, Scott Sousa, Todd Wallace, Laura Slaughenhoupt, Jenna Raynor, Laurie Szoldatits, Amaris Torres, Donald Tucker, Matthew Wain, Alex F. Siget, Brett Weist, Erica Wallace, Lee W. Sutch, Joanne Taziole, Hunter Peffer, Laura Vanzino, Douglas Schenck, Mark Timinski, Vaness Wiles, Donald Ross, Sr, Samuel Patterson, Jessica Stern, Kimberly Spruce, Tammi Swogger, Leslie Schwartz, Kim Paxton, James Raynor, Timothy Wojtaszek, Donna Wagner, Latishia Smith, Nicole Smith.(nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/22/2022.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |