William Greenier et al v. Ford Motor Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Pedro V Castillo |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-05000 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 20, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Delaware, 1:22-cv-00806 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 16, 2023 12:26 AM PST |
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrea Beard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Greenier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sherry Grice
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Floyd Grier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jacquelyn Griffin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laura Griffin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terese Griffin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dana Griffith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Grimes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Grimm
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Denise Grizzle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yvonne Grogan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ann Gunby
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Enrique Gutierrez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dawn Hall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Harbison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna Hardaway
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sue Hardy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tara Hardy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie Harlow
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Harpe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Harper
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Renita Harris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Harrison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wanda Harrison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sheila Hawkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Malisia Hebb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chandra Height
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Hellerman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lionel Henry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yvonne Henry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shannon Hensler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carmen Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Higgins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie High
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elijah Hill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry Hirak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rebecca Hockaday
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aleisha Holbrook-England
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Holcomb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emilee Holland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen Holley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tammy Holloway
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christin Holt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ire Hornsby
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jada Howell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Hoyak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Regina Hudson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Humphrey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Hunt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stacey Husted
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victor Ilarraza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sophia Irons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Jackson
T-67736 California Medical Facility P O Box 2500
Vacaville, CA 95696 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kinderly Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melanie Jackson
23 Magnolia St, #15
Goleta, CA 93117 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michele Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Jenkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christy Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Johnson
CDC #K-09043 Avenal State Prison P O Box 9
Avenal, CA 93204 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mariah Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Susan Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teresa Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kiyoko Johnson-Essley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laura Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shelby Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tenisha Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danielle Joyce
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Kaido
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jesse Kasman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mindy Keene
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandee Kelley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeff Kent
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sarah Kent
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sam Kercheval
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Kingsley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Kirby
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Kirk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sandra Kirves
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julia Kitchens
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Kneiser
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexis Knight
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dorothy Laititi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Landen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gina Laney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Neal Lange
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jackie Lanier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Destiny Laster
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joy Lawson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristi Lawton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tonya Leath
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kasey Leatherwood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harold Lemley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Lenz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cecilia Leon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amanda Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ella Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randy Lewis
434 Melody Lane
Placentia, CA 92780 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Lindsey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gerald Lisk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Long
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rebecca Long
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roby Lrle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan Lull
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Savannah Lumpkin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamalullah Magee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Flora Mallory
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tara Maloney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samantha Mandich
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nichole Manley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Mann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daisy Manning
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bobby Marchman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Violet Marchman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angla Marmie
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alecia Marshall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ethan Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tami Massey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shanice Mathis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Matias
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Candy Maynard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Mccollough
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Devon Mccollough
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juanita Mccollum
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wanda Mcdonald
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brent Mcfall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rebecca Mcfall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jasmine Mcgurk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darlene Mclain
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laura Mcmichen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vanessa Mcnelley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Medlock
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tim Meek
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Michael
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Miles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eugenia Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lynda Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zachariah Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandi Mitchell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rachel Mitchell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chad Monnier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tara Montgomery
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Moran
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cathy Morgan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathy Morgan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diane Morris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roberta Morris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shirley Morrison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lea Morton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carol Moseley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tabitha Moses
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Motter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Murphy
7069 Isle Ct.
Rancho Cucamong, CA 91739 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victoria Murphy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Neal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen Neal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vanessa Nelson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chadwich Neumeier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carole Newbern
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carolyn Nilson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tracy Norton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chris Novak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Odum
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angel Orsini
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hannah Oswald
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Russell Parker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Paton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sheila Patterson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wendy Payne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jacqueline Payton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erik Pehrsson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tamara Pelfrey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jackie Ponthier
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 30, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Appearance
Tue 08/30 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer) |
|
Friday, July 22, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
transfer
MDL - Letter to Counsel (CV 119) - optional html form
Fri 07/22 5:30 PM
Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (lh) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 07/22 5:29 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
transfer
Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer)
Fri 07/22 12:19 PM
ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Delaware |
|
Thursday, July 21, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
order
Transferring MDL Case per JPML Order
Thu 07/21 12:09 PM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/22/2022.] |
|
Wednesday, July 20, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
mdlcmp
Copy of Transfer Order/Conditional Transfer Order received
Fri 07/22 5:28 PM
Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - 68 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 7/12/2022 regarding transfer of Case No. 1:22-cv-00806-CFC from U.S. District Court District of Delaware (Wilmington). Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:18-ml-02814 - AB (PVCx). (lh) |
|
Friday, July 01, 2022 | ||
4 | 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Ford Motor Company: For Ford Motor Company waiver sent on 7/1/2022, answer due 8/30/2022. (Singewald, Christian) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/22/2022.] | |
Wednesday, June 29, 2022 | ||
Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/22/2022.] | ||
Friday, June 17, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company on 6/17/2022. (mpb) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/22/2022.] | |
2 | 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/22/2022.] | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Ford Motor Company ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3898422.) - filed by Shelby Jones, Rebecca Hockaday, Hannah Oswald, Laura Jones, Angel Orsini, Lionel Henry, Michael Harbison, Ethan Martin, Alexis Knight, Laura Mcmichen, Larry Hunt, Yvonne Henry, Vanessa Nelson, Christopher Mccollough, Alecia Marshall, Dorothy Laititi, Michele Jackson, Lisa Hoyak, Dawn Hall, Joy Lawson, Sue Hardy, Erik Pehrsson, Stephanie Harlow, Terese Griffin, Jackie Ponthier, Cathy Morgan, John Humphrey, Zachariah Miller, Julia Kitchens, Andrew Odum, Stephanie High, Donna Hardaway, Charles Lindsey, Rebecca Long, Vanessa Mcnelley, Diane Morris, Gerald Lisk, Jamalullah Magee, Mary Kirk, Andrew Grimes, Mindy Keene, Tammy Holloway, Sheila Patterson, Tracy Norton, Sophia Irons, Aleisha Holbrook-England, Karen Neal, Juanita Mccollum, Elijah Hill, Kathy Morgan, Candy Maynard, Linda Landen, Brandee Kelley, Tenisha Jones, Kimberly Grimm, Andrea Beard, Scott Kingsley, Russell Parker, Wendy Payne, Lynda Miller, Chris Novak, Wanda Mcdonald, Jesse Kasman, Tamara Pelfrey, Jerry Hirak, Carolyn Nilson, Amanda Lewis, Sam Kercheval, Malisia Hebb, Patricia Moran, John Lenz, Daisy Manning, Danielle Joyce, Tonya Leath, Victoria Murphy, Karen Holley, Teresa Johnson, Ann Gunby, Mary Kneiser, Brent Mcfall, Rebecca Mcfall, Rachel Mitchell, Sheila Hawkins, Savannah Lumpkin, Paul Paton, Richard Harpe, James Harrison, Mariah Johnson, Randy Lewis, Floyd Grier, Tara Hardy, Yvonne Grogan, Edward Higgins, Jacquelyn Griffin, Violet Marchman, Ella Lewis, Susan Johnson, Victor Ilarraza, Jasmine Mcgurk, Lea Morton, Carmen Hernandez, Carol Moseley, Kenneth Johnson, Brandi Mitchell, James Jackson, Pamela Long, Christy Johnson, Cecilia Leon, Bobby Marchman, Jonathan Lull, Shirley Morrison, David Medlock, Regina Hudson, Jacqueline Payton, Gina Laney, Melanie Jackson, Jada Howell, Emilee Holland, Michael Kaido, Kiyoko Johnson-Essley, Stephen Kirby, Scott Mann, Matthew Harper, Stacey Husted, Renita Harris, Destiny Laster, Wanda Harrison, Angla Marmie, Denise Grizzle, Roberta Morris, Shanice Mathis, James Neal, Chadwich Neumeier, William Greenier, Jeff Kent, Enrique Gutierrez, Tara Montgomery, Christin Holt, Joshua Holcomb, Donald Motter, Eric Murphy, Shannon Hensler, Tara Maloney, Kristi Lawton, Eugenia Miller, Sandra Kirves, Daniel Hellerman, Samantha Mandich, Maria Matias, Devon Mccollough, Stephen Michael, Sarah Kent, Chad Monnier, Charles Miles, Roby Lrle, Nichole Manley, Dana Griffith, Kinderly Jackson, Tami Massey, Darlene Mclain, Tabitha Moses, Ire Hornsby, Sherry Grice, Harold Lemley, Kasey Leatherwood, Flora Mallory, Kevin Jenkins, Laura Griffin, Chandra Height, Carole Newbern, Tim Meek, Neal Lange, Jackie Lanier.(mpb) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/22/2022.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |