Jones et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Pedro V Castillo |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-05059 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 21, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Delaware, 1:22-cv-00848 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 17, 2023 1:21 AM PST |
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mickey Hager
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trenashia Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Latham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Betty Leasure
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashley Lesher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deanna Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie Liposchak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sabrina Lovejoy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clayton Lovell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Magoc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Mahlman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Manning, -
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Marcum
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Marfield
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Marshall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melissa Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shirley Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Katelyn Maxwell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Mays
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Mcdonnell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Mcguire, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Serena Mcguire, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clark Mckee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sean Mckee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janet Mcnemar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cynthia Means
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Morganne Mease
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tami Medler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amanda Merrill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Courtney Miles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Milligan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emily Montelione
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maurice Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amy Morrison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Calvin Morrison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rayna Moses
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johnnie Mounts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lottie Moyer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cassandra Mullins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cody Mullins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Mullins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Judy Mullins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lois Mullins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sr Judy Murphy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dawn Myers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Nash
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelly Newcomb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samantha Noll
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Norris
Kevin Norris Law Offices 385 North Arrowhead Avenue, 4th Floor
San Bernardino, CA 92415 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Null
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amy O'Brien
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William O'Brien
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Helga Olafardottir
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Justin Ooten
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nea Osborne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Ozzbourne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dixie Pack
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Panepucci
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hunter Patrick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandon Pauley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dallas Pauley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelly Pauley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Annye Pavlus
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Payton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jean Perdue
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Perry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Phillips
California State Prison Lancaster 44750 60th Street West
Lancaster, CA 93536 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vicki Pickens
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Preston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alphery Prince
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Raiford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anita Redden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Reed
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roger Reed
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mara Regling
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teresa Richards
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danielle Richmond
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marcia Rigsby
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Rigsby
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Noah Robertson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Robinette
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carl Root
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sara Rowe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelsey Rowland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carrie Roy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Ruble
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lorenda Russell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Sampson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adam Santonia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Schaffer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leonard Schaffer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mikeal Scheller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Schroeder
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jordan Searls
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna Self
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ralph Serls
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bonnie Shannon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Curtis Sheets
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Shoemaker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashley Shuman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leeann Skiver
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ebonie Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kara Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathy Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Norma Spaulding
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rickey Spurlock
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patience Squires
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randall Stafford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamie Stanton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Betty Stephens
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Stowers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Stump
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Sublett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Argyle Swiger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amanda Tackett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harold Tate
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Margarett Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Betty Thomas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arthur Tice
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Tice
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Trump
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Molly Tucker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tracey Turman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Turner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Underwood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robin Urick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna Utt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Vance
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adam Vest
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Heather Vollmer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela Walton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thelma Warford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johnisha Webster
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Weekley , Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Welch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Krista White
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Wiley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victoria Wiley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Howard Wilford , Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dayna Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Williams
CDC H-06622 Imperial Centinela State Prison P O Box 921
Imperial, CA 92251 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
April Williamson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jesse Wiseman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Wysong
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Yates
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Theresa Yates
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, August 30, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer) |
|
Friday, July 22, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (lh) |
|
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
![]() ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Delaware |
|
Thursday, July 21, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - 68 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 7/12/2022 regarding transfer of Case No. 1:22-cv-00848-MN from U.S. District Court District of Delaware (Wilmington). Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:18-ml-02814 - AB (PVCx). (lh) |
|
5 | 5
![]() TRANSFER ORDER - This case is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Central District of California. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel on 7/12/2022 and certified by the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Central District of California 7/20/2022. ***Civil Case Terminated. (dlw) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/22/2022.] |
|
Friday, July 08, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Wednesday, July 06, 2022 | ||
Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/22/2022.] | ||
Wednesday, June 22, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |