Tywilla Meadors et al v. Ford Motor Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Pedro V Castillo |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-05031 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Jul 21, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Delaware, 1:22-cv-00820 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 17, 2023 12:25 AM PST |
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Cooper
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tywilla Meadors
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Medrano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Meiborg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Walter Meier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frank Meierhoff
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lily Melendez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marisela Melendez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tramaine Menard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Venancio Mendez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nancy Mendoza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Noe Mendoza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sebastian Mendoza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Veronica Mesa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Micah Middleton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christine Mikolajczyk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rachel Mikosh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cody Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Miller
SCP-4 Corcoran State Prison PO Box 8800
Corcoran, CA 93212 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamesha Mills
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Mills
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nathan Milne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Oscar Miranda
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bill G. Mitchell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Mitchell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pablo Molina
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Katrina Monceaux
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Walter Monroy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danielle Montanez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ricardo Montelongo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Montelongo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Montemayor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raul Montes De Oca
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashley Mooney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeri Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leigena Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Misty Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Moore
REG 74483-011 Springfield Medical Center for Federal Prisoners P O Box 4000
Springfield, MO 65801 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christina Morales
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edgar Morales
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marie Morales
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melissa Moreno
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Morris
Pro-Se 470 Cherry Ave #5
Long Beach, CA 90802 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kareina Morrison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Abel Mosqueda
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sarah Mueller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna Muldrew
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eva Mullanax
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laura Mullins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Earl Munselle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zachary Murphy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cheryl Murrah
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Myers
2130 N ARrowhead Bl, Ste 205
San Bernardino, CA 92405 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rebecca Nagy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Blanca Najera
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hoyt Nance
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sharon Naylore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tiffany Neal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melanie Neuman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jenna Newman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Neil Nguyen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Nickel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Howard Nixon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Nixon
9602 Langdon Ave., #100
North Hills, CA 91343 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pablo Nocetti
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juan Noriega
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nathan Nunez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Veronica Ochoa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lilia Ogaz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Martin Olgin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yolanda Olivares
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Oliver
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alberto Olivo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Oscar Orona
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ever Orozco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tedra Ortega
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anna Ortiz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Ortiz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Doyle Osteen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dixie Owen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sandi Owens
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cheryl Owsley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chris Oyler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Graciela Ozuna
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joe Paris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Josh Pariseau
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Parker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thamara Pathiranage
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Justin Patschke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jarrod Patterson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Blakely Pattison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yolanda Paz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bobby Pearson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janet Peck
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kendra Pelham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfredo Pena
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marcos Pena
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Priscilla Pena
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carla Pender
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roy Pender
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristi Penna
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Peppers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maximo Perales
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chelsea Gabrielle Perez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Francisco Perez
J 05284 CCI PO Box 1906
Tehachapi, CA 93581 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gracie Perez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Greysha Perez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Margie Perez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melissa Perez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Oscar Perez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wanda Perez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kassidy Perkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sibbie Perkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rachell Peterson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Petrone
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Phelps
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Phillips
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Pierce
193 Pearwood Avenue
Arroyo Grande, CA 93420 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zachary Pinon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sammie Pitrucha
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Misti Plunk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosemary Polanco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Billy Ponder
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashley Poor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joe Poore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elisa Post
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Misty Potter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kirsten Powe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristi Powell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Powell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shanda Price
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Manuel Prieto
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Qualls
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julian Quiroga
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laura Quiroga
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marabella Quiroga
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christina Radford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Ralston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashley Ramirez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Damian Ramirez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Ramirez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ismael Ramirez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roman Ramirez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosalinda Ramirez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sandy Ramirez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexis Ramos
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julie Ramos
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tonja Rangel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Raschke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Henry Ray
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jimmy Redden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dorbert Redmon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dave Reed
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marshall Reed
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wendy Reiger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Reyes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bonnie Reyes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juan Reyes
5714 Sorrel Hills Avenue
Chino Hills, CA 91709 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vanessa Reyes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bryan Reyna
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cynthia Reyna
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Reyna
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie Reyna
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jimmie Reynolds
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cynthia Rice
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terrance Riggs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alyssa Rios
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Felicia Rios
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Reno Rios
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Veronica Rivas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Robbins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Roberts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shane Roberts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Roberts
201811692 30755 B Auld Road
Murrieta, CA 92563 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rhonda Robinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roberto Rocha
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gladys Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregg Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ilse Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raquel Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rene Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Santiago Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Antonio Romagosa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Guadalupe Romo
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/10/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, February 16, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
stip
Dismiss Party
Fri 02/16 7:31 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Ford Motor Company filed by Plaintiffs Karen Moore, Anthony Petrone, Doyle Osteen, Rachell Peterson, Michael Myers, Cynthia Reyna, Roman Ramirez, Laura Quiroga, David Robbins, Yolanda Olivares, Richard Nixon, Justin Patschke, Melanie Neuman, Cody Miller, Kassidy Perkins, Elisa Post, Ilse Rodriguez, Reno Rios, Cheryl Owsley, Cheryl Murrah, Daniel Morris, Joe Paris, Anthony Reyes, Tywilla Meadors, Veronica Mesa, Jessica Parker, Julian Quiroga, Tedra Ortega, William Qualls, Zachary Murphy, Blakely Pattison.(Attorney Eric D Pearson added to party Tywilla Meadors(pty:pla), Attorney Eric D Pearson added to party Veronica Mesa(pty:pla), Attorney Eric D Pearson added to party Cody Miller(pty:pla), Attorney Eric D Pearson added to party Karen Moore(pty:pla), Attorney Eric D Pearson added to party Daniel Morris(pty:pla), Attorney Eric D Pearson added to party Zachary Murphy(pty:pla), Attorney Eric D Pearson added to party Cheryl Murrah(pty:pla), Attorney Eric D Pearson added to party Michael Myers(pty:pla), Attorney Eric D Pearson added to party Melanie Neuman(pty:pla), Attorney Eric D Pearson added to party Richard Nixon(pty:pla), Attorney Eric D Pearson added to party Yolanda Olivares(pty:pla), Attorney Eric D Pearson added to party Tedra Ortega(pty:pla), Attorney Eric D Pearson added to party Doyle Osteen(pty:pla), Attorney Eric D Pearson added to party Cheryl Owsley(pty:pla), Attorney Eric D Pearson added to party Joe Paris(pty:pla), Attorney Eric D Pearson added to party Jessica Parker(pty:pla), Attorney Eric D Pearson added to party Justin Patschke(pty:pla), Attorney Eric D Pearson added to party Blakely Pattison(pty:pla), Attorney Eric D Pearson added to party Kassidy Perkins(pty:pla), Attorney Eric D Pearson added to party Rachell Peterson(pty:pla), Attorney Eric D Pearson added to party Anthony Petrone(pty:pla), Attorney Eric D Pearson added to party Elisa Post(pty:pla), Attorney Eric D Pearson added to party William Qualls(pty:pla), Attorney Eric D Pearson added to party Julian Quiroga(pty:pla), Attorney Eric D Pearson added to party Laura Quiroga(pty:pla), Attorney Eric D Pearson added to party Roman Ramirez(pty:pla), Attorney Eric D Pearson added to party Anthony Reyes(pty:pla), Attorney Eric D Pearson added to party Cynthia Reyna(pty:pla), Attorney Eric D Pearson added to party Reno Rios(pty:pla), Attorney Eric D Pearson added to party David Robbins(pty:pla), Attorney Eric D Pearson added to party Ilse Rodriguez(pty:pla))(Pearson, Eric) |
|
Wednesday, August 31, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Appearance
Wed 08/31 4:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer) |
|
Monday, July 25, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
transfer
MDL - Letter to Counsel (CV 119) - optional html form
Mon 07/25 4:40 PM
Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (et) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 07/25 4:39 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (et) |
|
8 | 8
transfer
Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer)
Mon 07/25 3:31 PM
ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Delaware |
|
Thursday, July 21, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
mdlcmp
Copy of Transfer Order/Conditional Transfer Order received
Mon 07/25 4:38 PM
Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - 68 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 7/12/2022 regarding transfer of Case No. 1:22-cv-00820-VAC from USDC District of Delaware (Wilmington). Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:18-ml-2814-AB (PVCx). (et) |
|
7 | 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-68) in MDL No. 2814 -- In re Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation dated 7/12/22. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/25/2022.] | |
Case electronically transferred to Central District of California. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/25/2022.] | ||
Friday, July 01, 2022 | ||
6 | 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Ford Motor Company: For Ford Motor Company waiver sent on 7/1/2022, answer due 8/30/2022. (Singewald, Christian) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/25/2022.] | |
Wednesday, June 29, 2022 | ||
5 | 5 VAC Notice, Consent, Non-Consent, Magistrate Referral (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/25/2022.] | |
4 | 4 ORAL ORDER: This case has been assigned to the District of Delaware's Vacant Judgeship ("VAC"). Detailed information relating to VAC cases may be found in the Court's Announcement of March 3, 2022 and Standing Order No. 2022-VAC-1 (March 9, 2022), which are found on the Court's website. Consistent with the foregoing Announcement and Standing Order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file the "Notice of Consent or Absence of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge," being docketed along with the instant order, no later than sixty (60) days after service of the Complaint on the first defendant that is served. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Notice, Consent, and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, previously docketed in this case, are VACATED. Issued by the Clerk of Court on 6/29/2022. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/25/2022.] | |
Case Assigned to Vacant Judgeship (2022). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/25/2022.] | ||
Friday, June 17, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company on 6/24/2022. (nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/25/2022.] | |
2 | 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/25/2022.] | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Ford Motor Company ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3898677.) - filed by Scott Nickel, Karen Moore, Jimmie Reynolds, Neil Nguyen, Stephanie Reyna, Danielle Montanez, Micah Middleton, Anthony Petrone, Doyle Osteen, Kirsten Powe, Donna Muldrew, Ricardo Montelongo, Wendy Reiger, Sammie Pitrucha, Rachell Peterson, Dixie Owen, Michael Myers, Oscar Orona, Kareina Morrison, Josh Pariseau, Rachel Mikosh, Veronica Rivas, Michael Miller, Lily Melendez, James Roberts, Ismael Ramirez, Shane Roberts, Sarah Mueller, Marabella Quiroga, Anna Ortiz, Cynthia Reyna, Ashley Mooney, Christine Mikolajczyk, Marcos Pena, Roy Pender, Kristi Powell, Rosalinda Ramirez, Priscilla Pena, Chelsea Gabrielle Perez, Ever Orozco, Tramaine Menard, Nathan Nunez, Edgar Morales, Alyssa Rios, Vanessa Reyes, Laura Mullins, Leigena Moore, Marshall Reed, Rosemary Polanco, Antonio Romagosa, Donna Moore, Roman Ramirez, Zachary Pinon, Sandi Owens, Veronica Ochoa, Howard Nixon, Venancio Mendez, Jessica Reyna, Robert Oliver, Cynthia Rice, Felicia Rios, Laura Quiroga, Bryan Reyna, Jessica Rodriguez, Billy Ponder, Juan Noriega, David Robbins, Jeri Moore, Juan Reyes, Janet Peck, Yolanda Olivares, Pablo Molina, Elizabeth Ramirez, Yolanda Paz, Oscar Perez, Richard Nixon, Justin Patschke, Dorbert Redmon, Christina Morales, Melanie Neuman, Sebastian Mendoza, Roberto Rocha, Jessica Ortiz, Ashley Poor, Gladys Rodriguez, Joe Poore, George Ralston, David Mitchell, Santiago Rodriguez, Maximo Perales, Gregg Rodriguez, Terrance Riggs, Jamesha Mills, Oscar Miranda, Sharon Naylore, Alfredo Pena, Linda Meiborg, Cody Miller, Noe Mendoza, Raul Montes De Oca, Walter Meier, Kassidy Perkins, Kendra Pelham, Tiffany Neal, Elizabeth Cooper, Thamara Pathiranage, William Roberts, Elisa Post, Julie Ramos, Ilse Rodriguez, Jessica Montemayor, Tonja Rangel, Hoyt Nance, Christina Radford, Earl Munselle, Carla Pender, Blanca Najera, Bobby Pearson, Wanda Perez, Thomas Peppers, Alexis Ramos, Michael Powell, Abel Mosqueda, Reno Rios, Cheryl Owsley, Cheryl Murrah, Daniel Morris, Ronald Moore, Pablo Nocetti, Jenna Newman, Alberto Olivo, Melissa Perez, Michael Mills, Eva Mullanax, Nathan Milne, Joe Paris, Bill G. Mitchell, Sibbie Perkins, Nancy Mendoza, Sandy Ramirez, Rene Rodriguez, John Phillips, Dave Reed, Anthony Reyes, Rhonda Robinson, Tywilla Meadors, Lilia Ogaz, Veronica Mesa, Damian Ramirez, Marie Morales, Misty Moore, Henry Ray, Jimmy Redden, Steven Montelongo, Gracie Perez, Jessica Parker, Julian Quiroga, Guadalupe Romo, Tedra Ortega, Walter Monroy, Greysha Perez, Linda Pierce, Misti Plunk, Manuel Prieto, Martin Olgin, Ashley Ramirez, William Qualls, Kristi Penna, Raquel Rodriguez, Margie Perez, Marisela Melendez, Zachary Murphy, David Phelps, Misty Potter, Jessica Raschke, Melissa Moreno, Timothy Medrano, Blakely Pattison, Jarrod Patterson, Francisco Perez, Rebecca Nagy, Frank Meierhoff, Katrina Monceaux, Bonnie Reyes, Shanda Price, Chris Oyler, Graciela Ozuna.(nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/25/2022.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |