Dylan Higgins et al v. Ford Motor Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Pedro V Castillo |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-04994 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 20, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Delaware, 1:22-cv-00802 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 16, 2023 1:06 AM PST |
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Hennig
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dylan Higgins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jodie Hill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Misty Hill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chastity Hite
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen Hodgkinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Hofer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathleen Hoffman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Hoffman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Taylor Hoffman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Hoffrichter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lee Hofstad
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marissa Hols
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah Homer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Hoops
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Hopple
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adrienne Hornback
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amanda Horsman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hal Horton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Horton
494 N Mountain Ave, Ste C
Upland, CA 91786 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Holly Hough
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tina Houser
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Howard, -
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arthur Hubert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shawn Hublar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stacie Hudson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Hudson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robin Huffman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Caleb Hull
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anna Hussey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paula Hyatt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Illsley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristofer Impallomeni
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victoria Irvin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jill Ivey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shelby Ivey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Ivins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danyella Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emerald Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Heather Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marvin Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terri Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Jacques
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randy Jagers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allyson Jaggers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sourabh Jain
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tiffany Janicezek
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terry Jarrell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lynda Jazwinski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jaime Jeffreys
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Jensen
In Pro Per P O Box 4372
Ann Arbor, MI 48106 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cara Jessa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elba Jimenez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diana Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gina Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lizajane Johnston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dea Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Holly Kane
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie Kary
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Kavanaugh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frances Keene
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Keene
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Myles Kehoe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Keil
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samantha Keller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chris Kelley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Kelley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sean Kennedy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charlotte Kent
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen Kerns
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Kerouac
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Key
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marzena Kiernan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cody Kieskowski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Connie Kimball
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela King
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark King
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Susan King
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anna Kint
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Kirkland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laura Kirkland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Theotis Kirnes, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rachel Kling
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teresa Knowles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Konegan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gladys Kopp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Koza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Kraff
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janice Kreider
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Kroeker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Katrina Kruck
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Kruse
5951 John Avenue
Long Beach, CA 90805 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gail Kuhn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ricky Lafont
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allyson Landers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jackie Lanfair
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debora Lanham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Lanni
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rafael Larrubia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elaine Larsen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Renee Larson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luis Lasanta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Latza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Laubach
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sandra Lauesen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Lawrence
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Layne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kennesha Lee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashley Leininger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Francy Lemos
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Destenne' Leonard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Leonhardt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amberly Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashley Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Connor Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosaura Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rachel Lightsey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Whitney Liller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samantha Lincoln
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marcia Lind
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Lindsay
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristen Lindsey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bill Lipsky
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Candace Lobel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tiffany Lokietek
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Loney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Long
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Long
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelly Longo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela Lopez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terrance Lucas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Luisi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Luna
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Lundeen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bryan Lyons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debra Lyons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela Macdonald
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathy Macdonald
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Mackey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Maisonette
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nancy Makela
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samantha Maletta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Malhiot
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amber Malicoate
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas Mann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelley Manning
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Theresa Marina-Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tony Marinov
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nadine Markin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Markley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessalyn Marrero
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paula Marsell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Heather Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Penny Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terry Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelly Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Martyn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rodney Mason
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shawn Masse
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rachel Massey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mallory Massingille
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Massman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Mathis
8675 Brook Glen Ln.
Huntersville, NC 28078 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shena Matter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Mau
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kent Maxwell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shelby May
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Mays
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dianne McCormick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julie McCoy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael McDonald
P O Box 2175
Pomona, CA 91769 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eleanor Mcabee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Mcclellan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Mccoy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Mcgrew
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ted Mcgrew
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tori Mchenry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ahlysa Mckinney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shannera Mckinney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeff Mclain
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexandra Mcmurren
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Mcreynolds
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Don Mctaggart
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wesley Mcvay
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Meade
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melissa Meade
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Medio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenny Melendez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael O. Smith
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/10/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, August 30, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Appearance
Tue 08/30 4:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer) |
|
Tuesday, July 26, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
transfer
MDL - Letter to Counsel (CV 119) - optional html form
Tue 07/26 9:19 AM
Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (ghap) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 07/26 9:17 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
transfer
Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer)
Tue 07/26 8:54 AM
ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Delaware |
|
Thursday, July 21, 2022 | ||
5 | 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-68) regarding MDL No. 2814. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 7/12/2022. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/26/2022.] | |
Case transferred to the United States District Court for the Central District of California. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/26/2022.] | ||
Wednesday, July 20, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
mdlcmp
Copy of Transfer Order/Conditional Transfer Order received
Tue 07/26 9:03 AM
Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - 68 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 7/12/2022 regarding transfer of Case No. 1:22-cv-802-RGA from District of Delaware (Wilmington). Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:18-ml-2814-AB (PVCx). (ghap) |
|
Friday, July 01, 2022 | ||
4 | 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Ford Motor Company: For Ford Motor Company waiver sent on 7/1/2022, answer due 8/30/2022. (Singewald, Christian) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/26/2022.] | |
Wednesday, June 29, 2022 | ||
Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/26/2022.] | ||
Friday, June 17, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company on 6/17/2022. (mpb) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/26/2022.] | |
2 | 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/26/2022.] | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Ford Motor Company ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3898399.) - filed by Debra Lyons, Renee Larson, Shelby Ivey, Tori Mchenry, James Lanni, Melissa Meade, Alexandra Mcmurren, Robin Huffman, Deborah Homer, John Lundeen, Gail Kuhn, Theresa Marina-Lewis, Allyson Landers, Tiffany Janicezek, Caleb Hull, Elizabeth Mcreynolds, Kennesha Lee, Kelly Martinez, Diana Johnson, Randy Jagers, Ronald Key, Kimberly Hopple, Amanda Horsman, Karen Hodgkinson, Luis Lasanta, Douglas Mann, Sourabh Jain, Amber Malicoate, Lisa Medio, Kristofer Impallomeni, Joseph Hoops, Julie Mccoy, Lisa Meade, Jennifer Kelley, Destenne' Leonard, Kathleen Hoffman, Heather Jackson, Michelle Hennig, Jaime Jeffreys, John Ivins, David Mays, Thomas Maisonette, Victoria Irvin, Elaine Larsen, Debora Lanham, Dianne Mccormick, Richard Hoffman, Rodney Mason, Katrina Kruck, Kathy Macdonald, George Leonhardt, Rosaura Lewis, Robert Luisi, Jennifer Layne, Rafael Larrubia, Theotis Kirnes, Jr, Daniel Kroeker, Jessica Mccoy, Jill Ivey, Teresa Knowles, Shawn Hublar, Christopher Koza, Francy Lemos, Sean Kennedy, Lisa Kavanaugh, Connor Lewis, John Mackey, Terry Martin, Kelly Longo, Emerald Jackson, Robert Laubach, Connie Kimball, Christopher Mcclellan, Michael McDonald, Lee Hofstad, Jeff Mclain, Frances Keene, Rachel Lightsey, Mallory Massingille, Susan King, Gladys Kopp, Arthur Hubert, Christopher Loney, Jason Lawrence, Hal Horton, Wesley Mcvay, Tina Houser, Donna Jones, Barbara Luna, Misty Hill, Rachel Kling, Adrienne Hornback, Michael Hoffrichter, Daniel Illsley, Chastity Hite, Samantha Maletta, Kent Maxwell, Holly Kane, Rachel Massey, Lynda Jazwinski, Paul Kraff, Marcia Lind, Anna Kint, Angela Lopez, Whitney Liller, Andrew Lindsay, Gary Mau, Janice Kreider, Paula Hyatt, Amberly Lewis, Dea Jones, Paul Jensen, Ashley Lewis, Lizajane Johnston, Cody Kieskowski, Eleanor Mcabee, Thomas Mathis, Charlotte Kent, Terrance Lucas, Allyson Jaggers, Elba Jimenez, Ahlysa Mckinney, Timothy Jacques, Danyella Jackson, Joseph Konegan, Sandra Lauesen, Matthew Malhiot, Charles Markley, Mary Horton, Robert Latza, Terry Jarrell, Holly Hough, David Long, Penny Martin, Nadine Markin, David Howard, Jennifer Long, Taylor Hoffman, Bryan Lyons, Jessalyn Marrero, Don Mctaggart, Robert Kruse, Shawn Masse, Dylan Higgins, Laura Kirkland, Chris Kelley, Shelby May, Karen Kerns, Kenny Melendez, Tony Marinov, Ashley Leininger, Joseph Keene, Marissa Hols, Candace Lobel, Nancy Makela, Heather Martin, Marvin Jackson, Angela Jackson, Samantha Keller, Angela King, Ricky Lafont, Bill Lipsky, Paula Marsell, Anna Hussey, Tiffany Lokietek, Angela Macdonald, Marzena Kiernan, Myles Kehoe, William Hudson, Richard Massman, Stephanie Kary, Mark King, Barbara Mcgrew, Robert Martyn, John Hofer, Cara Jessa, Terri Jackson, Jodie Hill, Shena Matter, Kristen Lindsey, Michael O. Smith, Gina Johnson, Stacie Hudson, Jennifer Kerouac, Ted Mcgrew, Shannera Mckinney, Kelley Manning, Jeffrey Keil, James Kirkland, Jackie Lanfair, Samantha Lincoln.(mpb) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/26/2022.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |