Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-23726

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:22-ap-02050
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 28, 2022
Terminated:Nov 21, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
AMEY ENTERPRISES LLC
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffrey I. Golden
Represented By
David M. Goodrich
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
18 18 misc Matter Held * Wed 12/07 4:06 PM
Civil Minutes -- Concluded [CAE-1] Re: Continued Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02050 by Jeffrey I. Golden against AMEY ENTERPRISES LLC. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7120712) (tjof) (auto)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 11/21 3:31 PM
Adversary Proceeding 2:22-ap-2050 Closed (tjof)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 06, 2022
17 17 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sun 11/06 8:12 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
16 16 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sun 11/06 8:12 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
15 15 notice BNC Service of Document Fri 11/04 1:28 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (vcaf)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice BNC Service of Document Fri 11/04 1:20 PM
NOTICE DELETED - REQUESTED IN ERROR BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (vcaf) Modified on 11/4/2022 (vcaf)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice BNC Service of Document Fri 11/04 9:45 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (wmim)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2022
12 12 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Fri 11/04 9:44 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of11 Notice of Dismissal [GG-1] (wmim)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Dismissal by Plaintiff Fri 11/04 9:41 AM
Notice of Dismissal [GG-1] (wmim)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
10 10 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Fri 09/30 9:17 AM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 12/6/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (shes)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
9 9 misc Matter Continued * Thu 09/29 8:49 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02050 by Jeffrey I. Golden against AMEY ENTERPRISES LLC. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7120712) (tjof) [CAE-1]; Status Conference now to be held on 12/6/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
8 8 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 09/20 4:32 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of7 Status Report [CAE-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
7 7 reports Status Report Tue 09/20 4:31 PM
Status Report [CAE-1] Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey I. Golden (tjof)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 04, 2022
6 6 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 08/04 12:00 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint [CAE-1],5 Order to Confer (tjof)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Thu 07/28 3:21 PM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (tjof)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Thu 07/28 3:17 PM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (tjof)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Thu 07/28 3:15 PM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 9/27/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tjof)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Thu 07/28 3:10 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Thu 07/28 3:10 PM
(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02050 by Jeffrey I. Golden against AMEY ENTERPRISES LLC. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7120712) (tjof)
Related: [-]