California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:20-bk-23726
Case Filed:Jul 30, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
AME Zion Western Episcopal District
980 9th St Ste 2120
Sacramento, CA 95814-2741
Represented By
Gabriel E. Liberman
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
Robert T Matsui United States Courthouse 501 I Street, Room 7-500
Sacramento, CA 95814


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Sunday, May 04, 2025
1030 1030 utility Notice of Filing of Official Transcript (Certificate) Sun 05/04 9:15 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Filing of Transcript and of Deadlines Related to Redaction and Restriction as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
1029 1029 order Generic Order Thu 05/01 7:58 PM
Order Granting in part1007 Motion/Application for Order Authorizing Transfer of Real Property Subject to Liens, Claims and Interests Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section § 363(b) [WGG-39] (tjof)
Related: [-]
1029 1029 order Generic Order Thu 05/01 8:00 PM
Order Granting in part1007 Motion/Application for Order Approving Denomination as Good-Faith Purchaser Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section § 363(m) [WGG-39] (tjof)
Related: [-]
1029 1029 order Compromise Controversy/Approve Settlement Agreement (Order) Thu 05/01 8:04 PM
Order Granting in part1007 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy/Approve Settlement Agreement [WGG-39] (tjof)
Related: [-]
1029 1029 order Relief from Stay (Order) Thu 05/01 8:07 PM
Order Granting in part1007 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [WGG-39] (tjof)
Related: [-]
1028 1028 misc Transcript; Notice of Filing of Official Transcript/Send BNC Notice Thu 05/01 12:50 PM
Transcript regarding hearing held on 04/28/25; Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as transmitted to BNC for Service. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript has been filed. Pursuant to the policy adopted by the Judicial Conference, transcripts are available for inspection only at the clerk's office or may be purchased from the court transcriber for a 90 day period. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 5/8/2025. Redaction Request Due By 05/22/2025. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 06/2/2025. Transcript access will be restricted through 07/30/2025. (Rupa, Dion)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
1027 1027 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Tue 04/29 4:33 PM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Voluntary Petition [CAE-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 9/8/2025 at 09:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tjof)
Related: [-]
misc Request a Transcript Tue 04/29 1:05 PM
3 DAY EXPEDITED Transcript Request. Hearing Date and Time: 04/28/2025. Please contact the Court Reporter/Transcription Agency, Veritext Legal Solutions, to coordinate audio file upload. (Rupa, Dion)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
1026 1026 misc Matter Held * Mon 04/28 2:02 PM
Civil Minutes -- Granted Re:1007 - Motion/Application for Order Authorizing Transfer of Real Property Subject to Liens, Claims and Interests Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section § 363(b) [WGG-39]1007 - Motion/Application for Order Approving Denomination as Good-Faith Purchaser Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section § 363(m) [WGG-39]1007 - Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy/Approve Settlement Agreement with the Debtor, Trustee, and Church Parties [WGG-39]1007 - Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [WGG-39] (auto)
Related: [-]
1025 1025 misc Matter Continued * Mon 04/28 1:08 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual filed [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 9/8/2025 at 09:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
1024 1024 audio Audio Docket Entry Mon 04/28 10:06 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [04/28/2025 09:22:00 AM]. File Size [ 2523 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:06:59 ]. (auto)
Related: [-]
1023 1023 audio Audio Docket Entry Mon 04/28 10:04 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [04/28/2025 09:00:00 AM]. File Size [ 586 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:31 ]. (auto)
Related: [-]