Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-23726

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:22-ap-02056
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 28, 2022
Terminated:Sep 26, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
JEFFREY I. GOLDEN
Represented By
David M. Goodrich
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
17 17 misc Matter Held * Thu 09/29 10:34 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status conference Concluded [CAE-1] Re: Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02056 by JEFFREY I. GOLDEN against WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7120772) (tjof) (auto)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2022
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 09/26 3:28 PM
Adversary Proceeding 2:22-ap-2056 Closed (tjof)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 11, 2022
16 16 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sun 09/11 9:10 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
15 15 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sun 09/11 9:10 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
14 14 notice BNC Service of Document Fri 09/09 3:50 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (vcaf)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice BNC Service of Document Fri 09/09 1:12 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (tjof)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 08, 2022
12 12 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding/Notice of Removal (Sua Sponte) Fri 09/09 1:06 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding/Notice of Removal. (tjof)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
11 11 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Thu 09/08 9:39 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of10 Stipulation (tjof)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Stipulation Thu 09/08 9:37 AM
Stipulation Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff JEFFREY I. GOLDEN, Defendant WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (tjof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
9 9 order Generic Order - Links to Non-Motion Tue 08/23 2:45 PM
Order Approving7 Stipulation ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. (tjof)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 22, 2022
8 8 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Mon 08/22 2:54 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order,7 Stipulation (ltrf)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Stipulation Mon 08/22 2:52 PM
Stipulation to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff JEFFREY I. GOLDEN, Defendant WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (ltrf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 04, 2022
6 6 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 08/04 12:19 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint [CAE-1],5 Order to Confer (tjof)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Thu 07/28 3:59 PM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (tjof)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Thu 07/28 3:58 PM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (tjof)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Thu 07/28 3:58 PM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 9/27/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tjof)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Thu 07/28 3:55 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Thu 07/28 3:55 PM
(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02056 by JEFFREY I. GOLDEN against WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7120772) (tjof)
Related: [-]