Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-23726

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:22-ap-02057
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 28, 2022
Terminated:Nov 28, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
CRUZ LANDSCAPING
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
JEFFREY I. GOLDEN
Represented By
David M. Goodrich
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Monday, November 28, 2022
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 11/28 1:01 PM
Adversary Proceeding 2:22-ap-2057 Closed (tjof)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 11, 2022
18 18 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Fri 11/11 9:11 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
17 17 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 11/09 10:14 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (tjof)
Related: [-]
misc Entry - CM - Proposed Order Not Required Wed 11/09 10:31 AM
A proposed Order is not required Re:15 Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding [GG-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
16 16 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 11/09 10:13 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of15 Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding [GG-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Sua Sponte) Wed 11/09 10:11 AM
Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding [GG-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 08, 2022
14 14 utility BNC Service of Order (Certificate) Sat 10/08 9:07 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
13 13 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Thu 10/06 9:42 AM
Scheduling Order Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Pre-Trial Conference/Hearing ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Pre-Trial Conference/Hearing to be held on 6/13/2023 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A Discovery due by 4/25/2023. (tjof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
12 12 misc Status Conference Held/Concluded AND Pre-Trial Conference Date Set * Fri 09/30 9:32 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference Held/Concluded Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/13/2023 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
11 11 audio Audio Docket Entry Tue 09/27 2:48 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 9/27/2022 1:39:21 PM ]. File Size [ 1013 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:04:13 ]. (auto)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
10 10 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 09/21 9:50 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of9 Status Report [CAE-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
9 9 reports Status Report Wed 09/21 9:48 AM
Status Report [CAE-1] Re:1 Complaint Filed by Defendant CRUZ LANDSCAPING, Plaintiff JEFFREY I. GOLDEN (tjof)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 26, 2022
8 8 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Fri 08/26 5:32 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of7 Answer to Complaint [CAE-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/26 5:29 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by CRUZ LANDSCAPING. (tjof)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 04, 2022
6 6 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 08/04 12:10 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint [CAE-1],5 Order to Confer (tjof)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Thu 07/28 4:09 PM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (tjof)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Thu 07/28 4:08 PM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (tjof)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Thu 07/28 4:07 PM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 9/27/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tjof)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Thu 07/28 4:06 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Thu 07/28 4:06 PM
(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02057 by JEFFREY I. GOLDEN against CRUZ LANDSCAPING. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7120773) (tjof)
Related: [-]