Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-23726

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:22-ap-02061
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 28, 2022
Terminated:Oct 24, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
OMEGA GOLD DEVELOPMENT GROUP, INC.
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
JEFFREY I. GOLDEN
Represented By
David M. Goodrich
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
18 18 misc Matter Held * Fri 11/04 3:42 PM
Civil Minutes -- Concluded [CAE-1] Re: Continued Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02061 by JEFFREY I. GOLDEN against OMEGA GOLD DEVELOPMENT GROUP, INC.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7120898) (tjof) (auto)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2022
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 10/24 4:15 PM
Adversary Proceeding 2:22-ap-2061 Closed (tjof)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 08, 2022
17 17 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sat 10/08 9:07 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
16 16 notice BNC Service of Document Thu 10/06 10:41 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (tjof)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
15 15 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding/Notice of Removal (Sua Sponte) Thu 10/06 10:39 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding/Notice of Removal [GG-1]. (tjof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
14 14 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 10/04 6:15 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of13 Stipulation [GG-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Stipulation Tue 10/04 6:13 PM
Stipulation [GG-1] Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff JEFFREY I. GOLDEN, Defendant OMEGA GOLD DEVELOPMENT GROUP, INC. (tjof)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
12 12 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Fri 09/30 9:27 AM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 11/1/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (shes)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
11 11 misc Matter Continued * Thu 09/29 10:37 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02061 by JEFFREY I. GOLDEN against OMEGA GOLD DEVELOPMENT GROUP, INC.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7120898) (tjof) [CAE-1]; Status Conference now to be held on 11/1/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2022
10 10 order Generic Order - Links to Non-Motion Thu 09/22 6:18 PM
Order Approving8 Stipulation ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. (tjof)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
9 9 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 09/21 12:54 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of7 Status Report,8 Stipulation [CAE-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Stipulation Wed 09/21 12:34 PM
Stipulation to Extend Answer Deadline Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff JEFFREY I. GOLDEN, Defendant OMEGA GOLD DEVELOPMENT GROUP, INC. (tjof)
Related: [-]
7 7 reports Status Report Wed 09/21 12:15 PM
Status Report [CAE-1] Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff JEFFREY I. GOLDEN, Defendant OMEGA GOLD DEVELOPMENT GROUP, INC. (tjof)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 04, 2022
6 6 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 08/04 5:04 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint [CAE-1],5 Order to Confer (tjof)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Fri 07/29 9:43 AM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (tjof)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Fri 07/29 9:40 AM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (tjof)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Fri 07/29 9:38 AM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 9/27/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tjof)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Fri 07/29 9:36 AM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Fri 07/29 9:36 AM
(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02061 by JEFFREY I. GOLDEN against OMEGA GOLD DEVELOPMENT GROUP, INC.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7120898) (tjof)
Related: [-]