GOLDEN v. LEVY
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-23726
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-23726
California Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Fredrick E Clement |
Case #: | 2:22-ap-02062 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other |
Case Filed: | Jul 29, 2022 |
Terminated: | Mar 18, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
LESLIE A. LEVY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JEFFREY I. GOLDEN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:05 PM PDT |
Friday, December 06, 2024 | ||
virtual
Change of Address by Attorney
Fri 12/06 1:52 PM
On 12/6/2024, Change of Address Submitted for Attorney Christopher Wong through Pacer Service Center. Address changed to: 555 South Flower Street 43rd Floor Los Angeles CA 90071. IF YOUR CLIENT IS RECEIVING MAIL AT YOUR ADDRESS, IT IS YOUR RESPONSIBILITY TO SUBMIT A CHANGE OF ADDRESS FORM (EDC 2-085) |