Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-23726

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:22-ap-02065
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2022
Terminated:Dec 27, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
THADDEUS POWELL
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
JEFFREY I. GOLDEN
Represented By
David M. Goodrich
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 12/27 3:09 PM
Adversary Proceeding 2:22-ap-2065 Closed (tjof)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 24, 2022
court BNC Returned Mail Sat 12/24 8:10 AM
Returned Mail: The following order sent to Thaddeus Keith Powell PO Box 7783 Upper Marlboro, MD 20792-7783 on 12/09/2022 was returned as undeliverable: BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (auto adi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
30 30 misc Matter Held * Wed 12/14 1:16 PM
Civil Minutes -- Concluded [CAE-1] Re: Continued Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02065 by JEFFREY I. GOLDEN against THADDEUS POWELL. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121231) (tjof) (auto)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2022
29 29 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Fri 12/09 9:09 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2022
28 28 order Default Judgment (Order) Thu 12/08 2:45 PM
Order Granting16 Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [GG-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
26 26 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 12/07 1:12 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (tjof)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Default Judgment (Sua sponte) Wed 12/07 1:10 PM
Default Judgment Against Defendant THADDEUS POWELL (tjof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
27 27 misc Matter Held * Wed 12/07 4:32 PM
Civil Minutes -- Motion Granted, Resolved without Oral Argument Re:16 - Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [GG-1] (auto)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
24 24 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 11/30 12:06 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of23 Status Report [CAE-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
23 23 reports Status Report Wed 11/30 12:04 PM
Status Report [CAE-1] Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff JEFFREY I. GOLDEN (tjof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
misc Entry - CM - Proposed Order/Notice of Hearing Request by Telephone Tue 11/08 9:35 AM
Contacted Cynthia from the Law Office of Golden Goodrich, LLP on 11/8/22 regarding an Order that was prematurely submitted. Advised to resubmit the Order after the hearing Re:16 Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [GG-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
22 22 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Mon 11/07 11:28 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of16 Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [GG-1],17 Notice of Hearing,18 Exhibit(s),19 Declaration,20 Declaration,21 Memorandum of Points and Authorities (tjof)
Related: [-]
21 21 19 pgs related Memorandum of Points and Authorities Mon 11/07 11:25 AM
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of16 Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [GG-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
20 20 related Declaration Mon 11/07 11:24 AM
Declaration of Jeffrey I. Golden in support of16 Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [GG-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
19 19 related Declaration Mon 11/07 11:04 AM
Declaration of David M. Goodrich in support of16 Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [GG-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
18 18 related Exhibit(s) Mon 11/07 11:01 AM
Exhibit(s) to16 Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [GG-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
17 17 related Notice of Hearing Mon 11/07 10:39 AM
Notice of Hearing Re:16 Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [GG-1] to be held on 12/6/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (tjof)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Default Judgment - Including Amended Motion Mon 11/07 10:37 AM
Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [GG-1] Filed by Plaintiff JEFFREY I. GOLDEN (tjof)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 09, 2022
15 15 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sun 10/09 9:11 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2022
14 14 notice BNC Service of Document Fri 10/07 5:32 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (tjof)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Entry of Default & Order Re: Default Judgment Procedures Fri 10/07 5:30 PM
Entry of Default and Order Re: Default Judgment Procedures. Entry of Default of Defendant THADDEUS POWELL Request for entry of default judgment due by 11/7/2022. (tjof)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
12 12 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Fri 10/07 8:49 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of11 Request for Entry of Default [GG-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Request for Entry of Default Fri 10/07 8:48 AM
Request for Entry of Default of THADDEUS POWELL Filed by Plaintiff JEFFREY I. GOLDEN (tjof)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
10 10 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Wed 10/05 1:39 PM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 12/13/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tjof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
9 9 misc Matter Continued * Wed 10/05 10:43 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02065 by JEFFREY I. GOLDEN against THADDEUS POWELL. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121231) (tjof) [CAE-1]; Status Conference now to be held on 12/13/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
8 8 misc Matter Continued * Thu 09/29 1:46 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02065 by JEFFREY I. GOLDEN against THADDEUS POWELL. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121231) (tjof) [CAE-1]; Status Conference now to held on 10/4/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 26, 2022
7 7 misc Certificate of Service of Reissued Summons and Complaint Fri 08/26 4:43 PM
Certificate of Service of Reissued Summons and Complaint [CAE-1],5 Order to Confer (tjof)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
6 6 misc Reissued Summons Thu 08/25 1:01 PM
Copy of Reissued Summons Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 10/4/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (pdes)
Related: [-]
misc Entry - CM - Reissued Summons Thu 08/25 1:04 PM
Reissued Summons [CAE-1] requested by David M. Goodrich, Attorney for Plaintiff (pdes)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Fri 07/29 3:02 PM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (tjof)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Fri 07/29 3:02 PM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (tjof)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Fri 07/29 3:01 PM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 9/27/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tjof)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Fri 07/29 2:58 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Fri 07/29 2:57 PM
(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02065 by JEFFREY I. GOLDEN against THADDEUS POWELL. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121231) (tjof)
Related: [-]