Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-23726

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:22-ap-02066
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
STACEY POWELL
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
JEFFREY I. GOLDEN
Represented By
David M. Goodrich
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Friday, February 24, 2023
37 37 order Generic Order - Links to Non-Motion Fri 02/24 2:48 PM
IT IS ORDERED that the Status Conference is concluded Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
court BNC Returned Mail Fri 02/24 8:10 AM
Returned Mail: The following order sent to Stacey Powell 1400 Ventura Way Dr Charlotte, NC 28213-8002 on 12/11/2022 was returned as undeliverable: BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (auto adi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
36 36 misc Matter Held * Fri 02/24 8:36 AM
Civil Minutes -- Concluded [CAE-1] Re: Continued Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02066 by JEFFREY I. GOLDEN against STACEY POWELL. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121232) (ltrf) (auto)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
35 35 order Default Judgment (Order) Thu 02/16 8:59 AM
Order Granting25 Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [GG-1] (smis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
34 34 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Thu 02/09 10:24 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of33 Status Report [CAE-1] (isaf)
Related: [-]
33 33 reports Status Report Thu 02/09 10:22 AM
Status Report [CAE-1] Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff JEFFREY I. GOLDEN (isaf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
32 32 misc Matter Held * Thu 02/09 9:22 AM
Civil Minutes -- Motion Granted, Resolved without Oral Argument Re:25 - Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [GG-1] (auto)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
court BNC Returned Mail Mon 01/09 8:10 AM
Returned Mail: The following order sent to Stacey M Powell 812 Georgia St, Apt 28 Vallejo, CA 94590-6263 on 12/11/2022 was returned as undeliverable: BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (auto adi)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2023
31 31 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Fri 01/06 6:02 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of25 Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [GG-1],26 Notice of Hearing,27 Declaration,28 Declaration,29 Exhibit(s),30 Memorandum of Points and Authorities (tjof)
Related: [-]
30 30 16 pgs related Memorandum of Points and Authorities Fri 01/06 5:55 PM
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of25 Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [GG-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
29 29 related Exhibit(s) Fri 01/06 5:50 PM
Exhibit(s) to25 Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [GG-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
28 28 related Declaration Fri 01/06 5:47 PM
Declaration of David M. Goodrich in support of25 Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [GG-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
27 27 related Declaration Fri 01/06 5:34 PM
Declaration of Jeffrey I. Golden in support of25 Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [GG-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
26 26 related Notice of Hearing Fri 01/06 5:29 PM
Notice of Hearing Re:25 Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [GG-1] to be held on 2/7/2023 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (tjof)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Default Judgment - Including Amended Motion Fri 01/06 4:55 PM
Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [GG-1] Filed by Plaintiff JEFFREY I. GOLDEN (tjof)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
24 24 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Thu 12/15 12:57 PM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 2/22/2023 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (msts)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
23 23 misc Matter Continued * Wed 12/14 1:16 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02066 by JEFFREY I. GOLDEN against STACEY POWELL. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121232) (ltrf) [CAE-1]; Status Conference now to be held on 2/22/2023 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 11, 2022
22 22 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sun 12/11 9:09 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2022
21 21 notice BNC Service of Document Fri 12/09 3:50 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (tjof)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Entry of Default & Order Re: Default Judgment Procedures Fri 12/09 3:49 PM
Entry of Default and Order Re: Default Judgment Procedures. Entry of Default of Defendant STACEY POWELL Request for entry of default judgment due by 1/9/2023. (tjof)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
court BNC Returned Mail Mon 12/05 8:10 AM
Returned Mail: The following order sent to Stacey M Powell 812 Georgia St, Apt 28 Vallejo, CA 94590-6263 on 10/27/2022 was returned as undeliverable: BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (auto adi)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 02, 2022
19 19 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Mon 12/05 11:21 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of18 Request for Entry of Default (tjof)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Request for Entry of Default Mon 12/05 11:14 AM
Request for Entry of Default of STACEY POWELL Filed by Plaintiff JEFFREY I. GOLDEN (tjof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
17 17 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 11/30 12:21 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of16 Status Report [CAE-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
16 16 reports Status Report Wed 11/30 12:19 PM
Status Report [CAE-1] Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff JEFFREY I. GOLDEN (tjof)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 27, 2022
15 15 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Thu 10/27 9:10 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
14 14 notice BNC Service of Document Tue 10/25 2:37 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (tjof)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Entry of Default & Order Re: Default Judgment Procedures Tue 10/25 2:36 PM
Entry of Default and Order Re: Default Judgment Procedures. Entry of Default of Defendant STACEY POWELL Request for entry of default judgment due by 11/28/2022. (tjof)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
12 12 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Thu 10/20 2:57 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of11 Request for Entry of Default [GG-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Request for Entry of Default Thu 10/20 2:56 PM
Request for Entry of Default of STACEY POWELL Filed by Plaintiff JEFFREY I. GOLDEN (tjof)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
10 10 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Wed 10/05 2:39 PM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 12/13/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tjof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
9 9 misc Matter Continued * Wed 10/05 10:50 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02066 by JEFFREY I. GOLDEN against STACEY POWELL. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121232) (ltrf) [CAE-1]; Status Conference now to be held on 12/13/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
8 8 misc Matter Continued * Thu 09/29 1:49 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02066 by JEFFREY I. GOLDEN against STACEY POWELL. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121232) (ltrf) [CAE-1]; Status Conference now to held on 10/4/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 26, 2022
7 7 misc Certificate of Service of Reissued Summons and Complaint Fri 08/26 5:26 PM
Certificate of Service of Reissued Summons and Complaint [CAE-1],5 Order to Confer (tjof)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
6 6 misc Reissued Summons Thu 08/25 1:06 PM
Copy of Reissued Summons Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 10/4/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (pdes)
Related: [-]
misc Entry - CM - Reissued Summons Thu 08/25 1:07 PM
Reissued Summons [CAE-1] requested by David M. Goodrich, Attorney for Plaintiff (pdes)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Fri 07/29 3:18 PM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (ltrf)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Fri 07/29 3:17 PM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (ltrf)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Fri 07/29 3:17 PM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 9/27/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (ltrf)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Fri 07/29 3:16 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Fri 07/29 3:15 PM
(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02066 by JEFFREY I. GOLDEN against STACEY POWELL. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121232) (ltrf)
Related: [-]