Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-23726

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:22-ap-02067
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2022
Terminated:Jun 26, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Myron Powell
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffrey I. Golden
Represented By
David M. Goodrich
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Monday, June 26, 2023
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 06/26 11:26 AM
Adversary Proceeding 2:22-ap-2067 Closed (tjof)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2023
46 46 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Fri 06/09 9:11 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
45 45 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 06/07 8:27 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (tjof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
44 44 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding/Notice of Removal (Sua Sponte) Wed 06/07 8:26 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding/Notice of Removal [CAE-1]. (tjof)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2023
42 42 audio Audio Docket Entry Thu 06/01 4:06 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 5/31/2023 10:38:48 AM ]. File Size [ 281 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:10 ]. (auto)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
43 43 misc Matter Held * Mon 06/05 10:26 AM
Civil Minutes -- Concluded [CAE-1] Re: Continued Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02067 by Jeffrey I. Golden against Myron Powell. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121237) (tsef) (auto)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
41 41 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Thu 05/18 11:17 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of40 Status Report [CAE-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
40 40 reports Status Report Thu 05/18 10:38 AM
Status Report [CAE-1] Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey I. Golden, Defendant Myron Powell (tjof)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 25, 2023
39 39 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sat 03/25 9:07 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
38 38 notice BNC Service of Document Thu 03/23 3:33 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (tjof)
Related: [-]
37 37 order Generic Order - Links to Non-Motion Thu 03/23 3:29 PM
Order Discharging25 Order to Show Cause [FEC-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
37 37 order Generic Order - Links to Non-Motion Thu 03/23 3:31 PM
Order Re:25 Order to Set/Continue/Reschedule Hearing [CAE-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
36 36 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Thu 03/23 3:23 PM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 5/31/2023 at 10:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tjof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
35 35 misc Matter Held * Tue 03/21 3:22 PM
Civil Minutes -- Discharged Re:25 - Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1] Status Conference to be held on 3/21/2023 at 10:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tjof)25 - Order to Show Cause [FEC-1] Show Cause hearing to be held on 3/21/2023 at 10:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tjof) (auto)
Related: [-]
34 34 misc Matter Continued * Tue 03/21 3:15 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02067 by Jeffrey I. Golden against Myron Powell. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121237) (tsef) [CAE-1]; Status Conference now to be held on 5/31/2023 at 10:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
33 33 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 03/08 4:36 PM
Amended Certificate/Proof of Service of31 Status Report [CAE-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
32 32 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 03/08 1:15 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of31 Status Report [CAE-1] (vrof)
Related: [-]
31 31 reports Status Report Wed 03/08 1:13 PM
Status Report [CAE-1] Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey I. Golden, Defendant Myron Powell (vrof)
Related: [-]
30 30 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 03/07 2:02 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of28 Response/Reply,29 Declaration [FEC-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
30 30 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 03/07 2:09 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of28 Response/Reply,29 Declaration [CAE-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
29 29 related Declaration Tue 03/07 1:55 PM
Declaration of Thomas R. Phinney in support of28 Response/Reply [FEC-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
29 29 related Declaration Tue 03/07 1:56 PM
Declaration of Thomas R. Phinney in support of28 Response/Reply [CAE-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
28 28 answer Response/Reply Tue 03/07 12:45 PM
Response/Reply Filed by Defendant Myron Powell Re:25 Order to Show Cause [FEC-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
28 28 answer Response/Reply Tue 03/07 12:46 PM
Response/Reply Filed by Defendant Myron Powell Re:25 Order to Set/Continue/Reschedule Hearing [CAE-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
27 27 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Fri 01/13 9:08 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
26 26 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 01/11 3:43 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (tjof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
25 25 order Show Cause Wed 01/11 3:25 PM
Order to Show Cause [FEC-1] Show Cause hearing to be held on 3/21/2023 at 10:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tjof)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Wed 01/11 3:29 PM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1] Status Conference to be held on 3/21/2023 at 10:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tjof)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Matter Held * Wed 01/11 9:02 AM
Civil Minutes -- Dropped from calendar [CAE-1] Re: Continued Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02067 by Jeffrey I. Golden against Myron Powell. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121237) (tsef) (auto)
Related: [-]
23 23 audio Audio Docket Entry Tue 01/10 1:58 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 1/10/2023 1:38:00 PM ]. File Size [ 629 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:37 ]. (auto)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
virtual Change of Address by Attorney Wed 01/04 3:48 PM
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
22 22 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 12/28 9:33 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of21 Status Report [CAE-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
21 21 reports Status Report Wed 12/28 9:31 AM
Status Report [CAE-1] Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey I. Golden, Defendant Myron Powell (tjof)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
20 20 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Thu 12/15 1:01 PM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 1/10/2023 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (msts)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
19 19 misc Matter Continued * Wed 12/14 1:28 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02067 by Jeffrey I. Golden against Myron Powell. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121237) (tsef) [CAE-1]; Status Conference now to be held on 1/10/2023 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
18 18 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 12/14 11:51 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of16 Answer to Complaint,17 Jury Demand (vcaf)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Jury Demand Wed 12/14 11:48 AM
Jury Demand Re:1 Complaint Filed by Defendant Myron Powell (vcaf)
Related: [-]
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/13 5:46 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Myron Powell. (tjof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
15 15 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 11/30 12:12 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of14 Status Report [CAE-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
14 14 reports Status Report Wed 11/30 12:10 PM
Status Report [CAE-1] Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey I. Golden, Defendant Myron Powell (tjof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
13 13 order Generic Order - Links to Non-Motion Wed 10/26 4:50 PM
Order Approving11 Stipulation ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. (tjof)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2022
12 12 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 10/25 1:48 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of11 Stipulation (tjof)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Stipulation Tue 10/25 1:45 PM
Stipulation Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey I. Golden, Defendant Myron Powell (tjof)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
10 10 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Wed 10/05 2:48 PM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 12/13/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tjof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
9 9 misc Matter Continued * Wed 10/05 10:59 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02067 by Jeffrey I. Golden against Myron Powell. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121237) (tsef) [CAE-1]; Status Conference now to be held on 12/13/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
8 8 misc Matter Continued * Thu 09/29 1:53 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02067 by Jeffrey I. Golden against Myron Powell. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121237) (tsef) [CAE-1]; Status Conference now to held on 10/4/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 26, 2022
7 7 misc Certificate of Service of Reissued Summons and Complaint Fri 08/26 4:42 PM
Certificate of Service of Reissued Summons and Complaint [CAE-1],5 Order to Confer (tjof)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
6 6 misc Reissued Summons Thu 08/25 1:09 PM
Copy of Reissued Summons Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 10/4/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (pdes)
Related: [-]
misc Entry - CM - Reissued Summons Thu 08/25 1:10 PM
Reissued Summons [CAE-1] requested by David M. Goodrich, Attorney for Plaintiff (pdes)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Fri 07/29 2:49 PM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (tsef)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Fri 07/29 2:49 PM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (tsef)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Fri 07/29 2:48 PM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 9/27/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tsef)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Fri 07/29 2:48 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Fri 07/29 2:47 PM
(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02067 by Jeffrey I. Golden against Myron Powell. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121237) (tsef)
Related: [-]