Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-23726

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:22-ap-02069
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2022
Terminated:Oct 24, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
JOSE RAMIREZ
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
JEFFREY I. GOLDEN
Represented By
David M. Goodrich
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Monday, October 24, 2022
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 10/24 4:22 PM
Adversary Proceeding 2:22-ap-2069 Closed (tjof)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
13 13 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Thu 10/06 9:12 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
12 12 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Thu 10/06 9:12 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
11 11 notice BNC Service of Document Tue 10/04 2:51 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (vcaf)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice BNC Service of Document Tue 10/04 2:10 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (tjof)
Related: [-]
9 9 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 10/04 2:09 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of8 Notice of Dismissal [GG-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Dismissal by Plaintiff Tue 10/04 2:07 PM
Notice of Dismissal (tjof)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
7 7 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Fri 09/30 9:30 AM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 12/6/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (shes)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
6 6 misc Matter Continued * Thu 09/29 1:59 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02069 by JEFFREY I. GOLDEN against JOSE RAMIREZ. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121323) (lbef) [CAE-1]; Status Conference now to be held on 12/6/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Fri 07/29 4:13 PM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (lbef)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Fri 07/29 4:12 PM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (lbef)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Fri 07/29 4:12 PM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 9/27/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (lbef)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Fri 07/29 4:11 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Fri 07/29 4:11 PM
(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02069 by JEFFREY I. GOLDEN against JOSE RAMIREZ. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121323) (lbef)
Related: [-]