Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-23726

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:22-ap-02070
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2022
Terminated:May 22, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
JERRY C.
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
JEFFREY I. GOLDEN
Represented By
David M. Goodrich
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
27 27 misc Matter Held * Wed 06/14 3:06 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status conference Concluded [CAE-1] Re: Continued Status Conference Re: Amended Complaint -6 - Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff JEFFREY I. GOLDEN (tjof) (auto)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 05/22 4:59 PM
Adversary Proceeding 2:22-ap-2070 Closed (tjof)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
26 26 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Thu 05/04 9:08 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
25 25 notice BNC Service of Document Tue 05/02 2:04 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (tjof)
Related: [-]
24 24 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 05/02 1:59 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of23 Notice of Dismissal [WGG-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Dismissal by Plaintiff Tue 05/02 1:58 PM
Notice of Dismissal (tjof)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2023
22 22 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Fri 02/24 4:02 PM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:6 Amended Complaint [CAE-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 6/13/2023 at 10:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tjof)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
21 21 misc Matter Continued * Fri 02/24 8:41 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:6 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff JEFFREY I. GOLDEN (tjof) [CAE-1]; Status Conference now to be held on 6/13/2023 at 10:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
20 20 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Thu 02/09 10:34 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of19 Status Report [CAE-1] (isaf)
Related: [-]
19 19 reports Status Report Thu 02/09 10:31 AM
Status Report [CAE-1] Re:6 Amended Complaint Filed by Plaintiff JEFFREY I. GOLDEN (isaf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
18 18 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Thu 01/05 1:49 PM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:6 Amended Complaint [CAE-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 2/22/2023 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tjof)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Matter Continued * Wed 01/04 3:45 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:6 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff JEFFREY I. GOLDEN (tjof) [CAE-1]; Status Conference now to be held on 2/22/2023 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
16 16 reports Status Report Wed 12/21 4:22 PM
Status Report [CAE-1] Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff JEFFREY I. GOLDEN (hlum)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
15 15 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Thu 11/10 11:31 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of14 Notice of Withdrawal (tjof)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Withdrawal (Not for Claims) Thu 11/10 11:29 AM
Notice of Withdrawal Re:10 Amended Complaint (tjof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
13 13 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Tue 11/08 3:57 PM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:6 Amended Complaint [CAE-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 1/4/2023 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tjof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
12 12 misc Matter Continued * Fri 11/04 3:20 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:10 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff JEFFREY I. GOLDEN (tjof) [CAE-1]; Status Conference now to be held on 1/4/2023 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
11 11 misc Reissued Summons Wed 10/26 5:16 PM
Copy of Reissued Summons Re:10 Amended Complaint [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 12/6/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tjof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 10/26 5:06 PM
Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff JEFFREY I. GOLDEN (tjof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
9 9 misc Matter Continued * Thu 09/29 2:05 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:6 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff JEFFREY I. GOLDEN (tjof) [CAE-1]; Status Conference now to be held on 11/1/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2022
8 8 misc Certificate of Service of Reissued Summons and Complaint Tue 09/20 9:41 AM
Certificate of Service of Reissued Summons and Complaint [CAE-1],5 Order to Confer,6 Amended Complaint (tjof)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2022
7 7 misc Reissued Summons Thu 09/15 5:30 PM
Copy of Reissued Summons Re:6 Amended Complaint [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 11/1/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tjof)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 09/15 4:58 PM
Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff JEFFREY I. GOLDEN (tjof)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Fri 07/29 4:21 PM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (tjof)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Fri 07/29 4:19 PM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (tjof)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Fri 07/29 4:17 PM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 9/27/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tjof)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Fri 07/29 4:16 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Fri 07/29 4:16 PM
(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02070 by JEFFREY I. GOLDEN against JERRY C.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121325) (tjof) Modified on 8/1/2022 (tjof)
Related: [-]