Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-23726

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:22-ap-02071
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2022
Terminated:Jun 06, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
DELIA CRUZ
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
JEFFREY I. GOLDEN
Represented By
David M. Goodrich
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 06/06 11:28 AM
Adversary Proceeding 2:22-ap-2071 Closed (tjof)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
54 54 misc Matter Held * Mon 06/05 10:26 AM
Civil Minutes -- Concluded [CAE-1] Re: Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02071 by JEFFREY I. GOLDEN against DELIA CRUZ. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121330) (lbef) (auto)
Related: [-]