Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-23726

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:22-ap-02072
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2022
Terminated:Oct 24, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
BERNARD JOSEPH BRONSON
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
JEFFREY I. GOLDEN
Represented By
David M. Goodrich
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Monday, October 24, 2022
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 10/24 4:28 PM
Adversary Proceeding 2:22-ap-2072 Closed (tjof)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 08, 2022
17 17 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sat 10/08 9:07 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
16 16 notice BNC Service of Document Thu 10/06 11:10 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (tjof)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
15 15 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding/Notice of Removal (Sua Sponte) Thu 10/06 10:53 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding/Notice of Removal [GG-1]. (tjof)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Wed 10/05 2:51 PM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 11/8/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tjof)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Matter Continued * Wed 10/05 11:08 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02072 by JEFFREY I. GOLDEN against BERNARD JOSEPH BRONSON. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121331) (tjof) [CAE-1]; Status Conference now to be held on 11/8/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
12 12 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 10/04 6:08 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of11 Stipulation [GG-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Stipulation Tue 10/04 6:05 PM
Stipulation [GG-1] Re:1 Complaint Filed by Defendant BERNARD JOSEPH BRONSON, Plaintiff JEFFREY I. GOLDEN (tjof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
10 10 misc Matter Continued * Thu 09/29 2:27 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02072 by JEFFREY I. GOLDEN against BERNARD JOSEPH BRONSON. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121331) (tjof) [CAE-1]; Status Conference now to be held on 10/4/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
9 9 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 09/20 3:14 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of8 Status Report [CAE-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
8 8 reports Status Report Tue 09/20 3:12 PM
Status Report [CAE-1] Re:1 Complaint Filed by Defendant BERNARD JOSEPH BRONSON, Plaintiff JEFFREY I. GOLDEN (tjof)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 26, 2022
7 7 misc Certificate of Service of Reissued Summons and Complaint Fri 08/26 4:45 PM
Certificate of Service of Reissued Summons and Complaint [CAE-1],5 Order to Confer (tjof)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
6 6 misc Reissued Summons Thu 08/25 1:12 PM
Copy of Reissued Summons Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 10/4/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (pdes)
Related: [-]
misc Entry - CM - Reissued Summons Thu 08/25 1:13 PM
Reissued Summons [CAE-1] requested by David M. Goodrich, Attorney for Plaintiff (pdes)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Fri 07/29 4:34 PM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (tjof)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Fri 07/29 4:34 PM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (tjof)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Fri 07/29 4:33 PM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 9/27/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tjof)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Fri 07/29 4:31 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Fri 07/29 4:30 PM
(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02072 by JEFFREY I. GOLDEN against BERNARD JOSEPH BRONSON. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121331) (tjof)
Related: [-]