Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-23726

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:22-ap-02074
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2022
Terminated:Oct 24, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
WENDEE BAILEY
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
JEFFREY I. GOLDEN
Represented By
David M. Goodrich
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Monday, October 24, 2022
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 10/24 4:36 PM
Adversary Proceeding 2:22-ap-2074 Closed (tjof)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
12 12 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Thu 10/06 9:12 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
11 11 notice BNC Service of Document Tue 10/04 4:34 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (tjof)
Related: [-]
10 10 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 10/04 4:30 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of9 Notice of Dismissal [GG-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Dismissal by Plaintiff Tue 10/04 4:28 PM
Notice of Dismissal (tjof)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
8 8 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Fri 09/30 9:34 AM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 12/6/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (shes)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
7 7 misc Matter Continued * Thu 09/29 2:36 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02074 by JEFFREY I. GOLDEN against WENDEE BAILEY. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121340) (tjof) [CAE-1]; Status Conference now to be held on 12/6/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 04, 2022
6 6 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 08/04 4:30 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint [CAE-1],5 Order to Confer (tjof)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Fri 07/29 5:01 PM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (tjof)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Fri 07/29 5:01 PM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (tjof)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Fri 07/29 5:00 PM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 9/27/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tjof)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Fri 07/29 4:59 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Fri 07/29 4:58 PM
(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02074 by JEFFREY I. GOLDEN against WENDEE BAILEY. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121340) (tjof)
Related: [-]