Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-23726

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:22-ap-02076
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2022
Terminated:Jul 17, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
LIVINGSTONE COLLEGE
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
JEFFREY I. GOLDEN
Represented By
David M. Goodrich
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Monday, July 17, 2023
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 07/17 3:37 PM
Adversary Proceeding 2:22-ap-2076 Closed (tjof)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 02, 2023
37 37 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sun 07/02 9:09 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
36 36 notice BNC Service of Document Fri 06/30 2:06 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (tjof)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2023
35 35 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding/Notice of Removal (Sua Sponte) Fri 06/30 2:04 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding/Notice of Removal [CAE-1]. (tjof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
34 34 misc Matter Held * Thu 06/29 1:16 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status conference Concluded, Adversary Dismissed [CAE-1] Re: Continued Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 22-02076 by JEFFREY I. GOLDEN against LIVINGSTONE COLLEGE. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121345) (vcaf) (auto)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
33 33 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Thu 06/15 2:30 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of32 Status Report [CAE-1] (mgrs)
Related: [-]
32 32 reports Status Report Thu 06/15 2:29 PM
Status Report [CAE-1] Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff JEFFREY I. GOLDEN (mgrs)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2023
31 31 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Fri 05/19 3:25 PM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference Status Conference to be held on 6/27/2023 at 10:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tjof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
30 30 misc Matter Continued * Fri 05/19 9:47 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 22-02076 by JEFFREY I. GOLDEN against LIVINGSTONE COLLEGE. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121345) (vcaf) [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 6/27/2023 at 10:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
29 29 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 05/02 5:05 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of28 Status Report [CAE-1] (tjof) Modified on 5/2/2023 (tjof)
Related: [-]
28 28 reports Status Report Tue 05/02 5:00 PM
Status Report [CAE-1] Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff JEFFREY I. GOLDEN, Defendant LIVINGSTONE COLLEGE (tjof)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
27 27 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Mon 03/13 1:12 PM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 5/16/2023 at 10:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (vcaf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
26 26 misc Matter Continued * Fri 03/10 7:47 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; Status Conference now to be held on 5/16/2023 at 10:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
25 25 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Thu 02/23 1:02 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of24 Status Report [CAE-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
24 24 reports Status Report Thu 02/23 1:00 PM
Status Report [CAE-1] Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff JEFFREY I. GOLDEN, Defendant LIVINGSTONE COLLEGE (tjof)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2023
23 23 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Thu 02/09 11:07 AM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 3/7/2023 at 10:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (isaf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
22 22 misc Matter Continued * Thu 02/09 9:17 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 22-02076 by JEFFREY I. GOLDEN against LIVINGSTONE COLLEGE. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121345) (vcaf) [CAE-1]; Status Conference now to be held on 3/7/2023 at 10:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
21 21 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Thu 01/26 12:14 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of20 Status Report [CAE-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
20 20 reports Status Report Thu 01/26 12:10 PM
Status Report [CAE-1] Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff JEFFREY I. GOLDEN (tjof)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
19 19 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Wed 01/11 3:58 PM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 2/7/2023 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tjof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
18 18 misc Matter Continued * Wed 01/11 9:03 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 22-02076 by JEFFREY I. GOLDEN against LIVINGSTONE COLLEGE. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121345) (vcaf) [CAE-1]; Status Conference now to be held on 2/7/2023 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
17 17 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 12/28 9:42 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of16 Status Report [CAE-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
16 16 reports Status Report Wed 12/28 9:41 AM
Status Report [CAE-1] Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff JEFFREY I. GOLDEN, Defendant LIVINGSTONE COLLEGE (tjof)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2022
15 15 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Thu 12/08 2:52 PM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 1/10/2023 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tjof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
14 14 misc Matter Continued * Thu 12/08 9:40 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 22-02076 by JEFFREY I. GOLDEN against LIVINGSTONE COLLEGE. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121345) (vcaf) [CAE-1]; Status Conference now to be held on 1/10/2023 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
13 13 audio Audio Docket Entry Tue 12/06 2:16 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 12/6/2022 1:30:37 PM ]. File Size [ 1085 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:04:31 ]. (auto)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
12 12 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 11/23 3:54 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of11 Status Report [CAE-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
11 11 reports Status Report Wed 11/23 3:51 PM
Status Report [CAE-1] Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff JEFFREY I. GOLDEN, Defendant LIVINGSTONE COLLEGE (tjof)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
10 10 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Fri 09/30 9:37 AM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 12/6/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (shes)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
9 9 misc Matter Continued * Thu 09/29 2:50 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 22-02076 by JEFFREY I. GOLDEN against LIVINGSTONE COLLEGE. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121345) (vcaf) [CAE-1]; Status Conference now to be held on 12/6/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2022
8 8 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Mon 09/26 3:08 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of7 Status Report [CAE-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
7 7 reports Status Report Mon 09/26 2:40 PM
Status Report [CAE-1] Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff JEFFREY I. GOLDEN, Defendant LIVINGSTONE COLLEGE (tjof)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 04, 2022
6 6 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 08/04 5:03 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint [CAE-1],5 Order to Confer (tjof)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Fri 07/29 4:40 PM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (vcaf)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Fri 07/29 4:39 PM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (vcaf)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Fri 07/29 4:39 PM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 9/27/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (vcaf)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Fri 07/29 4:38 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint (Intake) Fri 07/29 4:38 PM
(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 22-02076 by JEFFREY I. GOLDEN against LIVINGSTONE COLLEGE. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121345) (vcaf)
Related: [-]