Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-23726

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:22-ap-02077
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2022
Terminated:Nov 23, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
BANK OF BARODA
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
JEFFREY I. GOLDEN
Represented By
David M. Goodrich
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 11/23 3:58 PM
Adversary Proceeding 2:22-ap-2077 Closed (tjof)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2022
23 23 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Fri 11/11 9:09 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
22 22 notice BNC Service of Document Tue 11/08 5:03 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (tjof)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Generic Order - Links to Non-Motion Tue 11/08 5:02 PM
Order Discharging9 Order to Show Cause [FEC-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 06, 2022
20 20 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sun 11/06 8:12 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
19 19 notice BNC Service of Document Fri 11/04 3:50 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (wmim)
Related: [-]
18 18 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Fri 11/04 3:49 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of17 Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding [GG-1] (wmim)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Sua Sponte) Fri 11/04 3:44 PM
Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding [GG-1] (wmim)
Related: [-]
misc Entry - CM - Proposed Order Not Required Fri 11/04 3:46 PM
A proposed Order is not required Re:17 Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (wmim)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
16 16 misc Matter Held * Fri 11/04 3:34 PM
Civil Minutes -- Discharged Re:9 - Order to Show Cause for Failure to File Corporate Disclosure Statement; Notice of Intent to Grant Sua Sponte Motion to Strike Answer under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f); and Order to File Corporate Disclosure Under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7007.1 [FEC-1] ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Show Cause hearing to be held on 11/1/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tjof) (auto)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 08, 2022
15 15 utility BNC Service of Order (Certificate) Sat 10/08 9:07 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
14 14 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Thu 10/06 7:43 AM
Scheduling Order Re:1 Complaint [FEC-2] - Pre-Trial Conference/Hearing ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Pre-Trial Conference/Hearing to be held on 6/13/2023 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A Discovery due by 4/25/2023. (tjof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
13 13 misc Status Conference Held/Concluded AND Pre-Trial Conference Date Set * Fri 09/30 11:04 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference Held/Concluded Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/13/2023 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
12 12 audio Audio Docket Entry Tue 09/27 2:48 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 9/27/2022 1:49:33 PM ]. File Size [ 649 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:42 ]. (auto)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
11 11 utility BNC Service of Order (Certificate) Wed 09/21 9:10 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
10 10 misc Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate PARTY - Including Supplemental Tue 09/20 12:32 PM
Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate Debtor/Party Filed by Defendant BANK OF BARODA, NEW YORK BRANCH (tjof)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2022
9 9 order Show Cause Mon 09/19 3:58 PM
Order to Show Cause for Failure to File Corporate Disclosure Statement; Notice of Intent to Grant Sua Sponte Motion to Strike Answer under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f); and Order to File Corporate Disclosure Under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7007.1 [FEC-1] ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Show Cause hearing to be held on 11/1/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tjof)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/29 4:19 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by BANK OF BARODA, NEW YORK BRANCH. (tjof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
7 7 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 08/23 2:54 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendant BANK OF BARODA (tjof)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 04, 2022
6 6 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 08/04 4:54 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint [CAE-1],5 Order to Confer (tjof)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Fri 07/29 4:48 PM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (lbef)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Fri 07/29 4:47 PM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (lbef)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Fri 07/29 4:46 PM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 9/27/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (lbef)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Fri 07/29 4:46 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Fri 07/29 4:45 PM
(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02077 by JEFFREY I. GOLDEN against BANK OF BARODA. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121349) (lbef)
Related: [-]