Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-23726

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:22-ap-02078
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2022
Terminated:Dec 20, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Bank of America, National Association
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffrey I. Golden
Represented By
David M. Goodrich
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 12/20 12:03 PM
Adversary Proceeding 2:22-ap-2078 Closed (hlum)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 04, 2022
33 33 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sun 12/04 9:16 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 02, 2022
32 32 notice BNC Service of Document Fri 12/02 3:22 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (tjof)
Related: [-]
31 31 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Fri 12/02 3:21 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of30 Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding [GG-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
30 30 order Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Sua Sponte) Fri 12/02 3:18 PM
Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding [GG-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2022
29 29 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Fri 11/11 9:09 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
28 28 notice BNC Service of Document Tue 11/08 1:20 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (tjof)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2022
27 27 order Generic Order - Links to Non-Motion Tue 11/08 1:19 PM
Order Discharging9 Order to Show Cause [FEC-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
26 26 misc Matter Held * Fri 11/04 3:48 PM
Civil Minutes -- Discharged Re:9 - Order to Show Cause for Failure to File Corporate Disclosure Statement; Notice of Intent to Grant Sua Sponte Motion to Strike the Stipulation under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f); and Order to File Corporate Disclosure Under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7007.1 [FEC-1] ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Show Cause hearing to be held on 11/1/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tjof) (auto)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 27, 2022
25 25 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Thu 10/27 9:10 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
24 24 notice BNC Service of Document Tue 10/25 11:48 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (tjof)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2022
23 23 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Tue 10/25 11:47 AM
Scheduling Order Re:1 Complaint [FEC-2] - Pre-Trial Conference; Pre-Trial Conference to be held on 5/31/2023 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A Discovery due by 4/18/2023. (tjof)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
21 21 audio Audio Docket Entry Wed 10/19 8:54 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 10/18/2022 1:52:31 PM ]. File Size [ 1445 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:06:01 ]. (auto)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
22 22 misc Status Conference Held/Concluded AND Pre-Trial Conference Date Set * Mon 10/24 8:36 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference Held/Concluded Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/31/2023 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
20 20 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Fri 10/07 9:00 AM
Amended Certificate/Proof of Service of18 Declaration [FEC-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
19 19 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Thu 10/06 6:12 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of18 Declaration [FEC-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
18 18 related Declaration Thu 10/06 6:11 PM
Declaration of Adam N. Barasch Re:9 Order to Show Cause [FEC-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
17 17 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Fri 09/30 9:39 AM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 10/18/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (shes)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
16 16 misc Matter Continued * Thu 09/29 2:54 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02078 by Jeffrey I. Golden against Bank of America, National Association. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121353) (tsef) [CAE-1]; Status Conference now to be held on 10/18/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2022
15 15 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Mon 09/26 3:45 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of14 Status Report [CAE-1] (tjof)
Related: [-]
14 14 reports Status Report Mon 09/26 3:41 PM
Status Report [CAE-1] Re:1 Complaint Filed by Defendant Bank of America, National Association, Plaintiff Jeffrey I. Golden (tjof)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 23, 2022
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/23 11:53 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Bank of America, National Association. (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2022
12 12 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Thu 09/22 3:43 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of11 Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate Debtor/Party (tjof)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate PARTY - Including Supplemental Thu 09/22 3:30 PM
Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate Debtor/Party Filed by Defendant Bank of America, National Association (tjof)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
10 10 utility BNC Service of Order (Certificate) Wed 09/21 9:10 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2022
9 9 order Show Cause Mon 09/19 2:41 PM
Order to Show Cause for Failure to File Corporate Disclosure Statement; Notice of Intent to Grant Sua Sponte Motion to Strike the Stipulation under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f); and Order to File Corporate Disclosure Under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7007.1 [FEC-1] ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Show Cause hearing to be held on 11/1/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tjof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
8 8 order Generic Order - Links to Non-Motion Tue 08/23 2:48 PM
Order Approving6 Stipulation ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. (tjof)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 22, 2022
7 7 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Mon 08/22 3:07 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order,6 Stipulation (ltrf)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Stipulation Mon 08/22 3:05 PM
Stipulation to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline Re:1 Complaint Filed by Defendant Bank of America, National Association, Plaintiff Jeffrey I. Golden (ltrf)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Fri 07/29 4:25 PM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (tsef)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Fri 07/29 4:24 PM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (tsef)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Fri 07/29 4:24 PM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 9/27/2022 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tsef)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Fri 07/29 4:23 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Fri 07/29 4:23 PM
(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 22-02078 by Jeffrey I. Golden against Bank of America, National Association. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7121353) (tsef)
Related: [-]