Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Jennifer P Wilson
Case #: 1:22-cv-01220
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2022
Re-opened:Jul 01, 2024
Terminated:Oct 10, 2024
Case in other court:Third Circuit, 24-01333 Third Circuit, 24-02946
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 01, 2023 3:53 AM EST
Defendant
Ross Casteel
Represented By
Leticia J Santiago
contact info
Donald B. Hoyt
Blakey, Yost, Bupp & Rausch, LLP
contact info
Defendant
York City Police Department
Represented By
Leticia J Santiago
contact info
Donald B. Hoyt
Blakey, Yost, Bupp & Rausch, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephen Lambert
244 Roosevelt Ave, 3rd Fl. P.O. Box 7574
York, PA 17404

GPO Jun 30 2023
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 6/30/2023. (cw)
GPO Feb 12 2024
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry), RE: Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C Carlson on 2/12/24. (rw)
GPO Feb 12 2024
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)- IT IS ORDERED that the defendants motion to dismiss, 23, is GRANTED, and the plaintiffs amended complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The clerk is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C Carlson on 2/12/24. (rw)

Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 24, 2025
41 41 appeal USCA Judgment (Use this if Mandate Will Follow) Mon 03/24 11:59 AM
JUDGMENT of USCA as to39 Notice of Appeal, filed by Stephen Lambert (King, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
39 39 appeal Notice of Appeal Wed 10/16 12:45 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL in NON-PRISONER Case as to38 Order on Report and Recommendations, by Stephen Lambert. Filing Fee and Docket Fee NOT PAID. Filing fee $ 605 The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (rw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
38 38 2 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendations Thu 10/10 11:30 AM
ORDER adopting36 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiffs objections, Doc. 37, are OVERRULED; Plaintiffs amended complaint, Doc. 20, is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and the Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 10/10/2024 (ve)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
37 37 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Mon 08/05 11:49 AM
OBJECTION to36 Report and Recommendations by Stephen Lambert. (rw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
36 36 14 pgs motion Report and Recommendations Tue 07/16 3:30 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - IT IS RECOMMENDED that the pending motion to dismiss,23 , be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 7/30/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C Carlson on 7/16/24. (rw)
Related: [-]
35 35 1 pgs order Order Tue 07/16 3:22 PM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Memorandum Opinion and Order previously entered by the undersigned in this case,27 ,28 , are VACATED. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. §636 we will address the defendants motion to dismiss,23 , through a Report and Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C Carlson on 7/16/24. (rw)
Related: [-]
order Verbal Order Reassigning Case Tue 07/16 1:52 PM
VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson and referred to Magistrate Judge Martin C Carlson as one or more parties have not consented to the jurisdiction of a U.S. Magistrate Judge. (jkc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
34 34 1 pgs misc Consent Form Sent (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) Wed 07/03 8:06 AM
CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE COMPLETED FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU DO NOT HAVE AN E-MAIL ACCOUNT YOU MAY MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 8/2/2024 (rw)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
33 33 2 pgs appeal USCA Order- (Terminates Appeal) Mon 07/01 4:45 PM
ORDER of USCA as to29 Notice of Appeal, filed by Stephen Lambert. Accordingly, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction, and Appellants motion for appointment of counsel is dismissed as moot. (McIntyre, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 06/07 4:18 PM
ORDER dismissing as Moot pltf's mtn to proceed ifp30 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C Carlson on 6/7/24 (ma)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
appeal Supplemental ROA Transmitted to USCA Mon 03/11 3:41 PM
Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re30 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Documents and Docket Sheet available through ECF. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (aaa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
30 30 3 pgs motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 02/21 1:05 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stephen Lambert.(ll)
Related: [-]
29 29 appeal Notice of Appeal Wed 02/21 1:04 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL in NON-PRISONER PRO SE Case as to28 Order (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), by Stephen Lambert. Filing Fee and Docket Fee NOT PAID. Filing fee $ 605 The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (ll)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
28 28 1 pgs order Order (Memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) Mon 02/12 11:38 AM
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)- IT IS ORDERED that the defendants motion to dismiss,23 , is GRANTED, and the plaintiffs amended complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The clerk is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C Carlson on 2/12/24. (rw)
Related: [-]
27 27 13 pgs order Memorandum (Order to follow as separate docket entry) Mon 02/12 11:35 AM
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry), RE: Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C Carlson on 2/12/24. (rw)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 04, 2024
order Verbal Order Reassigning Case Sun 02/04 5:36 PM
VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Martin C Carlson for all further proceedings. (jw)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
26 26 10 pgs respm Brief in Opposition (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Mon 09/18 12:56 PM
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Amended Complaint filed by Stephen Lambert.(ao)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
25 25 3 pgs misc Reply (Do not use this event if your document is a Brief) Mon 09/11 1:48 PM
REPLY to Defendant's Response Order to Show Cause22 and Request for Damages Stated in Amended Complaint20 by Stephen Lambert. (dj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
24 24 9 pgs respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Wed 09/06 3:59 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Amended Complaint filed by Ross Casteel.(Santiago, Leticia)
Related: [-]
23 23 6 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 09/06 3:54 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Amended Complaint by Ross Casteel.(Santiago, Leticia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
22 22 4 pgs misc Response (Do not use this event if your document is a Brief) Wed 09/06 3:50 PM
RESPONSE by Ross Casteel to21 Order to Show Cause, . (Santiago, Leticia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
misc Docket Annotation Thu 08/24 9:17 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: The Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) was regenerated for the Order to Show Cause due to a typo in the order. (cw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
21 21 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 08/23 1:07 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order or on or before Wednesday, September 6, 2023 defendant's counsel is directed to show cause as to why a responsive pleading hasnt been filed in response to the amended complaint (Doc. 20). Show Cause Response due by 9/6/2023. Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 8/23/2023. (cw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
20 20 7 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Wed 07/19 2:06 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ross Casteel, filed by Stephen Lambert.(sm)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 06/30 2:34 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Defendants motion to dismiss (Doc. 13) is GRANTED; 2. Lamberts claims pertaining to events that took place before August 5, 2020, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as time-barred; 3. Lamberts claims against Defendant YCPD are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and Defendant YCPD is TERMINATED from this action; 4. Lamberts remaining claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and 5. Lambert is granted 28 days to file an amended complaint, on or before Friday, July 28, 2023. Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 6/30/2023 (cw)
Related: [-]
18 18 16 pgs order Memorandum (Order to follow as separate docket entry) Fri 06/30 2:32 PM
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 6/30/2023. (cw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
17 17 8 pgs motion Compel Thu 06/22 4:56 PM
MOTION to Compel Disclosure of Confidential Informants by Stephen Lambert.(sm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
16 16 misc Consents to Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate Judge in Direct Assignment Cases Tue 01/10 1:07 PM
CONSENTS to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge Mehalchick in Direct Assignment Cases pursuant to Standing Order 2022-19. (jkc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
15 15 5 pgs respm Brief in Opposition (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Mon 11/21 1:04 PM
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Stephen Lambert.(ktt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2022
14 14 10 pgs respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Thu 11/03 1:15 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ross Casteel, York City Police Department.(Santiago, Leticia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
misc Docket Annotation Thu 11/03 12:59 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: The memo in support filed as an attachment to the motion to dismiss (doc 13) is to be refiled as a brief in support which is found under other responses and replies. (cw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
13 13 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 11/02 6:09 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ross Casteel, York City Police Department.(Santiago, Leticia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Memo,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
12 12 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Tue 11/01 1:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Donald B. Hoyt on behalf of All Defendants (Hoyt, Donald)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 28, 2022
11 11 misc Consent Form Sent (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) Fri 10/28 3:21 PM
CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Ross Casteel, Stephen Lambert, York City Police Department YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE COMPLETED FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU DO NOT HAVE AN E-MAIL ACCOUNT YOU MAY MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 11/28/2022 (cw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
10 10 misc Jury Demand Wed 10/26 2:15 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ross Casteel, York City Police Department.(Santiago, Leticia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
9 9 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Wed 10/26 2:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Leticia J Santiago on behalf of Ross Casteel, York City Police Department(Santiago, Leticia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, October 20, 2022
8 8 misc Letter Thu 10/20 10:53 AM
Letter from Stephen Lambert advising of mail interruption. (ma)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
7 7 service Summons Issued Mon 10/03 12:05 PM
Summons Issued as to Ross Casteel, and York City Police Department and provided TO ATTORNEY VIA U.S. MAIL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (rw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Packet
Friday, September 30, 2022
6 6 misc Filing Fee Received - Complaint is now deemed Filed Fri 09/30 4:44 PM
Filing fee: $ 402., receipt number 333101227. Complaint is now deemed FILED. (sm)
Related: [-]
utility ADI Receipt Entry Fri 09/30 3:48 PM
Receipt of payment from STEPHEN LAMBERT in the amount of $402.00 for Civil Filing Fee- Non-Prisoner. Transaction posted on 9/30/2022. Receipt number 333101227 processed by Regina Angeli-Riese. (jjs)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2022
5 5 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 09/26 1:39 PM
ORDER denying2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - AND NOW, this 26th day of September, 2022, based on the foregoing reasons, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Lamberts motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. 2) is DENIED. Lambert is granted thirty (30) days to pay the full $402.00 filing fee, on or before Wednesday, October 26, 2022. Failing to pay the requisite filing fee will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 9/26/2022 (cw)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 05, 2022
4 4 order Standing Practice Order (Use Only in Non-Prisoner Pro Se Cases) Fri 08/05 2:55 PM
STANDING PRACTICE ORDER issued. (rw)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Pro Se Letter issued - MJ IS PRESIDING JUDGE Fri 08/05 2:54 PM
PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number. (rw)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 08/05 2:53 PM
MOTION/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stephen Lambert.(rw)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 08/05 2:48 PM
COMPLAINT against Ross Casteel, and York City Police Department lodged pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by Stephen Lambert.(rw)
Related: [-]