Original Case: 1:22-cv-01220

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-02946
Typecivil / private / civil rights
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2024
Terminated:Mar 24, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 10, 2025 7:42 PM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
ROSS CASTEEL, York City Police Officer, Badge #103
Represented By
Leticia J. Santiago
William J. Ferren & Associates
contact info
Donald B. Hoyt
MPL Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
STEPHEN LAMBERT
Represented By
Stephen Lambert
contact info

GPO Mar 24 2025
NOT PRECEDENTIAL PER CURIAM OPINION Coram: RESTREPO, FREEMAN and NYGAARD, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 4. DLD-092. Appellant's motion for the appointment of counsel is denied.

Docket last updated: 05/10/2025 7:42 PM EDT
Friday, October 18, 2024
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Stephen Lambert in District Court No. 1-22-cv-01220. (JK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Case Docketed
Att: 2 2 pgs District Court Order 10/10/2024
Att: 3 14 pgs District Court Report and Recommendation 07/16/2024
Att: 4 1 pgs Case Caption
Att: 5 3 pgs Case Opening Letter
1 pgs NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (JK)
Related: [-]