Gissing Fremont LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 2:22-bk-46160
Lead case is: 2:22-bk-46160
Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Lisa S Gretchko |
Case #: | 2:22-bk-46170 |
Case Filed: | Aug 08, 2022 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Gissing Fremont LLC
32500 Telegraph Rd. Ste. 207
Bingham Farms, MI 48025 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Andrew R. Vara
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/07/2022 8:00 PM EDT |
Monday, August 08, 2022 | ||
trustee
UST Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/08 7:00 PM
United States Trustee Notice of Appearance Filed by U.S. Trustee Andrew R. Vara. (Gies (UST), Jill) |
||
trustee
UST Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/08 7:01 PM
United States Trustee Notice of Appearance Filed by U.S. Trustee Andrew R. Vara. (Callard (UST), Kelley) |
||
crditcrd
none
Mon 08/08 7:39 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 22-46170 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A39455859, amount . (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Gissing Fremont LLC Chapter 11 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Form 122B Due: 08/22/2022. Income Tax Return Due: 08/22/2022. Schedule A/B due 08/22/2022. Schedule D due 08/22/2022. Schedule E/F due 08/22/2022. Schedule G due 08/22/2022. Schedule H due 08/22/2022. Statement of Financial Affairs due 08/22/2022. Statement of Operations Due: 08/22/2022. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 08/22/2022. Incomplete Filings due by 08/22/2022. Chapter 11 Plan due by 12/6/2022. Disclosure Statement due by 12/6/2022. (Wolfson, Scott) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Bankruptcy Petition Cover Sheet Filed by Debtor In Possession Gissing Fremont LLC. (Wolfson, Scott) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Chapter 11 Cases: List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders Filed by Debtor In Possession Gissing Fremont LLC. (Wolfson, Scott) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Debtor In Possession Gissing Fremont LLC. (Wolfson, Scott) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions For Entry of Order Directing Joint Administration of Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Debtor In Possession Gissing Fremont LLC (Wolfson, Scott) |