Gissing North America LLC
Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Lisa S Gretchko |
Case #: | 2:22-bk-46160 |
Case Filed: | Aug 08, 2022 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 13, 2023 |
Claims Deadline: | Jun 06, 2023 |
Converted: | Jan 09, 2023 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Est. Liabilities | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Gissing North America LLC
32500 Telegraph Rd. Ste. 207
Bingham Farms, MI 48025 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 31, 2022 12:25 PM EDT |
Creditor
BMW SLP S.A. de C.V.
Jaffe Raitt Heuer & Weiss, PC 27777 Franklin Road Suite 2500
Southfield, MI 48034 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Comerica Bank
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Frimo, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
General Motors LLC
660 Woodward Ave 2290 First National Bldg. 2290 First National Bldg.
Detroit, MI 48226 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Gissing Automotive Systems, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Jiangsu Shifeng New Materials Co., Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Mitsuiya Industries, Co., Ltd
Florence Rostami Law, LLC The Graybay Building, Suite 1402 420 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10170 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Stellantis
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tesla, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 East Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Gissing North America LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Advanced Engineering Solutions, Inc.
250 Advanced Drive
Springboro, OH 45066 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Huntington National Bank
McDonald Hopkins LLC 600 Superior Avenue East Ste 2100
Cleveland, OH 44114 |
Represented By
|
Trustee
Kenneth Nathan
Nathan Law PLC - TRUSTEE 29777 Telegraph Road Suite 1170
Southfield, MI 48034 |
Represented By
|
Trustee
Kenneth A Nathan
29100 Northwestern Highway Suite 310
Southfield, MI 48034 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
Andrew R. Vara
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/13/2025 12:50 PM EST |
Monday, August 08, 2022 | ||
trustee
UST Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/08 6:44 PM
United States Trustee Notice of Appearance Filed by U.S. Trustee Andrew R. Vara. (Gies (UST), Jill) |
||
trustee
UST Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/08 6:45 PM
United States Trustee Notice of Appearance Filed by U.S. Trustee Andrew R. Vara. (Callard (UST), Kelley) |
||
crditcrd
none
Mon 08/08 7:39 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 22-46160 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A39455859, amount . (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Gissing North America LLC Balance Sheet Due: 08/22/2022. Bankruptcy Petition Preparers Notice, Declaration, and Signature Due: 08/22/2022. Cash Flow Statement Due: 08/22/2022. Chapter 11 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Form 122B Due: 08/22/2022. Credit Counseling Certificate Due: 08/22/2022. Joint Debtor Credit Counseling Certification Due: 08/22/2022. Declaration About an Individual Debtor(s) Schedules Due 08/22/2022. Declaration under Penalty of Perjury for Debtor(s) without an Attorney due 08/22/2022. Income Tax Return Due: 08/22/2022. Initial Statement About an Eviction Judgment Against You Due: 08/22/2022. Schedule A/B due 08/22/2022. Schedule C - Debtor due 08/22/2022. Schedule C - Joint Debtor due 08/22/2022. Schedule D due 08/22/2022. Schedule E/F due 08/22/2022. Schedule G due 08/22/2022. Schedule H due 08/22/2022. Schedule I due 08/22/2022. Schedule J due 08/22/2022. Schedule J-2 due 08/22/2022. Schedules A-J due 08/22/2022. Statement of Financial Affairs due 08/22/2022. Statement of Operations Due: 08/22/2022. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 08/22/2022. Incomplete Filings due by 08/22/2022. Chapter 11 Plan due by 12/6/2022. Disclosure Statement due by 12/6/2022. (Wolfson, Scott) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Bankruptcy Petition Cover Sheet Filed by Debtor In Possession Gissing North America LLC. (Wolfson, Scott) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Chapter 11 Cases: List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders Filed by Debtor In Possession Gissing North America LLC. (Wolfson, Scott) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Debtor In Possession Gissing North America LLC. (Wolfson, Scott) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Request for Notice by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC . (Garabato, Sid) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Debtors' First Day Motion for Entry of An Order Authorizing the Continued Use of Debtors' Pre-Petition Cash Management System, Bank Accounts, Commercial Cards, and Business Forms Filed by Debtor In Possession Gissing North America LLC (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Debtors' First Day Motion for an Order Authorizing Payment of Pre-Petition Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits Filed by Debtor In Possession Gissing North America LLC (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Debtors' First Day Motion for Entry of an Order Granting Administrative Expense Status to Undisputed Obligations to Vendors Arising From Post-Petition Delivery of Goods and Services Ordered Pre-Petition and Authorizing Debtors to Pay Such Obligations in the Ordinary Course of Business Filed by Debtor In Possession Gissing North America LLC (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Debtors' First-Day Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing Debtors to Pay Pre-Petition Taxes, Fees, and Other Similar Charges and Related Obligations Filed by Debtor In Possession Gissing North America LLC (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Debtors' First Day Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Prohibiting Utilities From Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Service to Debtors; and (II) Establishing Procedures to Determine Requests for Adequate Assurance of Payment Filed by Debtor In Possession Gissing North America LLC (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Debtors' First Day Application For Entry of an Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 156(c) and Federal Bankruptcy Rule 2002 Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC As Noticing, Claims, and Balloting Agent Filed by Debtor In Possession Gissing North America LLC (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Debtors' First-Day Motion For Additional Time To File Schedules and Statements of Financial Affairs Filed by Debtor In Possession Gissing North America LLC (Bass, Michelle) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Debtors' First-Day Motion For Entry of An Order Establishing a Special Service List And Authorizing Use of a Single Consolidated Creditor Matrix Filed by Debtor In Possession Gissing North America LLC (Bass, Michelle) |
|
14 | 14
![]() Declaration f Steven R. Wybo in Support of Chapter 11 Petition, First-Day Motions, and Other Relief Filed by Debtor In Possession Gissing North America LLC Filed by Debtor In Possession Gissing North America LLC. (Wolfson, Scott) |
|
15 | 15
![]() Chapter 11 First Day Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Debtor In Possession Gissing North America LLC (Wolfson, Scott) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
16 | 16
![]() Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions For Entry of Order Directing Joint Administration of Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Debtor In Possession Gissing North America LLC (Wolfson, Scott) |