New Jersey District Court
Judge:Christine P O'Hearn
Referred: Sharon A King
Case #: 1:22-cv-04954
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1981 Housing Discrimination
Case Filed:Aug 07, 2022
Terminated:Aug 18, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Feb 04, 2023 3:31 AM EST
Defendant
MR. MARK KAUFFMAN
Defendant
MRS. SARA KEENLEY
Defendant
MR. FRANK LUBINSKI
Defendant
MR. JOSEPH RAINER
Defendant
THE DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING
Plaintiff
ANGELA ANDERSON
100 E Broad Street
Palmyra, NJ 08065


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, October 11, 2024
21 21 order Order on Motion to Reopen Case Fri 10/11 12:32 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen. (ECF No. 20). Because Plaintiff's claims were dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim, (ECF No. 9), and the Court's decision was affirmed by the Third Circuit, (ECF No. 16; ECF No. 18), Plaintiff's Motion is DENIED. (ECF No. 20). So Ordered by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 10/11/24. (hem, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 10/11 11:33 AM
Set Deadlines as to20 MOTION to Reopen. Motion set for 11/4/2024 before Judge Christine P. O'Hearn. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
20 20 motion Reopen Case Fri 10/11 11:31 AM
MOTION to Reopen by ANGELA ANDERSON. (dmr)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/11 11:29 AM
NOTICE/Letter request to no longer receive electronic notifications by ANGELA ANDERSON (dmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
18 18 appeal USCA Mandate (Terminates Appeal) Mon 06/10 9:49 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to14 Notice of Appeal (USCA) filed by ANGELA ANDERSON (Finance notified)(ca3pdb, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mandate Letter,
Att: 2 Opinion
appeal Mandate Notice Mon 06/10 10:22 AM
Pursuant to Local Rule 79.4, notice is hereby given of the Appellate ruling filed on 6/10/2024. In the event that the mandate or judgment provides for costs or directs a disposition other than an affirmance, the prevailing party shall prepare and submit an order implementing the mandate or judgment. (js)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
17 17 misc Letter Tue 05/21 5:21 PM
Letter from ANGELA ANDERSON. (dmw )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
16 16 appeal USCA Judgment (Use if Mandate will follow) Fri 05/17 12:20 PM
USCA JUDGMENT as to11 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by ANGELA ANDERSON,14 Notice of Appeal (USCA) filed by ANGELA ANDERSON (ca3pdb, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
15 15 appeal USCA Notice of Docketing (Case No & Mgr Assigned) Fri 12/01 3:03 PM
USCA Case Number 23-3114 for14 Notice of Appeal (USCA) filed by ANGELA ANDERSON. USCA Case Manager Pamela (Document Restricted - Court Only) (ca3pdb, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
13 13 appeal USCA Amended Mandate Mon 11/27 12:43 PM
USCA MANDATE as to Appeal 336 . (js)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Incorrect Entry made by Clerk's Office Staff Mon 11/27 12:48 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the USCA MANDATE attached to docket entry13 filed by the Clerk's office on 11/27/2023 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (js)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
14 14 appeal Notice of Appeal (USCA Philadelphia) Mon 11/27 3:54 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by ANGELA ANDERSON. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (js)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Exhibit (to Document) Mon 11/27 12:23 PM
Exhibit to11 Notice of Appeal (USCA), by ANGELA ANDERSON. (js)
Related: [-]
11 11 appeal Notice of Appeal (USCA Philadelphia) Mon 11/27 12:15 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by ANGELA ANDERSON. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (Submitted to The Federal Circuit Court of Appeals Email) (js)
Related: [-]
appeal Notice (NEF) to Court of Appeals (Philadelphia) Mon 11/27 12:24 PM
Notice to Court of Appeals, Re:12 Exhibit (to Document). (js)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
10 10 misc Mail Returned Tue 10/10 1:24 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to ANGELA ANDERSON in re9 Order Granting (aji, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
9 9 3 pgs order Order Granting/Denying In Forma Pauperis Fri 09/08 10:04 AM
Order Granting7 -2 Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; Dismissing the Amended Complaint WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 9/7/2023. (jab)
Related: [-]
cmp Amended Complaint Fri 09/08 10:10 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT filed. Please see docket entry7 for Amended Complaint.(jab)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/08 12:20 PM
Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically by ANGELA ANDERSON (Duplicates of7 Amended Complaint and IFP [7-2] included in Mailing) (tf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
misc Docket Annotation (public) Thu 02/23 3:33 PM
Updated Plaintiff's address to add apartment number. (jab)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 02/23 3:31 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT RECEIVED against MARK KAUFFMAN, SARA KEENLEY, FRANK LUBINSKI, JOSEPH RAINER, THE DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING, filed by ANGELA ANDERSON. RECEIVED VIA ECF HELP DESK(jab)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Application IFP,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Consent to Receive Documents Electronically,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service,
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, August 29, 2022
6 6 misc Mail Returned Wed 08/31 8:49 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable regarding2 and3 . Mail sent to ANGELA ANDERSON (mag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
5 5 2 pgs order Order Thu 08/18 3:09 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATE this case and provide Plaintiff with a copy of this Order, Plaintiff's Complaint1 and IFP Application [1-1], and a blank Complaint and IFP Application; Plaintiff shall have forty-five (45) days from the date of entry of this Order to submit a signed Complaint and IFP Application. Signed by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 8/18/2022. (mag, N.M.)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 08/18 3:21 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (mag)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2022
4 4 misc Exhibit (to Document) Fri 08/12 3:05 PM
Exhibit to1 Complaint Received by ANGELA ANDERSON. (ssp, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
3 3 notice Notice of Guidelines for Non-Prisoner Pro Se Filers Tue 08/09 11:45 AM
Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (ssp, N.M.)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 07, 2022
2 2 motion Appoint Pro Bono Tue 08/09 11:30 AM
MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono by ANGELA ANDERSON. Motion not signed (ssp, N.M.) Modified on 8/9/2022 (ssp, )
Related: [-]
1 1 service Complaint Received Tue 08/09 11:27 AM
Complaint Received. Complaint and IFP not signed.(ssp, N.M.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Application IFP