Original Case: 1:22-cv-04954

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-03114
Typecivil / private / civil rights
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 01, 2023
Terminated:May 17, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 21, 2024 4:23 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING
Defendant - Appellee
FRANK LUBINSKI
Defendant - Appellee
JOSEPH RAINER
Defendant - Appellee
SARA KEENLEY
Defendant - Appellee
MARK KAUFFMAN
Plaintiff - Appellant
ANGELA ANDERSON
Represented By
Angela Anderson
contact info

GPO May 17 2024
NOT PRECEDENTIAL PER CURIAM OPINION Coram: KRAUSE, FREEMAN and SCIRICA, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 3. CLD-103.

Docket last updated: 05/21/2024 4:23 AM EDT
Friday, December 01, 2023
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Angela Anderson in District Court No. 1-22-cv-04954. (PDB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Case Docketed
Att: 2 1 pgs Case Caption
Att: 3 2 pgs Case Opening Letter
1 pgs NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (PDB)
Related: [-]