Sean Spicer, et al v. Joseph Biden, Jr., et al
Original Case: 1:21-cv-02493
D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cvus-05215 |
Type | civil us / united states |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Case Filed: | Aug 12, 2022 |
Terminated: | Aug 14, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 15, 2023 4:24 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Joseph R. Biden, Jr., in his official capacity as President of the United States
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Catherine M. Russell, in her official capacity as director of the White House Presidential Personnel Office
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Katherine Petrelius, in her official capacity as Special Assistant to the President in the White House Presidential Personnel Office
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Charles A. Ruppersberger, III, in his official capacity as Chairman of the United States Naval Academy Board of Visitors, also known as Dutch
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Raphael J. Thalakottur, in his official capacity as Designated Federal Officer of the United States Naval Academy Board of Visitors
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Sean M. Spicer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Russell T. Vought
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/15/2023 4:24 AM EDT |
Friday, August 12, 2022 | ||
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 22-5215 | ||
12 pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [1959122] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:21-cv-02493-DLF filed by Sean M. Spicer and Russell T. Vought. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-5215 22-5215 | ||
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [1959124] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 09/12/2022. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 09/12/2022. APPELLANT statement of issues due 09/12/2022. APPELLANT underlying decision due 09/12/2022. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 09/12/2022. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 09/12/2022. APPELLANT transcript status report due 09/12/2022. APPELLANT procedural motions due 09/12/2022. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 09/26/2022; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 09/12/2022. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 09/12/2022. APPELLEE procedural motions due 09/12/2022. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 09/26/2022 22-5215 |