Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34574

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:22-ap-03065
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2022
Terminated:Mar 25, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Thomas Wolf
Represented By
Thomas Wolf
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynn Tavenner
Represented By
Brittany Jane Nelson
Quinn Emanuel
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Saturday, March 25, 2023
5 5 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Sat 03/25 1:16 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Dismissal Thu 03/23 4:12 PM
Notice of Dismissal filed by Brittany Jane Nelson of Quinn Emanuel on behalf of Lynn Tavenner. (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
3 3 crditcrd none Tue 08/16 12:05 AM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-03065 KRH] ) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A34628531, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Monday, August 15, 2022
2 2 motion Sealed Document Mon 08/15 11:41 PM
Sealed Motion/Application filed by Brittany Jane Nelson of Quinn Emanuel on behalf of Lynn Tavenner. (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 08/15 11:38 PM
Adversary case 22-03065 Complaint against Thomas Wolf filed by Lynn Tavenner. Nature of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:19-bk-34574 (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]