Minnesota District Court
Judge:Donovan W Frank
Referred: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Case #: 0:22-cv-02045
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1982 Property Rights of Citizens
Case Filed:Aug 19, 2022
Terminated:Jan 10, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 15, 2023 6:57 AM CST
Defendant
Nathan Bissonette
Represented By
Robert David Hahn
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Rebecca J. Krystosek
Ramsey County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Rachel Ann Kitze Collins
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
David J Zoll
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Robert B Roche
Ramsey County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Charles N Nauen
Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
Jane Doe
Represented By
Robert David Hahn
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Rachel Ann Kitze Collins
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
David J Zoll
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Charles N Nauen
Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
John Doe
Represented By
Robert David Hahn
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Rachel Ann Kitze Collins
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
David J Zoll
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Charles N Nauen
Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
John Doe Inc.
Defendant
Ramsey County
Represented By
Robert David Hahn
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Rebecca J. Krystosek
Ramsey County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Rachel Ann Kitze Collins
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
David J Zoll
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Robert B Roche
Ramsey County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Charles N Nauen
Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
Jim Schowalter
Represented By
William C. Mattessich
Minnesota Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Oliver J Larson
Minnesota Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
AlexSoft, L.L.C.
Represented By
Claire Christian Barlow
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
Philip Joseph Krzeski
Chestnut Cambronne PA
contact info
Christopher P Renz
Chestnut Cambronne PA
contact info
David J Carrier
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wayne D. Anderson
Represented By
Robert David Hahn
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Rebecca J. Krystosek
Ramsey County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Rachel Ann Kitze Collins
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
David J Zoll
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Robert B Roche
Ramsey County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Charles N Nauen
Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
Susan R. Roth
Represented By
Robert David Hahn
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Rebecca J. Krystosek
Ramsey County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Rachel Ann Kitze Collins
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
David J Zoll
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Robert B Roche
Ramsey County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Charles N Nauen
Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
Todd J. Uecker
Represented By
Robert David Hahn
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Rebecca J. Krystosek
Ramsey County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Rachel Ann Kitze Collins
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
David J Zoll
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Robert B Roche
Ramsey County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Charles N Nauen
Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff
Brenda Salcedo
Represented By
Lawrence H Crosby
Crosby & Associates
contact info
Zachary Crosby
contact info
Plaintiff
Dennis M. Novack
Represented By
Lawrence H Crosby
Crosby & Associates
contact info
Zachary Crosby
contact info
Plaintiff
Janet C. Novack
Represented By
Lawrence H Crosby
Crosby & Associates
contact info
Zachary Crosby
contact info

GPO Apr 24 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Defendant Jim Schowalter's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 34) is GRANTED. Defendant AlexSoft's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 39) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' claims against Schowalter and AlexSoft (Doc. No. [1-1]) are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. No. 49) is DENIED. Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class (Doc. No. 44) is DENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend (Doc. No. 71) is DENIED. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 4/24/2023. (las)
GPO Jan 10 2024
ORDER - Ramsey County Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Doc. No. 99) is GRANTED and Plaintiffs' Complaint (Doc. No. [1-1]) is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 1/10/2024. (las)

Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, January 11, 2024
108 108 order Judgment (Clerk's Office Only) Thu 01/11 10:26 AM
JUDGMENT(ACH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
107 107 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Wed 01/10 11:53 AM
ORDER - Ramsey County Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Doc. No.99 ) is GRANTED and Plaintiffs' Complaint (Doc. No. [1-1]) is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 1/10/2024. (las)
Related: [-]