Original Case: 0:22-cv-02045

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-02283
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Case Filed:May 25, 2023
Terminated:Aug 11, 2023
Last checked: Monday Aug 14, 2023 3:23 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
Todd J. Uecker, Registrar of Titles, in and for the County of Ramsey and State of Minnesota, in his individual and official capacity, and on behalf of all others similarly situated within and without Ramsey County
Represented By
Robert David Hahn
LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL
contact info
Charles Nathan Nauen
LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL
contact info
Robert B. Roche
RAMSEY COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
contact info
Rachel Kitze Collins
LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL
contact info
Rebecca J. Krystosek
RAMSEY COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
contact info
David Joseph Zoll
LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Wayne D. Anderson, Ramsey County Examiner of Titles, in his individual and official capacity, and on behalf of all others similarly situated within and without Ramsey County
Represented By
Robert David Hahn
LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL
contact info
Charles Nathan Nauen
LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL
contact info
Robert B. Roche
RAMSEY COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
contact info
Rachel Kitze Collins
LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL
contact info
Rebecca J. Krystosek
RAMSEY COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
contact info
David Joseph Zoll
LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Nathan Bissonette, Deputy Ramsey County Examiner of Titles, in his individual and official capacity, and on behalf of all others similarly situated within and without Ramsey County
Represented By
Robert David Hahn
LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL
contact info
Charles Nathan Nauen
LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL
contact info
Robert B. Roche
RAMSEY COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
contact info
Rachel Kitze Collins
LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL
contact info
Rebecca J. Krystosek
RAMSEY COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
contact info
David Joseph Zoll
LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Jane Doe, Deputy Registrar of Titles or Deputy Examiner of Titles or Clerk of the Registrar of Titles, in and for the County of Ramsey and State of Minnesota, Name and Address Unknown and Undiscoverable, in her individual and official capacity, and on beha
Represented By
Robert David Hahn
LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL
contact info
Charles Nathan Nauen
LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL
contact info
Rachel Kitze Collins
LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL
contact info
David Joseph Zoll
LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Susan R. Roth, former Registrar of Titles, in and for the County of Ramsey and State of Minnesota, in her individual and official capacity, and on behalf of all others similarly situated within and without Ramsey County
Represented By
Robert David Hahn
LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL
contact info
Charles Nathan Nauen
LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL
contact info
Robert B. Roche
RAMSEY COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
contact info
Rachel Kitze Collins
LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL
contact info
Rebecca J. Krystosek
RAMSEY COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
contact info
David Joseph Zoll
LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Ramsey County, a political subdivision of the State of Minnesota, for itself and on behalf of all other Minnesota counties
Represented By
Robert David Hahn
LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL
contact info
Charles Nathan Nauen
LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL
contact info
Robert B. Roche
RAMSEY COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
contact info
Rachel Kitze Collins
LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL
contact info
Rebecca J. Krystosek
RAMSEY COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
contact info
David Joseph Zoll
LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, Name and Address Unknown and Undiscoverable, in his individual and official capacity, and on behalf of all others similarly situated within and without Ramsey County
Represented By
Robert David Hahn
LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL
contact info
Charles Nathan Nauen
LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL
contact info
Rachel Kitze Collins
LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL
contact info
David Joseph Zoll
LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
AlexSoft, L.L.C., a Minnesota limited liability company, doing business as West Central Indexing, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated in Minnesota both within and without Ramsey County
Represented By
Philip Joseph Krzeski
CHESTNUT & CAMBRONNE
contact info
Christopher Paul Renz
CHESTNUT & CAMBRONNE
contact info
Claire Christian Barlow
NELSON & MULLINS
contact info
David J. Carrier
NELSON & MULLINS
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe Inc., Name and Address Unknown and Undiscoverable, for itself and on behalf of all other entities similarly situated
Defendant - Appellee
Jim Schowalter, Minnesota Commissioner of Management and Budget, in his official capacity
Represented By
William C. Mattessich
U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
contact info
Oliver J. Larson
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Brenda Salcedo, individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By
Zachary Mark Crosby
contact info
Lawrence Herman Crosby
CROSBY & ASSOCIATES
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Dennis M. Novack, individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By
Zachary Mark Crosby
contact info
Lawrence Herman Crosby
CROSBY & ASSOCIATES
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Janet C. Novack, individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By
Zachary Mark Crosby
contact info
Lawrence Herman Crosby
CROSBY & ASSOCIATES
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/14/2023 3:23 AM CDT
Thursday, May 25, 2023
4 pgs Civil case docketed. [5280812] 23-2283 (ASL)
Related: [-]
30+ pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal filed 5/24/2023, Memorandum Opinion and Order filed 4/24/2023 and docket entries, [5280821] 23-2283 (ASL)
Related: [-]
2 pgs BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS:
Transcript due on or before 07/05/2023. Appendix due 07/14/2023. BRIEF APPELLANT, Dennis M. Novack, Janet C. Novack and Brenda Salcedo due 07/14/2023
Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant.
[5280831] 23-2283 (ASL)
Related: [-]