Cain v. Mandl College of Allied Health et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Edgardo Ramos |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-01729 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Other |
Case Filed: | Mar 04, 2014 |
Terminated: | Jun 23, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 13, 2016 8:01 AM EDT |
Defendant
Mandel School College of Allied Health
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mandl School Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Aisha Reid
|
|
Defendant
Mel Weiner
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stew Weiner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ileen Cain
66 Rockwell Place Apt. 13H
Brooklyn, NY 11217 |
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
114 | 114
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 03/12 3:03 PM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to113 Notice of Appeal filed by Ileen Cain. USCA Case Number 14-1729 Appellant, pro se, moves for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED and the appeal is DISMISSED because it "lacks an arguable basis either in law or in fact." Neitzke v. Williams, 490 U.S. 319, 325 (1989); see also 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e).. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 03/12/2018. (nd) |
|
appeal
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge
Mon 03/12 3:04 PM
Transmission of USCA Mandate to the District Judge re:114 USCA Mandate,,. (nd) |