California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:22-bk-22290
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2022
Creditor Meeting:Oct 18, 2022

Debtor
AMD Metal Works, Inc
5533 Ensemble Way
Roseville, CA 95747-8939
Represented By
Mark A. Wolff
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Geoffrey Richards
PO Box 579
Orinda, CA 94563
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
Robert T Matsui United States Courthouse 501 I Street, Room 7-500
Sacramento, CA 95814


Docket last updated: 09/10/2022 12:01 AM PDT
Friday, September 09, 2022
misc EFILED RECEIPT - Voluntary Petition Fee Paid (7) [ADI] Fri 09/09 12:46 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (Filing Fee Paid: $338.00, Receipt Number: 378194, eFilingID: 7133154) (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition 7 - Case Upload Fri 09/09 12:40 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual filed. (Fee Paid $338.00) (Mark Andrew Wolff) (eFilingID: 7133154)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate DEBTOR - Including Supplemental Fri 09/09 1:32 PM
Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate Debtor/Party. See page 66 of Voluntary Petition (wmim) Modified on 9/9/2022 (wmim)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility First Meeting - 7 Business Fri 09/09 12:41 PM
Meeting of Creditors to be held on 10/18/2022 at 11:00 AM. See our website for location. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Master Address List Fri 09/09 12:44 PM
Master Address List (auto)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Appointment of Interim Trustee - Including Amended Appointment (Produces Form) Fri 09/09 12:46 PM
Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Geoffrey Richards (auto)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Incomplete Filing and NOI to Dismiss Case - Chapter 7 Fri 09/09 1:37 PM
Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case If Documents Are Not Timely Filed. Missing Document(s): Statement of Financial Affairs; Document(s) due by 9/23/2022. (wmim)
Related: [-]