Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-22290

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:23-ap-02017
Nature of Suit1 null
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2022
Terminated:Jun 30, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Light Tree Three, L.P.
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Mathew Robert Troughton
Hennigh Law Corporation
contact info
Defendant
Johnstone Moyer, Inc.
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
AMD Metal Works, Inc.
5533 Ensemble Way
Roseville, CA 95747
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Friday, June 30, 2023
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 06/30 2:40 PM
Adversary Proceeding 2:23-ap-2017 Closed (msam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2023
63 63 order Generic Order - Links to Non-Motion Thu 06/29 4:31 PM
Order Concluding Status Conference RE:1 Notice of Removal [CAE-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. (msam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
62 62 misc Matter Held * Thu 06/29 1:42 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status conference Concluded, Adversary Dismissed [CAE-1] Re: Continued Status Conference Re: Notice of Removal -1 - (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)) : Notice of Removal by AMD Metal Works, Inc. against Light Tree Three, L.P., Johnstone Moyer, Inc.. (Fee $350.00) (ORIGINALLY FILED IN THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA/SAN FRANCISCO DIVISION) (mpem) (auto)
Related: [-]