Original Case: 1:15-cv-06475

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-02051
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2022
Terminated:Dec 15, 2022
Last checked: Friday Dec 16, 2022 3:57 AM EST
Defendant
Dion Thomas
Defendant
New York City Commission on Human Rights
Defendant
Gayle Donowitz, of Canarsie High School and the body of Canarsie High School
Defendant
Marc Sclar, of intermediate School 303 and the Body of Intermediate School 303
Defendant
Accetura, of franklin Delanore Roosevelt High School and (the body of FDR)
Defendant
Elaine Jacobson, Of Sheepshead Bay High School and the Body of Sheepshead Bay High School
Defendant
Carter
Defendant
Geraldine Pomponio
Defendant
Reesa Levy
Defendant
John Cayton
Defendant
Grace Lewis
Defendant
Maritza Soto
Defendant
Teri Di' Ambrosio
Defendant
Teri Amass
Defendant
Mario Ford
Defendant
Anna Garner
Defendant
Charles Turner, For the body of the United Federation of Teachers
Defendant
Howard Schoor
Defendant
Michael Mulgrew
Defendant
Judge Bernadette F. Bayne, The body of the Supreme Court Kings County Civil Term
Defendant
John O'Mahoney
Defendant
Catherine Morrissey, for Sheepshead Bay High School and the body of Sheepshead Bay High School
Defendant
Hubert Guscott
Defendant
Dr. Ann Garner, DOE and the Body of the Department of Education
Defendant
Thomas Bennett, UFT and the Body of the UFT
Defendant - Appellee
New York City Department of Education
Represented By
Sylvia Hinds-Radix
New York City Law Department
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Lisa Gindi
Represented By
Lisa Gindi
-
contact info
Respondent
Oriana Vigliottie, NYSUT Counsel
Respondent
John P Guyette, Assistant Corporate Counsel


Docket last updated: 12/16/2022 3:42 AM EST
Monday, September 19, 2022
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Lisa Gindi, FILED. [3385711] 22-2051 [Entered: 09/21/2022 08:39 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 11 pgs Case FILED
2 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Lisa Gindi, district court receipt # 100001574, FILED.[3385734] 22-2051 [Entered: 09/21/2022 09:14 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 13 pgs DISTRICT COURT TEXT ORDER, dated 08/16/2022, RECEIVED.[3385738] 22-2051 [Entered: 09/21/2022 09:17 AM]
Related: [-]
4 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3385744] 22-2051 [Entered: 09/21/2022 09:19 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 11 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED