New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Nancy Hershey Lord
Case #: 1:22-bk-42336
Case Filed:Sep 23, 2022

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
7614 LLC
9322 Third Avenue Suite 502 Brooklyn
Brooklyn, NY 11209
Represented By
Kevin J Nash
Goldberg Weprin Finkel Goldstein LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn Office) U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Suite 1006
New York, NY 10014


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 6:06 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Mon 04/28 2:37 PM
Hearing Held; Appearances - Kevin Nash & J. Ted Donovan(Counsel to 7614 LLC), Douglas Pick (Counsel to Nizar Khoury, Urban Construction & Management, Inc., Urban Engineering, P.C), Paul A. Rubin (Counsel to 7614 4th Lender LLC), John C. Kim (Counsel to United Korean Chruch of New York), Shannon Anne Scott (Office of the US Trustee);and Adjourned; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2025 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 104 Motion for Sale of Property under Sec. 363(b), Rule 6004 filed by 7614 4th Lender LLC
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Mon 04/28 2:38 PM
Hearing Held; Appearances - Kevin Nash & J. Ted Donovan(Counsel to 7614 LLC), Douglas Pick (Counsel to Nizar Khoury, Urban Construction & Management, Inc., Urban Engineering, P.C), Paul A. Rubin (Counsel to 7614 4th Lender LLC), John C. Kim (Counsel to United Korean Chruch of New York), Shannon Anne Scott (Office of the US Trustee);and Adjourned; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2025 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 49 Notice of Hearing on Disclosure Statement filed by Nizar Khoury, Urban Construction & Management, Inc., Urban Engineering, P.C.
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Mon 04/28 2:38 PM
Hearing Held; Appearances - Kevin Nash & J. Ted Donovan(Counsel to 7614 LLC), Douglas Pick (Counsel to Nizar Khoury, Urban Construction & Management, Inc., Urban Engineering, P.C), Paul A. Rubin (Counsel to 7614 4th Lender LLC), John C. Kim (Counsel to United Korean Chruch of New York), Shannon Anne Scott (Office of the US Trustee);and Adjourned; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2025 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 80 Motion to Appoint Trustee filed by Nizar Khoury, Urban Construction & Management, Inc., Urban Engineering, P.C.
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Mon 04/28 2:39 PM
Hearing Held; Appearances - Kevin Nash & J. Ted Donovan(Counsel to 7614 LLC), Douglas Pick (Counsel to Nizar Khoury, Urban Construction & Management, Inc., Urban Engineering, P.C), Paul A. Rubin (Counsel to 7614 4th Lender LLC), John C. Kim (Counsel to United Korean Chruch of New York), Shannon Anne Scott (Office of the US Trustee);and Adjourned; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2025 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 83 Motion to Object/Reclassify/Reduce/Expunge Claims filed by Nizar Khoury, Urban Construction & Management, Inc., Urban Engineering, P.C.
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Mon 04/28 2:39 PM
Hearing Held; Appearances - Kevin Nash & J. Ted Donovan(Counsel to 7614 LLC), Douglas Pick (Counsel to Nizar Khoury, Urban Construction & Management, Inc., Urban Engineering, P.C), Paul A. Rubin (Counsel to 7614 4th Lender LLC), John C. Kim (Counsel to United Korean Chruch of New York), Shannon Anne Scott (Office of the US Trustee);and Adjourned; Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 05/28/2025 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 9 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Monday, April 21, 2025
126 126 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/21 4:01 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by J Ted Donovan on behalf of 7614 LLC (Donovan, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents
125 125 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/21 4:00 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 02/28/2025 Filed by J Ted Donovan on behalf of 7614 LLC (Donovan, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents