Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-42336

New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Nancy Hershey Lord
Case #: 1:23-ap-01017
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
United Korean Church of New York
Represented By
United Korean Church of New York
contact info
Plaintiff
7614 LLC
9322 Third Avenue
Brooklyn, NY 11209
Represented By
J Ted Donovan
Goldberg Weprin Finkel Goldstein LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Mon 04/28 2:40 PM
Hearing Held; Appearances - Kevin Nash & J. Ted Donovan(Counsel to 7614 LLC), Douglas Pick (Counsel to Nizar Khoury, Urban Construction & Management, Inc., Urban Engineering, P.C), Paul A. Rubin (Counsel to 7614 4th Lender LLC), John C. Kim (Counsel to United Korean Chruch of New York), Shannon Anne Scott (Office of the US Trustee);and Adjourned; Related [+]Pre-Trial Conference set for 05/28/2025 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Mon 04/28 2:40 PM
Hearing Held; Appearances - Kevin Nash & J. Ted Donovan(Counsel to 7614 LLC), Douglas Pick (Counsel to Nizar Khoury, Urban Construction & Management, Inc., Urban Engineering, P.C), Paul A. Rubin (Counsel to 7614 4th Lender LLC), John C. Kim (Counsel to United Korean Chruch of New York), Shannon Anne Scott (Office of the US Trustee);and Adjourned; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2025 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by United Korean Church of New York
Thursday, April 10, 2025
29 29 misc Mediator's Report Thu 04/10 7:08 PM
Mediator's Report Regarding Mediation Between the Debtor and the United Korean Church of New York . Filed by Fred Stevens on behalf of Fred Stevens (Stevens, Fred)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
28 28 misc Mediator's Report Tue 03/25 2:44 PM
Interim Mediator's Report Regarding Mediation Between the Debtor and the United Korean Church of New York . Filed by Fred Stevens on behalf of Fred Stevens (Stevens, Fred)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Fri 03/14 11:11 AM
Hearing Held; Appearances - Kevin Nash (Counsel to 7614 LLC), Shannon Scott (Office of the US Trustee), Douglas Pick (Counsel to Nizar Khoury, Urban Construction & Management, Inc., Urban Engineering, P.C), John C Kim (Counsel to United Korean Church of New York), Paul A. Rubin (Counsel to 7614 4th Lender LLC); and Adjourned; Hearing to be held on 04/22/2025 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. Related [+] (drk)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Fri 03/14 11:12 AM
Hearing Held; Appearances - Kevin Nash (Counsel to 7614 LLC), Shannon Scott (Office of the US Trustee), Douglas Pick (Counsel to Nizar Khoury, Urban Construction & Management, Inc., Urban Engineering, P.C), John C Kim (Counsel to United Korean Church of New York), Paul A. Rubin (Counsel to 7614 4th Lender LLC); and Adjourned; Hearing scheduled for 04/22/2025 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (drk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Tue 02/04 9:57 AM
Hearing Held; ; Appearances - Kevin Nash (Counsel to 7614 LLC), Jeremy S. Sussman (Office of the US Trustee), Douglas Pick (Counsel to Nizar Khoury, Urban Construction & Management, Inc., Urban Engineering, P.C), Fred Stevens(Mediator), Gregory Messer (Counsel to Allied Properties, LLC), Paul A. Rubin (Counsel to 7614 4th Lender LLC), John C. Kim (Counsel to United Korean Chruch of New York);and Adjourned; Related [+]Pre-Trial Conference set for 03/11/2025 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Tue 02/04 9:58 AM
Hearing Held; ; Appearances - Kevin Nash (Counsel to 7614 LLC), Jeremy S. Sussman (Office of the US Trustee), Douglas Pick (Counsel to Nizar Khoury, Urban Construction & Management, Inc., Urban Engineering, P.C), Fred Stevens(Mediator), Gregory Messer (Counsel to Allied Properties, LLC), Paul A. Rubin (Counsel to 7614 4th Lender LLC), John C. Kim (Counsel to United Korean Chruch of New York);and Adjourned; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 03/11/2025 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by United Korean Church of New York
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
27 27 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Tue 12/17 4:26 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from December 18, 2024 to February 4, 2025 at 9:30 a.m. Filed by J Ted Donovan on behalf of 7614 LLC (Donovan, J)
Related: [-]
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Tue 12/17 4:38 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 02/04/2025 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Document BK & AP) Tue 12/17 4:38 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 02/04/2025 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by United Korean Church of New York
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Tue 12/03 10:25 AM
Hearing Held; Appearances - Kevin Nash (Counsel to 7614 LLC), Shannon Anne Scott (Office of the US Trustee), Douglas Pick (Counsel to Nizar Khoury, Urban Construction & Management, Inc., Urban Engineering, P.C), Fred Stevens(Mediator), Greg Messer (Counsel to Allied Properties, LLC), Paul A. Rubin (Counsel to 7614 4th Lender LLC);and Adjourned; Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/18/2024 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Tue 12/03 10:26 AM
Hearing Held; Appearances - Kevin Nash (Counsel to 7614 LLC), Shannon Anne Scott (Office of the US Trustee), Douglas Pick (Counsel to Nizar Khoury, Urban Construction & Management, Inc., Urban Engineering, P.C), Fred Stevens(Mediator), Greg Messer (Counsel to Allied Properties, LLC), Paul A. Rubin (Counsel to 7614 4th Lender LLC);and Adjourned; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 12/18/2024 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by United Korean Church of New York
Monday, November 04, 2024
26 26 order Stipulation and Order Mon 11/04 2:41 PM
Stipulation and Mediation Order Related [+]. Signed on 11/4/2024. (jag)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
25 25 order Assigning Matter to Mediation Mon 11/04 2:38 PM
Order Referring Mediation. Fred Stevens, Esq. is hereby appointed and authorized to serve as the Mediator, and the Parties shall submit a stipulation and mediation order (a proposed form of which is annexed hereto) to be so-ordered by this Court, which sets forth certain terms of the Mediation Related [+]. Signed on 11/4/2024. (jag)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Monday, October 28, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Proposed Stipulation Mon 10/28 5:22 PM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Mediate Filed by J Ted Donovan on behalf of 7614 LLC (Donovan, J)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Mon 10/28 2:21 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from October 29, 2024 to December 3, 2024 at 9:30 a.m. Filed by J Ted Donovan on behalf of 7614 LLC Related [+] (Donovan, J)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto),6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant United Korean Church of New York
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Mon 10/28 3:19 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/03/2024 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Document BK & AP) Mon 10/28 3:20 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 12/03/2024 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by United Korean Church of New York
Thursday, September 26, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Thu 09/26 12:23 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned - Appearances: Kevin Nash(Counsel to 7614 LLC), Nazar Khodorovsky (Office of the US Trustee), Douglas Pick (Counsel to Nizar Khoury, Urban Construction & Management, Inc., Urban Engineering, P.C), Fred Stevens(Mediator), John C Kim (Counsel to United Korean Church of New York), Hanh Huynh (Counsel to 7614 4th Lender LLC ), Greg Messer (Counsel to Allied Properties, LLC) Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/29/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY Related [+] (sej)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto),1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff 7614 LLC
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Thu 09/26 12:24 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned - Appearances: Kevin Nash(Counsel to 7614 LLC), Nazar Khodorovsky (Office of the US Trustee), Douglas Pick (Counsel to Nizar Khoury, Urban Construction & Management, Inc., Urban Engineering, P.C), Fred Stevens(Mediator), John C Kim (Counsel to United Korean Church of New York), Hanh Huynh (Counsel to 7614 4th Lender LLC ), Greg Messer (Counsel to Allied Properties, LLC) 'Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY Related [+] (sej)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendant United Korean Church of New York
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
22 22 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Tue 09/10 2:43 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from September 10, 2024 to September 26, 2024 at 9:30 a.m. Filed by J Ted Donovan on behalf of 7614 LLC Related [+] (Donovan, J)
Related: [-] 21 Letter of Adjournment filed by Plaintiff 7614 LLC
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Tue 09/10 9:05 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 09/26/2024 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Document BK & AP) Tue 09/10 9:05 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2024 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by United Korean Church of New York
Monday, September 09, 2024
21 21 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Mon 09/09 6:22 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from September 10, 2024 to September 26, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by J Ted Donovan on behalf of 7614 LLC (Donovan, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Wed 07/24 2:36 PM
Hearing Held; Appearances: J Ted Donovan (Counsel to 7614 LLC), Jeremy S. Sussman (Office of the US Trustee), Douglas Pick (Counsel to Nizar Khoury, Urban Construction & Management, Inc., Urban Engineering, P.C), Paul A. Rubin (Counsel to 7614 4th Lender LLC), John C. Kim (Counsel to United Korean Church of New York); and Adjourned; Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 09/10/2024 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Wed 07/24 2:37 PM
Hearing Held; Appearances: J Ted Donovan (Counsel to 7614 LLC), Jeremy S. Sussman (Office of the US Trustee), Douglas Pick (Counsel to Nizar Khoury, Urban Construction & Management, Inc., Urban Engineering, P.C), Paul A. Rubin (Counsel to 7614 4th Lender LLC), John C. Kim (Counsel to United Korean Church of New York); and Adjourned; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2024 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by United Korean Church of New York
Monday, May 06, 2024
20 20 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Mon 05/06 5:56 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from May 7, 2024 to July 16, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. Filed by J Ted Donovan on behalf of 7614 LLC (Donovan, J)
Related: [-]
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Mon 05/06 2:14 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 07/16/2024 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Document BK & AP) Mon 05/06 2:14 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2024 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by United Korean Church of New York
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Tue 04/02 8:24 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 04/02/2024 at 03:00 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Document BK & AP) Tue 04/02 8:25 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 04/02/2024 at 03:00 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by United Korean Church of New York
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Mon 04/08 7:44 AM
Hearing Held; Appearances: J Ted Donovan (Counsel to 7614 LLC), Jeremy S. Sussman (Office of the US Trustee), Eric Zabicki (Counsel to Nizar Khoury, Urban Construction & Management, Inc., Urban Engineering, P.C), Paul A. Rubin (Counsel to 7614 4th Lender LLC), John C. Kim (Counsel to United Korean Church of New York); and Adjourned; Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 05/07/2024 at 03:30 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Mon 04/08 7:44 AM
Hearing Held; Appearances: J Ted Donovan (Counsel to 7614 LLC), Jeremy S. Sussman (Office of the US Trustee), Eric Zabicki (Counsel to Nizar Khoury, Urban Construction & Management, Inc., Urban Engineering, P.C), Paul A. Rubin (Counsel to 7614 4th Lender LLC), John C. Kim (Counsel to United Korean Church of New York); and Adjourned; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2024 at 03:30 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by United Korean Church of New York
Monday, April 01, 2024
19 19 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Mon 04/01 5:09 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from April 2, 2024 at 11:00 a.m. to April 2, 2024 at 3:00 p.m. Filed by J Ted Donovan on behalf of 7614 LLC (Donovan, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Mon 03/11 8:33 AM
Hearing Held; Appearances: J Ted Donovan (Counsel to 7614 LLC), Reema Lateef (Office of the US Trustee), Douglas Pick (Counsel to Nizar Khoury, Urban Construction & Management, Inc., Urban Engineering, P.C), Paul A. Rubin (Counsel to 7614 4th Lender LLC), John C. Kim (Counsel to United Korean Church of New York);and Adjourned; Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 04/02/2024 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Mon 03/11 8:34 AM
Hearing Held; Appearances: J Ted Donovan (Counsel to 7614 LLC), Reema Lateef (Office of the US Trustee), Douglas Pick (Counsel to Nizar Khoury, Urban Construction & Management, Inc., Urban Engineering, P.C), Paul A. Rubin (Counsel to 7614 4th Lender LLC), John C. Kim (Counsel to United Korean Church of New York); and Adjourned; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 04/02/2024 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by United Korean Church of New York
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Sun 01/21 12:10 PM
Pre-Trial Hearing Held; Appearances: J Ted Donovan (Counsel to 7614 LLC), Shannon Scott (Office of the US Trustee), Douglas Pick (Counsel to Nizar Khoury, Urban Construction & Management, Inc., Urban Engineering, P.C), Paul A. Rubin (Counsel to 7614 4th Lender LLC), John C. Kim (Counsel to United Korean Church of New York); and Adjourned; Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 03/05/2024 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Sun 01/21 12:11 PM
Hearing Held; Appearances: J Ted Donovan (Counsel to 7614 LLC), Shannon Scott (Office of the US Trustee), Douglas Pick (Counsel to Nizar Khoury, Urban Construction & Management, Inc., Urban Engineering, P.C), Paul A. Rubin (Counsel to 7614 4th Lender LLC), John C. Kim (Counsel to United Korean Church of New York); and Adjourned; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 03/05/2024 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by United Korean Church of New York
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Tue 11/28 8:14 AM
Pre-Trial Hearing Held; Appearances: J Ted Donovan (Counsel to 7614 LLC), Jeremy S. Sussman (US Trustee), Douglas Pick (Counsel to Nizar Khoury, Urban Construction & Management, Inc., Urban Engineering, P.C), Paul A. Rubin (Counsel to 7614 4th Lender LLC), John C. Kim (Counsel to United Korean Church of New York); and Adjourned; Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/16/2024 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Tue 11/28 8:15 AM
Hearing Held; Appearances: J Ted Donovan (Counsel to 7614 LLC), Jeremy S. Sussman (US Trustee), Douglas Pick (Counsel to Nizar Khoury, Urban Construction & Management, Inc., Urban Engineering, P.C), Paul A. Rubin (Counsel to 7614 4th Lender LLC), John C. Kim (Counsel to United Korean Church of New York); and Adjourned/Carried to 01/16/2024 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. ; Related [+] (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by United Korean Church of New York
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Tue 10/31 10:34 AM
Adjourned by the Court to 11/21/2023 at 03:30 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY Related [+] (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Document BK & AP) Tue 10/31 10:35 AM
Adjourned by the Court to 11/21/2023 at 03:30 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY Related [+] (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by United Korean Church of New York
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Wed 09/20 7:52 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Complaint by 7614 LLC against United Korean Church of New York. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/01/2023 at 03:30 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AureliaCruz
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Document BK & AP) Wed 09/20 7:57 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+]
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by John C Kim on behalf of United Korean Church of New York (related document(s)1 ) Hearing scheduled for 11/01/2023 at 03:30 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AureliaCruz
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
18 18 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Tue 09/19 6:06 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from September 20, 2023 to November 1, 2023 at 3:30 p.m. Filed by J Ted Donovan on behalf of 7614 LLC Related [+] (Donovan, J)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto),6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant United Korean Church of New York
Monday, September 18, 2023
17 17 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Mon 09/18 3:54 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from September 20, 2023 to November 1, 2023 at 2:00 p.m. Filed by J Ted Donovan on behalf of 7614 LLC Related [+] (Donovan, J)
Related: [-] 4 Blank Creditor Notice (Select Specific Creditors to Notice),6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant United Korean Church of New York
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Tue 08/01 7:42 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 09/20/2023 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Document BK & AP) Tue 08/01 7:42 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2023 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by United Korean Church of New York
Monday, July 31, 2023
16 16 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Mon 07/31 5:58 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from August 8, 2023 to September 20, 2023 at 2:00 p.m. Filed by J Ted Donovan on behalf of 7614 LLC Related [+] (Donovan, J)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto),6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant United Korean Church of New York
Monday, June 26, 2023
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Mon 06/26 7:45 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 08/08/2023 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Document BK & AP) Mon 06/26 7:46 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 08/08/2023 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by United Korean Church of New York
Friday, June 23, 2023
15 15 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Fri 06/23 5:55 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from June 28, 2023 to August 8, 2023 at 2:00 p.m. Filed by J Ted Donovan on behalf of 7614 LLC Related [+] (Donovan, J)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto),6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant United Korean Church of New York
Friday, May 26, 2023
14 14 misc Statement Fri 05/26 11:25 AM
Statement /Order of the Appellate Division, Second Department, Granting Temporary Restraining Order barring enforcement of judgment pending hearing scheduled for June 5, 2023. Filed by J Ted Donovan on behalf of 7614 LLC (Donovan, J)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
13 13 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 05/25 12:19 PM
Summons Served on United Korean Church of New York 3/10/2023 . (Donovan, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Tue 05/23 1:02 PM
Pre-Trial Hearing Held; Appearances: J Ted Donovan (Counsel to 7614 LLC), Rachel Wolf(US Trustee), John C. Kim (Counsel to United Korean Church of New York), Douglas Pick (Counsel to f Nazir Y. Khoury, Urban Construction & Management, Inc., Urban Engineering, P.C), and Adjourned; Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 06/28/2023 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Tue 05/23 1:02 PM
Hearing Held; Appearances: J Ted Donovan (Counsel to 7614 LLC), Rachel Wolf(US Trustee), John C. Kim (Counsel to United Korean Church of New York), Douglas Pick (Counsel to f Nazir Y. Khoury, Urban Construction & Management, Inc., Urban Engineering, P.C); and Adjourned; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 06/28/2023 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by United Korean Church of New York
Friday, May 19, 2023
12 12 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Fri 05/19 6:31 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by John C Kim on behalf of United Korean Church of New York Related [+] (Kim, John)
Related: [-] 11 Reply filed by Defendant United Korean Church of New York
11 11 answer Reply Fri 05/19 6:27 PM
Reply Filed by John C Kim on behalf of United Korean Church of New York Related [+] (Kim, John)
Related: [-] 10 Objection filed by Plaintiff 7614 LLC
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
10 10 answer Objection Tue 05/16 4:36 PM
Objection to motion to dismiss. Filed by J Ted Donovan on behalf of 7614 LLC Related [+] (Donovan, J)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant United Korean Church of New York
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
9 9 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Tue 04/25 3:19 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from 5/9/2023 at 11:00 am to 5/23/2023 at 11:30 am Filed by United Korean Church of New York Related [+]. (Kim, John)
Related: [-] 2
8 8 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Tue 04/25 3:15 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by John C Kim on behalf of United Korean Church of New York Related [+] (Kim, John)
Related: [-] 7 Amended Notice of Motion/Presentment filed by Defendant United Korean Church of New York
7 7 notice Amended Notice of Motion/Presentment (use to correct date, time or location of a presentment / heari Tue 04/25 3:14 PM
Amended Notice of Motion/Presentment . Objections to be filed on 5/16/2023. Hearing on Objections, if any, will be held on: TBD. Filed by United Korean Church of New York. Hearing scheduled for 5/23/2023 at 11:30 AM (check with court for location). (Kim, John)
Related: [-]
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Tue 04/25 3:23 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 05/23/2023 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Friday, April 21, 2023
6 6 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 04/21 5:57 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by John C Kim on behalf of United Korean Church of New York Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 5/23/2023 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (Kim, John)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, March 24, 2023
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice to Creditors Sat 03/25 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice to Creditors Notice Date 03/24/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
4 4 court Blank Creditor Notice (Select Specific Creditors to Notice) Wed 03/22 2:32 PM
Notice of Corrected Hearing Location for the Pretrial Conference Re: Related [+] (agh)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Friday, March 10, 2023
3 3 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Fri 03/10 2:16 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service /Affirmation of Service Filed by Kevin J Nash on behalf of 7614 LLC Related [+] (Nash, Kevin)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff 7614 LLC,2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
2 2 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto) Wed 03/08 2:29 PM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office against United Korean Church of New York Answer Due: 4/7/2023. Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/9/2023 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (ads)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/07 5:27 PM
Adversary case 1 23-01017 Complaint by 7614 LLC against United Korean Church of New York. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))). (Donovan, J)
Related: [-]