Original Case: 9:21-cv-00138

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv.pr-02013
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 27, 2022 4:23 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
SEA PINES RESORT LLC
Represented By
John Phillips Linton Jr.
WALKER GRESSETTE & LINTON, LLC
contact info
George Trenholm Walker
PRATT-THOMAS WALKER, PA
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
COMMUNITY SERVICES ASSOCIATES INC.
Represented By
Glenn Wade Leach III
BURR & FORMAN, LLP
contact info
William Shawn Bingham
FREEMAN MATHIS & GARY, LLP
contact info
Benjamin E. Nicholson
BURR & FORMAN, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ASSOCIATION OF SEA PINES PLANTATION PROPERTY OWNERS AND THE ADVISORY BOARD
Represented By
Mark Brandon Goddard Jr.
TURNER PADGET GRAHAM AND LANEY
contact info
Nicholas Clarence Chapma Stewart
SHUMAKER LOOP & KENDRICK, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JILL K. JINKS, individually and as Trustee of the Jinks Heritage Trust
Represented By
Ainsley Fisher Tillman
FORD WALLACE THOMSON LLC
contact info
Steven James Flynn
LOCKE LORD LLP
contact info
Elizabeth J. Campbell
LOCKE LORD LLP
contact info
Ian Scott Ford
FORD WALLACE THOMSON LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/27/2022 4:20 AM EDT
Monday, September 26, 2022
1 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 9:21-cv-00138-DCN. Case manager: KHancock. [1001236285] 22-2013 KH [Entered: 09/26/2022 03:50 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 6 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case Originating case number: 9:21-cv-00138-DCN. Mailed to: William Shawn Bingham, Elizabeth J. Campbell, Nicholas Clarence Chapma Stewart, Steven James Flynn, Mark Brandon Goddard Jr. [1001236293] 22-2013 KH [Entered: 09/26/2022 03:53 PM]
Related: [-]