South Carolina District Court
Judge:David C Norton
Case #: 9:21-cv-00138
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Jan 13, 2021
Terminated:Aug 25, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jul 12, 2021 6:51 AM EDT
Defendant
Association of Sea Pines Plantation Property Owners Inc and the Advisory Board
Represented By
Mark Brandon Goddard, Jr
Turner Padget Graham And Laney PA
contact info
Nicholas Clarence Chapma Stewart
Turner Padget Graham And Laney
contact info
Defendant
Community Services Associates Inc
Represented By
Benjamin Edward Nicholson, V
Burr And Forman LLP
contact info
Glenn Wade Leach, III
Burr And Forman Llp-Cola
contact info
William Shawn Bingham
Freeman Mathis And Gary LLP
contact info
William Grayson Lambert
Office Of The Governor
contact info
Defendant
Sea Pines Resort LLC
Represented By
John Phillips Linton, Jr
Walker Gressette Freeman And Linton LLC
contact info
George Trenholm Walker
Walker Gressette Freeman And Linton LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jill K Jinks
Represented By
Ian S Ford
Ford And Wallace
contact info
Ainsley Fisher Tillman
Tillman Law Group
contact info
Steven James Flynn
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Elizabeth J Campbell
Locke Lord LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
147 147 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 04/26 3:25 PM
ORDER granting 145 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven J. Flynn is hereby relieved as counsel for plaintiff. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 04/26/2023.(hcor, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
146 146 appeal USCA Order Tue 04/25 2:16 PM
ORDER of USCA as to132 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jill K Jinks. The court grants the motion to withdraw from further representation on appeal. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2023
145 145 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 04/24 4:40 PM
Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff by Attorney S. Flynn by Jill K Jinks. Response to Motion due by 5/8/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Tillman, Ainsley)
Related: [-]