Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01265
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Dec 28, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Aerospace Equity Group, LLC
7915 NW 5th Ct.
Miami, FL 33150
Represented By
Aerospace Equity Group, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, December 28, 2023
19 19 court Close Adversary Case Thu 12/28 4:09 PM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1265 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
18 18 court Notification of Returned Mail Wed 02/22 5:04 PM
Notification of Returned Mail. A document (Clerks' Default, ECF #9) mailed to the party indicated on the attached notice, has been returned to the bankruptcy court due to the inability of the U.S. Postal Service to deliver it as addressed. (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Thu 02/16 3:35 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 12 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,13 Default Judgment,14 Notice of Entry of Judgment
Sunday, February 12, 2023
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 02/13 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/12/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Notice of Entry (Re:13 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Aerospace Equity Group, LLC. .)
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 02/13 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/12/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Notice of Entry (Re:13 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Aerospace Equity Group, LLC. .)
Friday, February 10, 2023
14 14 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Fri 02/10 3:32 PM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 13 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Aerospace Equity Group, LLC. .
13 13 2 pgs order Default Judgment [Order] Fri 02/10 3:31 PM
Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Aerospace Equity Group, LLC. . (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Default Judgment Order Fri 02/10 3:29 PM
Order Granting Verified Ex Parte Motion for Entry ofFinal Default Judgment Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] #11
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
11 11 motion Default Judgment Wed 02/08 4:29 PM
Verified Motion for Default Judgment Against Aerospace Equity Group, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 28, 2023
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 01/29 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/28/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Aerospace Equity Group, LLC (Re:8 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Aerospace Equity Group, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila)
Thursday, January 26, 2023
9 9 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 01/26 1:12 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Aerospace Equity Group, LLC Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 8 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Aerospace Equity Group, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
8 8 motion Default Wed 01/25 2:59 PM
Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Aerospace Equity Group, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
7 7 utility Corrective Entry Thu 10/20 2:49 PM
Notice of Corrective Entry: *Entry has been Modified to Attach Image, Originally Omitted*. Related [+] (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-] 6 Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/20/2022 .
6 6 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 2:35 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/20/2022 (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
5 5 misc Amended Document Wed 10/19 11:03 AM
Amended Document To Reflect Correct Documents Listed Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 4 Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Thursday, October 13, 2022
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/13 10:37 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 12:26 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 12:25 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Aerospace Equity Group, LLC Answer Due 10/28/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01265 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Aerospace Equity Group, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 10:59 AM
Adversary case 22-01265 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Aerospace Equity Group, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]