Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01266
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Aug 09, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
AeroThrust Holdings, LLC
2495 NW 65th St.
Miami, FL 33122
Represented By
AeroThrust Holdings, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
24 24 court Close Adversary Case Wed 08/09 11:31 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1266 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
23 23 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Mon 07/10 11:26 AM
Joint Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
22 22 misc Certificate of Service Tue 05/16 1:21 PM
Certificate of Service for Order Granting Unopposed Ex Parte Motion to Vacate Entry of Default Against Aerothrust Holdings, LLC Filed by Defendant AeroThrust Holdings, LLC Related [+]. (Primrose, Sarah)
Related: [-] 21 Order on Miscellaneous Motion
21 21 order Miscellaneous Motion Order Tue 05/16 12:47 PM
Order Granting Unopposed Ex Parte Motion to Vacate Entry of Default Re: # 20 (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
20 20 motion Miscellaneous Motion Fri 05/12 7:45 PM
Agreed Motion Unopposed Ex Parte Motion to Vacate Default Filed by Defendant AeroThrust Holdings, LLC (Primrose, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Fri 05/12 7:19 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Sarah Primrose Filed by Defendant AeroThrust Holdings, LLC. (Primrose, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2023
18 18 court Notification of Returned Mail Fri 05/05 12:00 PM
Notification of Returned Mail. A document (Clerk's Entry of Default, ECF #15) mailed to the party indicated on the attached notice, has been returned to the bankruptcy court due to the inability of the U.S. Postal Service to deliver it as addressed. (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 15, 2023
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/16 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth). Modified on 4/13/2023 to Correct Linkage. .) Notice Date 04/15/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant AeroThrust Holdings, LLC (Re:14 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Aerothrust Holdings, LLC) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Thursday, April 13, 2023
16 16 utility Corrective Entry Thu 04/13 9:34 AM
Notice of Corrective Entry to Reflect Correct Linkage. Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth). Modified on 4/13/2023 to Correct Linkage. .) (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 15 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant AeroThrust Holdings, LLC (Re:14 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Aerothrust Holdings, LLC) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
15 15 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 04/13 7:41 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant AeroThrust Holdings, LLC Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila) (Valencia, Yamileth). Modified on 4/13/2023 to Correct Linkage. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 14 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Aerothrust Holdings, LLC
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
14 14 motion Default Wed 04/12 6:38 PM
Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Aerothrust Holdings, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Tue 02/07 1:14 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,10 Order on Motion to Issue Summons,11 Alias/Pluries Summons Issued,12 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Friday, February 03, 2023
12 12 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 02/03 9:01 AM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
11 11 court Alias/Pluries Summons Issued [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 02/03 9:00 AM
Alias Summons Issued on AeroThrust Holdings, LLC Answer Due 3/6/2023 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 04/06/2023 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01266 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against AeroThrust Holdings, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Thursday, February 02, 2023
10 10 order Issue Summons Order Thu 02/02 2:31 PM
Order Granting Motion to Issue Alias Summons Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] #9
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
9 9 motion Issue Summons Tue 01/31 5:59 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Issue Alias Summons Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
8 8 misc Amended Document Tue 10/25 2:59 PM
Amended Document To Reflect Correct Defendant Zip Code Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 5 Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Thursday, October 20, 2022
7 7 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 2:38 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
6 6 utility Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency [ECF] Thu 10/20 11:27 AM
Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Incorrect Information Listed on PDF Image Attached to the Docket Entry. The defendant's zip code is incorrect. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO REFILE A "SECOND" AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE WITHIN TWO BUSINESS DAYS. Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 5 Certificate of Service (Amended) Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines). filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Wed 10/19 11:00 AM
Certificate of Service (Amended) Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Thursday, October 13, 2022
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/13 10:40 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 12:35 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 12:31 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on AeroThrust Holdings, LLC Answer Due 10/28/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01266 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against AeroThrust Holdings, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 11:04 AM
Adversary case 22-01266 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against AeroThrust Holdings, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]