Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01267
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Jul 17, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
M-DOT AVIATION LLC, Defendant
877 NE 27th Ln, #13
Cape Coral, FL 33909
Represented By
M-DOT AVIATION LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila, Plaintiff
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, July 17, 2023
13 13 court Close Adversary Case Mon 07/17 7:58 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1267 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Fri 06/30 10:34 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 11 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
11 11 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Wed 06/28 9:52 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Filing Tue 04/25 4:20 PM
Notice of Filing Notice Of Settlement , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Filing Tue 01/17 2:11 PM
Notice of Filing Election to Participate in Mediation , Filed by Defendant M-DOT Aviation LLC. (Hollander, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
8 8 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 2:38 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
7 7 misc Amended Document Wed 10/19 11:05 AM
Amended Document To Reflect Correct Documents Listed Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 4 Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Monday, October 17, 2022
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Mon 10/17 3:14 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Melissa H Jeda Filed by Defendant M-DOT Aviation LLC. (Jeda, Melissa)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Mon 10/17 3:14 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Richard J Hollander Filed by Defendant M-DOT Aviation LLC. (Hollander, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 13, 2022
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/13 10:47 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 12:44 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 12:40 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on M-DOT Aviation LLC Answer Due 10/28/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01267 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against M-DOT AVIATION LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 11:08 AM
Adversary case 22-01267 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against M-DOT AVIATION LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]