Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01268
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Feb 13, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Airfoils, LLC
3401 Enterprise Pkwy Ste 200
Beachwood, OH 44122
Represented By
Airfoils, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, February 13, 2023
12 12 court Close Adversary Case Mon 02/13 8:39 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1268 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Fri 01/27 4:35 PM
Notice of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 27, 2022
10 10 misc Amended Document Thu 10/27 10:17 AM
Amended Document To Reflect Correct Case Number Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 8 Amended Document filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
9 9 utility Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency [ECF] Wed 10/26 1:21 PM
Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Incorrect PDF Image Attached to the Docket Entry. Incorrect case number on page 3 of PDF. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO REFILE OR FILE AN AMENDED DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO BUSINESS DAYS. Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 8 Amended Document To Reflect Correct Information Listed Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Re:5 Amended Document filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila).
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
8 8 misc Amended Document Tue 10/25 3:06 PM
Amended Document To Reflect Correct Information Listed Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 5 Amended Document filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Thursday, October 20, 2022
7 7 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 2:44 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
6 6 utility Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency [ECF] Thu 10/20 11:34 AM
Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Incorrect PDF Image Attached to the Docket Entry. Incorrect case number on page 3 of PDF. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO REFILE OR FILE A "SECOND" AMENDED WITHIN TWO BUSINESS DAYS. Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 5 Amended Document To Reflect Correct Documents Listed Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Re:4 Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila). filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
5 5 misc Amended Document Wed 10/19 11:08 AM
Amended Document To Reflect Correct Documents Listed Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 4 Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Thursday, October 13, 2022
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/13 10:50 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 12:54 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 12:51 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Airfoils, LLC Answer Due 10/28/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01268 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Airfoils, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 11:15 AM
Adversary case 22-01268 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Airfoils, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]