Kapila v. Airline Transportation Specialists, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Robert A Mark |
Case #: | 1:22-ap-01269 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Sep 27, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jul 17, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Airline Transportation Specialists, Inc.
3030 Lexington Ave
Eagan, MN 55121 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Monday, July 17, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 07/17 7:59 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1269 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila . (Dillworth, Drew) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Order Granting Expedited Motion Waive Local Rule 2090-1(C)(2) Filed by Defendant Airline Transportation Specialists, Inc. - Re: # 11 . (Antillon, Jacqueline) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Expedited Motion Waive Local Rule 2090-1(C)(2) Filed by Defendant Airline Transportation Specialists, Inc. (McMahon, Brian) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) |
|
Thursday, January 26, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Ex Parte Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Roland Gary Jones [Fee Paid $200] Filed by Defendant Airline Transportation Specialists, Inc. (McMahon, Brian) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Thu 01/26 1:03 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear pro hac vice([LINK 22-01269 RAM] ) [motion,mprohac] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A41992971. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Monday, January 16, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Notice of Filing Ellection to Participate in Mediation Process , Filed by Defendant Airline Transportation Specialists, Inc.. (McMahon, Brian) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Brian K. McMahon Esq. Filed by Defendant Airline Transportation Specialists, Inc.. (McMahon, Brian) |
|
Thursday, October 20, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana) |
|
Wednesday, October 19, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Amended Document To Reflect Correct Documents Listed Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila . (Dillworth, Drew) |
|
Thursday, October 13, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila . (Dillworth, Drew) |
|
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines . (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Airline Transportation Specialists, Inc. Answer Due 10/28/2022 Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra) |
|
Tuesday, September 27, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 22-01269 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Airline Transportation Specialists, Inc.. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew) |